Burrus v. Jackson
Petitioner: Christopher Sean Burrus
Respondent: Robert Jackson
Case Number: 2:2023cv01968
Filed: December 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Grady J Leupold
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion Docket Noted re Motion for Appointment of Counsel; filed by Petitioner Christopher Sean Burrus. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Christopher Burrus, Prisoner ID: 421114)(MW)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF FILING DEADLINE AND TO APPOINT COUNSEL. Petitioner's Motion for Additional Time to File (Dkt. #4 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner has until 2/22/2024, to file his habeas petition or to seek an extension of time to file. Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Dkt. #1 -1) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. (Attachments: #1 2254 Petition)**20 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Burrus, Prisoner ID: 421114)(MW)
January 3, 2024 Filing 4 Prison Trust Account Statement and Letter to the Court re missing Habeas Petition, filed by Petitioner Christopher Sean Burrus. **7 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Christopher Burrus, Prisoner ID: 421114)(MW)
December 21, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application. ***Action Required*** Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 1/22/2024 to correct IFP application (Attachments: #1 Habeas Petition) **17 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Burrus, Prisoner ID: 421114) (ZMG)
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Christopher Sean Burrus. Noted by Clerk for 2/22/2024 (Attachments: #1 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel)**14 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Christopher Burrus, Prisoner ID: 421114) (ZMG) Changed to pending motion per direction from chambers on 1/12/2024 (MW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrus v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Sean Burrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?