McGee v. Nordstrom Inc
Plaintiff: Michelle McGee
Defendant: Nordstrom Inc. and Nordstrom Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv01875
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Parties' #10 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines. Nordstrom's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 2/14/2024, Plaintiff's response (if any) to 3/11/2024, and Nordstrom's reply (if any) to 3/22/2024. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
January 25, 2024 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION , filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc. Noting Date 1/25/2024, (Rainwater, Austin)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge John H. Chun. Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/25/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/8/2024. (AD)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Isabelle L Ord for DEFENDANT Nordstrom Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Parties' #6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Nordstrom's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 1/31/2024. Plaintiff's response (if any) is due 2/26/2024. Nordstrom's reply (if any) is due 3/8/2024. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
December 22, 2023 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Deadlines, filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc. Noting Date 12/22/2023, (Rainwater, Austin)
December 22, 2023 Attorney Jeffrey B DeGroot, Virginia A Weeks added for Nordstrom Inc, per Defendant's #3 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
December 21, 2023 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Isabelle L. Ord FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Nordstrom Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8289384 (Rainwater, Austin)
December 21, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Nordstrom Inc. (Rainwater, Austin)
December 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Austin M. Rainwater on behalf of Defendant Nordstrom Inc. (Rainwater, Austin)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Nordstrom Inc. (RE)
December 7, 2023 Judge John H. Chun added. (RE)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Nordstrom Inc. with JURY DEMAND filed by Michelle McGee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Noel, Wright) (FEE PAID: AWAWDC-8268385 Prepayment Waived) Modified on 12/6/2023 to add fee receipt (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Nordstrom Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle McGee
Represented By: Wright A Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom Inc
Represented By: Isabelle L Ord
Represented By: Jeffrey B DeGroot
Represented By: Virginia A Weeks
Represented By: Austin M. Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?