Securian Life Insurance Company v. Saxena et al
Plaintiff: Securian Life Insurance Company
Defendant: The Estate of Smiriti Saxena, Sonam Saxena and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2024cv00012
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John T Burnite for PLAINTIFF Securian Life Insurance Company, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
February 14, 2024 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John T. Burnite FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Securian Life Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8352216 (Swick, Jodi)
January 25, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Securian Life Insurance Company (Swick, Jodi)
January 22, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karolyn Ann Hicks on behalf of Defendant The Estate of Smiriti Saxena. (Hicks, Karolyn)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/20/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/5/2024, Joint Status Report due by 3/19/2024. (KMP)
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant The Estate of Smiriti Saxena mailed on 1/9/2024 (Swick, Jodi)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sonam Saxena mailed on 1/9/2024 (Swick, Jodi)
January 19, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Todd Maybrown on behalf of Defendant Sonam Saxena. (Maybrown, Todd)
January 9, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at #https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
January 5, 2024 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Does 1 to 10, Sonam Saxena, The Estate of Smiriti Saxena. (RE)
January 5, 2024 Judge Tana Lin added. (RE)
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Minnesota Mutual Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Securian Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Securian Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Securian Holding Company for Securian Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Securian Life Insurance Company. (Swick, Jodi)
January 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against All Defendants (Receipt # CWAWDC-8299691) filed by Securian Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Swick, Jodi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securian Life Insurance Company v. Saxena et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securian Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jodi K Swick
Represented By: John T Burnite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Smiriti Saxena
Represented By: Karolyn Ann Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonam Saxena
Represented By: Todd Maybrown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?