Faidley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sharmecia Faidley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2024cv00035
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Defendant's #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Commissioner shall have up to and including 4/25/2024, to file the certified administrative record as the Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
March 6, 2024 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Justin L. Martin filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint (Martin, Justin)
March 6, 2024 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint , filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/6/2024, (Martin, Justin)
January 22, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Martin, Justin)
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3. Service, the Court hereby notifies the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Washington of the commencement of this action by transmitting to them this docket entry via Notice of Electronic Filing. If Plaintiff is proceeding pro se and is not registered to receive electronic notice of filings, this Notice will be delivered to plaintiff via U.S. mail. Per Rule 3, "the plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4." (SB)
January 10, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (IFP Granted) filed by Sharmecia Faidley. (SB)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Defendant shall file a certified copy of the Administrative Record and any affirmative defenses within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
January 9, 2024 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (MIH)
January 8, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Sharmecia Faidley. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliver, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faidley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharmecia Faidley
Represented By: David P Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US Attorney Social Security
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?