Washington v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Rachel Washington
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv00059
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Kymberly K Evanson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 15. Filed by Plaintiff Rachel Washington.(Singla, Sumeer)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff Rachel Washington re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected) (Singla, Sumeer)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Intent to File Surreply Striking re #21 Declaration ; filed by Plaintiff Rachel Washington. (Singla, Sumeer)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Todd Johnson filed by Defendant The Boeing Company re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hill, Laura)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Defendant The Boeing Company, TO RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected) (Hill, Laura)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRAECIPE to attach document (Corrected Motion to Dismiss) re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected) by Defendant The Boeing Company (Attachments: #1 Corrected Motion to Dismiss)(Hill, Laura)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #16 Response to Motion to Dismiss (Singla, Sumeer)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of Sumeer Singla filed by Plaintiff Rachel Washington re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Singla, Sumeer)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Rachel Washington, to #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected). (Singla, Sumeer)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (text only): At the stipulated request of the parties #14 , an extension of time for the FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is granted. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/14/2024. Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Conduct FRCP 26(f) Conference, filed by Plaintiff Rachel Washington. Noting Date 2/5/2024, (Singla, Sumeer)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected), filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Laura Hill, #3 Exhibit A) Noting Date 2/16/2024, (Hill, Laura)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/16/2024, (Hill, Laura)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Parties' #10 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to 1/23/2024. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (First Extension), filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. Noting Date 1/19/2024, (Hill, Laura)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/7/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/21/2024, Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2024. (DS)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court jury demand on file (CR)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Hon. S. Kate Vaughan no longer assigned to the case. (CR)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (CR)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant The Boeing Company re #3 Notice-Other, #5 Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement, #4 Verification of State Court Records, #2 Declaration (non motion), #1 Notice of Removal, (Hill, Laura)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by The Boeing Company. (Hill, Laura)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant The Boeing Company (Hill, Laura)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Hill, Laura)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Laura C. Hill re Filing Notice of Removal with State Court Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant The Boeing Company (Hill, Laura)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-24660-8 KNT; (Receipt # BWAWDC-8311394) Attorney Laura Hill added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft) filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Washington
Represented By: Lawand Anderson
Represented By: Sumeer Singla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Breanna Philips
Represented By: Michelle L. Maley
Represented By: Laura Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?