King County v. Express Scripts Inc et al
Plaintiff: King County
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Medco Health Solutions, Inc., ESI Mail Order Processing, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Optuminsight Life Sciences, Inc., The Lewin Group, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., Merck-Medco, Ingenix, Inc., Ingenix Pharmaceutical Services, Inc., Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Medco Health Solutions Inc, ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc, The Lewin Group Inc, Optum Inc, Optuminsight Inc, Ingenix Inc and Ingenix Pharmaceutical Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2024cv00049
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 Filing 38 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher G. Michel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc, Medco Health Solutions Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8381708 (Cobb, Alicia)
March 6, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs , filed by Defendants ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc, Optum Inc, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc, The Lewin Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/6/2024, (McDougald, Shannon)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/22/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/29/2024, Joint Status Report due by 4/5/2024. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (NAW)
January 24, 2024 Filing 35 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc, Medco Health Solutions Inc, Optum Inc, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc, The Lewin Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cobb, Alicia)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #27 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sage R Vanden Heuvel for DEFENDANTS ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc and Medco Health Solutions Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Lyle for DEFENDANTS ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc and Medco Health Solutions Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan G Cooper for DEFENDANTS ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc and Medco Health Solutions Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Danielle L Gilmore for DEFENDANTS ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc and Medco Health Solutions Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kimberly K Chemerinsky for DEFENDANT OptumRx Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Caroline Rawls Strumph for DEFENDANT OptumRx Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian D Boone for DEFENDANT OptumRx Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
January 19, 2024 Filing 27 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sage R. Vanden Heuvel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc, Medco Health Solutions Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8318166 (Cobb, Alicia)
January 19, 2024 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Health Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate Optum, Inc., Other Affiliate United HealthCare Services Inc, Other Affiliate Optum Public Sector Solutions, Inc. for The Lewin Group Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Optum Inc, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc, The Lewin Group Inc. (McDougald, Shannon)
January 19, 2024 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael Lyle FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc, Medco Health Solutions Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8318123 (Cobb, Alicia)
January 19, 2024 Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan G. Cooper FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc, Medco Health Solutions Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8318063 (Cobb, Alicia)
January 19, 2024 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Health Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate Optum, Inc., Other Affiliate United HealthCare Services Inc, Other Affiliate OptumRx Holdings LLC for OptumRx Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Optum Inc, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc, The Lewin Group Inc. (McDougald, Shannon)
January 19, 2024 Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Danielle L. Gilmore FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc, Medco Health Solutions Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8318032 (Cobb, Alicia)
January 19, 2024 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Health Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate OptumInsight Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Optum, Inc., Other Affiliate United HealthCare Services Inc for Optuminsight Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Optum Inc, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc, The Lewin Group Inc. (McDougald, Shannon)
January 19, 2024 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Health Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate United HealthCare Services Inc, Other Affiliate Optum Inc, Other Affiliate Optuminsight, Inc. for Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Optum Inc, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc, The Lewin Group Inc. (McDougald, Shannon)
January 19, 2024 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Health Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate United Health for Optum Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Optum Inc, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc, The Lewin Group Inc. (McDougald, Shannon)
January 18, 2024 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kimberly Chemerinsky FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Optum Inc, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc, The Lewin Group Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8317495 (McDougald, Shannon)
January 18, 2024 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Caroline Rawls Strumph FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Optum Inc, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc, The Lewin Group Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8317488 (McDougald, Shannon)
January 18, 2024 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian D Boone FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Optum Inc, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc, The Lewin Group Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8317451 (McDougald, Shannon)
January 18, 2024 Filing 15 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc, Medco Health Solutions Inc (Cobb, Alicia)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. (NAW)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Parties' Stipulated #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to 3/13/2024. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB)
January 16, 2024 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants ESI Mail Order Processing Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc, Medco Health Solutions Inc. Noting Date 1/16/2024, (Cobb, Alicia)
January 16, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,,. ***Action Required*** Notice of Removal - Jury Demand Improperly Submitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
January 16, 2024 Filing 10 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court and federal court jury demands on file (MG) Modified on 1/16/2024 strike federal jury demand language (CDA).
January 16, 2024 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (MG)
January 16, 2024 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/23/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MG)
January 16, 2024 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #10 Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only). Federal Jury demand language stricken from entry, see Notice of Filing Deficiency at Dkt #11 . (CDA)
January 11, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Evernorth Health, Inc., Corporate Parent The Cigna Group for Medco Health Solutions, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Medco Health Solutions, Inc.. (Cobb, Alicia)
January 11, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts, Inc., Corporate Parent Evernorth Health, Inc., Corporate Parent The Cigna Group for Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services, Inc.. (Cobb, Alicia)
January 11, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Evernorth Health, Inc., Corporate Parent Medco Health Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent The Cigna Group for Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Cobb, Alicia)
January 11, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Evernorth Health, Inc., Corporate Parent Medco Health Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent The Cigna Group for Express Scripts Administrators, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Express Scripts Administrators, LLC. (Cobb, Alicia)
January 11, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts, Inc., Corporate Parent Evernorth Health, Inc., Corporate Parent The Cigna Group for ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Cobb, Alicia)
January 11, 2024 Filing 4 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Express Scripts, Inc., Corporate Parent Evernorth Health, Inc., Other Affiliate The Cigna Group for ESI Mail Order Processing, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by ESI Mail Order Processing, Inc.. (Cobb, Alicia)
January 11, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Evernorth Health, Inc., Other Affiliate The Cigna Group for Express Scripts, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Cobb, Alicia)
January 10, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alicia Cobb on behalf of Defendants ESI Mail Order Processing, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc.. (Cobb, Alicia)
January 10, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff indicated in Complaint; from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-21192-8 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8308794) Attorney Alicia Cobb added to party Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services, Inc.(pty:dft) filed by Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., ESI Mail Order Processing, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Cobb, Alicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King County v. Express Scripts Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King County
Represented By: Alison Gaffney
Represented By: David J Ko
Represented By: Dean N Kawamoto
Represented By: Derek W Loeser
Represented By: Devon Shannon
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Janine Joly
Represented By: Kylie Fisher
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Administrators, LLC
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medco Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Order Processing, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon L McDougald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight Life Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon L McDougald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lewin Group, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon L McDougald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon L McDougald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon L McDougald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck-Medco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenix Pharmaceutical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Represented By: Danielle L Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan G Cooper
Represented By: Michael Lyle
Represented By: Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Administrators LLC
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Represented By: Danielle L Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan G Cooper
Represented By: Michael Lyle
Represented By: Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medco Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Represented By: Danielle L Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan G Cooper
Represented By: Michael Lyle
Represented By: Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Order Processing Inc
Represented By: Jonathan G Cooper
Represented By: Michael Lyle
Represented By: Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Represented By: Danielle L Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Represented By: Danielle L Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan G Cooper
Represented By: Michael Lyle
Represented By: Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Represented By: Danielle L Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan G Cooper
Represented By: Michael Lyle
Represented By: Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Specialty Distribution Services Inc
Represented By: Danielle L Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan G Cooper
Represented By: Michael Lyle
Represented By: Sage R Vanden Heuvel
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx Inc
Represented By: Brian D Boone
Represented By: Caroline Rawls Strumph
Represented By: Kimberly K Chemerinsky
Represented By: Shannon L McDougald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight Life Sciences Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lewin Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenix Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenix Pharmaceutical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?