Valve Corporation v. Zaiger LLC et al
Plaintiff: Valve Corporation
Defendant: Zaiger, LLC, John Doe Corporation and Zaiger LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01819
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 22 REPLY, filed by Defendant Zaiger LLC, TO RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Kestle, Jeffrey)
January 5, 2024 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Blake Marks-Dias filed by Plaintiff Valve Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Redacted), #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E (Redacted), #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G (Redacted))(Marks-Dias, Blake)
January 5, 2024 Filing 20 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Valve Corporation, to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marks-Dias, Blake)
December 14, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Filed by Defendant Zaiger LLC. Noting Date 1/12/2024, (Kestle, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexander C Banzhaf for DEFENDANT Zaiger LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gregory O Tuttle for DEFENDANT Zaiger LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexa DePierro for DEFENDANT Zaiger LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
December 8, 2023 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexander Banzhaf FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Zaiger LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8271282 (Kestle, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2023 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gregory Tuttle FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Zaiger LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8271270 (Kestle, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexa DePierro FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Zaiger LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8271240 (Kestle, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Valve Corporation. (Marks-Dias, Blake)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Zaiger in Support of Defendant Zaiger LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Zaiger LLC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Kestle, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Kestle in Support of Defendant Zaiger LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Zaiger LLC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Kestle, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Zaiger LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/12/2024 12/29/2023, (Kestle, Jeffrey) Modified noting date on 12/15/2023 (SB).
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00563-JCC, by Defendant Zaiger LLC. (Kestle, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 12/5/2023. (RE)
November 30, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff Valve Corporation must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/7/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (RE)
November 30, 2023 Judge John H. Chun added. (RE)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Zaiger, LLC. (Kestle, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE to Plaintiff re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Zaiger, LLC. (Kestle, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Zaiger, LLC (Kestle, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Kestle in Support of Defendant Zaiger, LLC's Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Zaiger, LLC (Kestle, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-20436-1 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8254521) filed by Zaiger, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Complaint)(Kestle, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/1/2023 due to malformed PDF) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valve Corporation v. Zaiger LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valve Corporation
Represented By: Blake Edward Marks-Dias
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaiger, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey T Kestle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaiger LLC
Represented By: Alexa DePierro
Represented By: Alexander C Banzhaf
Represented By: Gregory O Tuttle
Represented By: Jeffrey T Kestle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?