Seattle Metropolitans Hockey LLC v. Seattle Hockey Partners LLC
Plaintiff: Seattle Metropolitans Hockey LLC
Defendant: Seattle Hockey Partners LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01989
Filed: December 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Because Seattle Metropolitans has abandoned the claims that Seattle Hockey Partners sought to dismiss, the court DENIES Seattle Hockey Partners's motion (Dkt. #7 ) as moot. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
February 12, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Seattle Metropolitans Hockey LLC, to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Lowe, David)
February 12, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT AND FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN AND UNFAIR COMPETITION, CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT VIOLATION, AND UNJUST ENRICHMENT against defendant(s) Seattle Hockey Partners LLC with JURY DEMAND filed by Seattle Metropolitans Hockey LLC.(Lowe, David)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John D Freed for DEFENDANT Seattle Hockey Partners LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
January 19, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Slapshot LLC, Other Affiliate FW-Puck LLC for Seattle Hockey Partners LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Seattle Hockey Partners LLC. (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
January 19, 2024 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John D. Freed FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Seattle Hockey Partners LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8319410 (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST by Defendant Seattle Hockey Partners LLC for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by Defendant Seattle Hockey Partners LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/16/2024, (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
January 19, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton on behalf of Defendant Seattle Hockey Partners LLC. (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Seattle Hockey Partners LLC on 12/29/2023, filed by Plaintiff Seattle Metropolitans Hockey LLC. (Lowe, David)
December 28, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Seattle Hockey Partners LLC. (RE)
December 28, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (RE)
December 28, 2023 Judge James L. Robart added. (RE)
December 27, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Paul Kim for Seattle Metropolitans Hockey LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Seattle Metropolitans Hockey LLC. (Lowe, David)
December 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT AND FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN AND UNFAIR COMPETITION, CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT VIOLATION, UNJUST ENRICHMENT, CONVERSION, AND TORTIOUS INTEFERENCE against defendant(s) Seattle Hockey Partners LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8292844) Attorney David Allen Lowe added to party Seattle Metropolitans Hockey LLC(pty:pla) filed by Seattle Metropolitans Hockey LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #3 Summons)(Lowe, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seattle Metropolitans Hockey LLC v. Seattle Hockey Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seattle Metropolitans Hockey LLC
Represented By: David Allen Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Hockey Partners LLC
Represented By: John D Freed
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?