Miller et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Robert Miller and Brenna Miller
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv01814
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Kymberly K Evanson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 10 STRICKEN (Document filed on incorrect case) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 2. (Rhodes, Michael) Modified on 1/25/2024 (SB).
January 17, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against defendant(s) State Farm Fire and Casualty Company with JURY DEMAND filed by Robert Miller, Brenna Miller.(Thede, Nicholas)
December 26, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rhodes, Michael)
December 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney George A Mix on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Mix, George)
December 18, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to State Farm Fire & Casualty Company on 12/5/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Thede, Nicholas)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/4/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/18/2024, Joint Status Report due by 1/25/2024. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
December 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael K Rhodes on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rhodes, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (CR)
November 28, 2023 District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (CR)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) State Farm Fire and Casualty Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8254185) Attorney Nicholas A. Thede added to party Brenna Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas A. Thede added to party Robert Miller(pty:pla) filed by Robert Miller, Brenna Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons [Proposed])(Thede, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Miller
Represented By: Nicholas A. Thede
Represented By: Scott Andrew MacLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenna Miller
Represented By: Nicholas A. Thede
Represented By: Scott Andrew MacLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: George A Mix
Represented By: Michael K Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?