Viniello et al v. Amazon.com Inc
Plaintiff: Mark Viniello and Over Active Imaginations Inc
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv01866
Filed: December 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc with JURY DEMAND filed by Mark Viniello, Over Active Imaginations Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Murthy, Karthik)
December 14, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Over Active Imaginations Inc. (Murthy, Karthik)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CR)
December 6, 2023 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (CR)
December 6, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Over Active Imaginations Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/13/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(CDA)
December 5, 2023 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a patent by Plaintiffs OVER ACTIVE IMAGINATIONS, INC., MARK VINIELLO (Murthy, Karthik)
December 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon.com, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8266285) Attorney Karthik K Murthy added to party OVER ACTIVE IMAGINATIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Karthik K Murthy added to party MARK VINIELLO(pty:pla) filed by MARK VINIELLO, OVER ACTIVE IMAGINATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murthy, Karthik) (Attachment 12 replaced on 12/6/2023 due to malformed PDF) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viniello et al v. Amazon.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Viniello
Represented By: Karthik K Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Over Active Imaginations Inc
Represented By: Karthik K Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?