Tran v. Li et al
Plaintiff: Michael V. Tran and Michael V Tran
Defendant: Hao B. Li, Jane Doe Li, American Commerce Insurance Company and Hao B Li
Case Number: 2:2024cv00080
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2024 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) per Parties' #18 Stipulated Motion for Order of Dismissal. (KMP)
February 7, 2024 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION for Order of Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff Michael V Tran. Noting Date 2/7/2024, (Jorgensen, Jean)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN COMMERCE INSURANCE COMPANY re #16 STIPULATION. All claims brought or that could have been brought, by Plaintiff Michael V. Tran against American Commerce Insurance Company in the above-captioned matter are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each Party shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
February 6, 2024 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION for Order of Dismissal, filed by Defendant American Commerce Insurance Company. (Weber, William)
February 6, 2024 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: Pursuant to the Parties' #14 Notice of Settlement and in accordance with Section V of the Court's Standing Order for All Civil Cases, It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a stipulated dismissal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), within thirty (30) days from the date of the this Order. If the Parties do not submit a stipulated dismissal by the above deadline, the Court will enter its standard order of post-settlement dismissal, allowing the Parties to reopen the case if they have not perfected the settlement agreement within sixty (60) days of the dismissal order.It is further ORDERED that all pending motions, deadlines, and hearings in this case, including the trial date, are STRICKEN. (KMP)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant American Commerce Insurance Company (Weber, William)
February 2, 2024 ***Motion terminated: #5 MOTION to Remand to King County Superior Court filed by Michael V Tran. Correctly re-filed at Dkt. No. #6 . (KMP)
January 31, 2024 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at #https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
January 29, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MAPFRE S.A. for American Commerce Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by American Commerce Insurance Company. (Foxen, Isabella)
January 29, 2024 Filing 10 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1(a)(2). Filed by American Commerce Insurance Company. (Foxen, Isabella)
January 29, 2024 Filing 9 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant American Commerce Insurance Company (Foxen, Isabella)
January 29, 2024 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin for all further proceedings. (TF)
January 25, 2024 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Jean Jorgensen filed by Plaintiff Michael V Tran re #6 MOTION to Remand to King County Superior Court (Jorgensen, Jean)
January 25, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to King County Superior Court, filed by Plaintiff Michael V Tran. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/16/2024, (Jorgensen, Jean)
January 25, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to King County Superior Court, filed by Plaintiff Michael V Tran. Noting Date 2/16/2024, (Jorgensen, Jean)
January 22, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 1/29/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
January 22, 2024 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court jury demand on file (CC: ad hoc atty Inos and atty Stanton email per Certificate of Service) (CR)
January 22, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (cc: ad hoc atty Inos email) (CR)
January 22, 2024 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (CR)
January 22, 2024 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), DEFENDANT must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/29/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (CR)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court JURY DEMAND by Defendant attached as separate document; from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-04136-6; (Receipt # BWAWDC-8316796) filed by American Commerce Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-H)(Foxen, Isabella) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2024: #3 State Court Complaint) (CR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. Li et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael V. Tran
Represented By: Edward K Le
Represented By: Jean Barr Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael V Tran
Represented By: Edward K Le
Represented By: Jean Barr Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hao B. Li
Represented By: Andrew Paul Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Li
Represented By: Andrew Paul Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Commerce Insurance Company
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Represented By: William L Weber, III
Represented By: Isabella M Foxen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hao B Li
Represented By: Andrew Paul Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?