Mercado v. United States of America
Petitioner: Erik Mercado
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2024cv00015
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Karyn)
February 2, 2024 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Karyn S. Johnson filed by Respondent United States of America re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) (Johnson, Karyn)
February 2, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) , filed by Respondent Petitioner Erik Mercado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/14/2024, (Johnson, Karyn) Modified on 2/2/2024 correct filer name (CDA).
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing the United States to Answer 2255 Petition. Within forty-five (45) days after the filing of Petitioner's 2255 Motion, the United States shall file and serve an Answer in accordance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Cases in United States District Courts. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SB) (cc: Petitioner via USPS)
January 9, 2024 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: Petitioner via USPS) (CR)
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 2255 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Erik Felipe Mercado. (pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255), related to criminal case: 2:21-cr-00081-RSL. (CR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercado v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erik Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Karyn S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?