Amazon.com Inc et al v. Does 1-20 et al
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC and Amazon Technologies Inc
Defendant: Does 1-20 unknown parties doing business as "REKK" agent of REKK, Oscar Pineda, Janiyah Alford, Page Noah, Skylar Robinson, William Walsh, Luke Colvin, Alejandro Taveras, Andrew Ling, Brandon Sukhram, Charalampos Gkatzoulas, Cosmin Sopca, Dylan Hinz, Eric Niezabytowski, Graham Ferguson, Ivona Brazovskaja, James Garofalo, Jenny Tran, Johanes Kessel, Jorge Correa, Josh Davis, Karcper Niepogoda, Olaf Booij, Ryan Bates, Sai Charan Beeravelli, Simone Antonio Figura, Zachary Iguelmamene, Zoha Ahmed, Does 1-20 unknown parties doing business as REKK and Noah Page
Case Number: 2:2023cv01879
Filed: December 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Filing 27 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Dylan Hinz, Noah Page, Skylar Robinson, Brandon Sukhram, Alejandro Taveras (AD)
January 31, 2024 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #26 MOTION for Default Judgment: entry modified to correct relief requested. (AD)
January 29, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION for Default Judgment against Brandon Sukhram, Alejandro Taveras, Dylan Hinz, Noah Page and Skylar Robinson, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/29/2024, (Garcia, Melina) Modified on 1/31/2024 to correct relief requested (AD).
January 24, 2024 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Oscar Pineda on 12/18/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 24, 2024 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Noah Page on 12/13/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 24, 2024 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Alejandro Taveras on 12/26/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 17, 2024 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Zachary Iguelmamene on 12/13/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 17, 2024 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on William Walsh on 12/13/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 17, 2024 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Skylar Robinson on 12/15/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 17, 2024 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jorge Correa on 12/13/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 17, 2024 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Janiyah Alford on 12/13/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 17, 2024 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on James Garofalo on 12/13/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 17, 2024 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Graham Ferguson on 12/14/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 17, 2024 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Eric Niezabytowski on 12/15/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 17, 2024 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dylan Hinz on 12/18/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
January 17, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Brandon Sukhram on 12/13/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garcia, Melina)
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE: Defendant Zoha Ahmed has registered to receive electronic service. The party WILL NOT be e-filing. The party was directed to enter their appearance in accordance with LCR 83.2. (STP)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #8 Motion to Expedite Discovery. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Niles Gooding filed by All Plaintiffs re #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Garcia, Melina)
December 19, 2023 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Wesley Brandi filed by All Plaintiffs re #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Garcia, Melina)
December 19, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/19/2023, (Garcia, Melina)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Melina Garcia on behalf of Plaintiffs Amazon Technologies Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Garcia, Melina)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Zoha Ahmed, Janiyah Alford, Ryan Bates, Sai Charan Beeravelli, Olaf Booij, Ivona Brazovskaja, Luke Colvin, Jorge Correa, Josh Davis, Graham Ferguson, Simone Antonio Figura, James Garofalo, Charalampos Gkatzoulas, Dylan Hinz, Zachary Iguelmamene, Johanes Kessel, Andrew Ling, Karcper Niepogoda, Eric Niezabytowski, Noah Page, Oscar Pineda, Skylar Robinson, Cosmin Sopca, Brandon Sukhram, Alejandro Taveras, Jenny Tran, William Walsh. (RE)
December 11, 2023 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (RE)
December 11, 2023 Judge James L. Robart added. (RE)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Amazon Technologies Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons)(MacNaughton, Bonnie)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com Inc for Amazon Technologies Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Amazon Technologies Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiffs Amazon Technologies Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-8269230) filed by Amazon Technologies Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MacNaughton, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com Inc et al v. Does 1-20 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Represented By: Tim Cunningham
Represented By: Melina Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Represented By: Tim Cunningham
Represented By: Melina Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon Technologies Inc
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Represented By: Tim Cunningham
Represented By: Melina Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20 unknown parties doing business as "REKK" agent of REKK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janiyah Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Page Noah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skylar Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Taveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Sukhram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charalampos Gkatzoulas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosmin Sopca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Hinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Niezabytowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivona Brazovskaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Garofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johanes Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karcper Niepogoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olaf Booij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sai Charan Beeravelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simone Antonio Figura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Iguelmamene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoha Ahmed
Represented By: Zoha Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20 unknown parties doing business as REKK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?