Edgar et al v. Safeway Inc et al
Plaintiff: Peter Edgar and Rachelle Edgar
Defendant: Safeway Inc., SAS Retail Services, LLC, Safeway Inc, SAS Retail Services LLC and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2023cv01820
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #13 Initial Disclosures: Modified on 1/25/2024 to strike docket entry made in error. (KB)
January 24, 2024 Filing 13 PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by All Plaintiffs.(O'Halloran, Mark) Modified on 1/25/2024 to strike docket entry at request of filer (KB).
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Jury Trial is set for 1/27/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *5-6 days*. Joinder of Parties due by 2/20/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/31/2024, Motions due by 8/30/2024, Discovery completed by 9/30/2024, Dispositive motions due by 10/29/2024, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/13/2024, Motions in Limine due by 12/30/2024, Pretrial Order due by 1/15/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/22/2025, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/22/2025. (LC)
January 18, 2024 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 6. Filed by All Defendants.(Khachatourians, Natasha)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Jacob James Roes on behalf of Defendants SAS Retail Services LLC, Safeway Inc. (Roes, Jacob)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/17/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/24/2024, Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2024. (LC)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file for defendant. (RE)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by SAS Retail Services, LLC, Safeway Inc..(Khachatourians, Natasha)
November 30, 2023 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by All Defendants (Khachatourians, Natasha)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-20264-3 SEA; (AWAWDC-8254608) Attorney Natasha A Khachatourians added to party SAS Retail Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Natasha A Khachatourians added to party Safeway Inc.(pty:dft) filed by SAS Retail Services, LLC, Safeway Inc..(Khachatourians, Natasha) (Prepayment Waived) Modified on 11/28/2023 added receipt number (STP). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2023: #1 First Amended Complaint) (RE).
November 28, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #5 Notice of Removal: added receipt number and updated fee payment as made. (STP)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by All Defendants (Khachatourians, Natasha)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by SAS Retail Services, LLC. (Khachatourians, Natasha)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Safeway Inc.. (Khachatourians, Natasha)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET; filed by All Defendants. (Khachatourians, Natasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgar et al v. Safeway Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Edgar
Represented By: Mark W D O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle Edgar
Represented By: Mark W D O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAS Retail Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc
Represented By: Jacob James Roes
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAS Retail Services LLC
Represented By: Jacob James Roes
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?