Watt v. Holland America Line NV et al
Plaintiff: Lorrie Watt
Defendant: Holland America Line NV doing business as Holland America Line NV LLC (dba), HAL Antillen NV LLC, Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line-USA Inc, ONESPAWORLD US Inc, Holland America Line NV doing business as Holland America Line NV LLC, Holland America Line USA Inc, One Spa World US Inc and Onespa World (Bahamas) Limited
Case Number: 2:2024cv00155
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re Parties' #23 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Substitute Defendant. Defendant One Spa World US Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Onespa World (Bahamas) Limited, added. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MJV)
April 1, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT, OSWS, RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, filed by Defendant One Spa World US Inc. Noting Date 4/26/2024, (Fagenson, Rachael)
April 1, 2024 Filing 23 Joint Stipulated MOTION JOINT STIPULATION SUBSITUTING DEFENDANT ONESPAWORLD (BAHAMAS) LIMITED AS THE PROPER DEFENDANT AND DISMISSING ONESPA WORLD U.S. INC., filed by Defendant One Spa World US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/1/2024, (Fagenson, Rachael)
March 29, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss HOLLAND AMERICA DEFENDANTS RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, filed by Defendants HAL Antillen NV LLC, Holland America Line NV. Noting Date 4/26/2024, (Fagenson, Rachael)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #20 Stipulated Motion. Defendants Holland America Line Inc and Holland America Line USA Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MJV)
March 26, 2024 Filing 20 Joint MOTION JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PROPER PARTY DEFENDANTS AND FOR DISMISSAL OF HOLLAND AMERICA LINE INC. AND HOLLAND AMERICA LINE-USA INC. , filed by Defendants Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line USA Inc. Noting Date 3/26/2024, (Fagenson, Rachael)
March 21, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Debora Silberman on behalf of Plaintiff Lorrie Watt. (Silberman, Debora)
March 18, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brasilia Echevarria on behalf of Defendant One Spa World US Inc. (Echevarria, Brasilia)
March 18, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brasilia Echevarria on behalf of Defendants HAL Antillen NV LLC, Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line NV, Holland America Line USA Inc. (Echevarria, Brasilia)
March 18, 2024 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #10 Notice of Appearance, #11 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Brasilia Echevarria. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (MJV)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The Court being fully advised hereby ORDERS that the deadline for Defendants, HOLLAND AMERICA LINE N.V. d/b/a HOLLAND AMERICA LINE N.V. LLC, HAL ANTILLEN N.V. LLC, HOLLAND AMERICA LINE INC., and HOLLAND AMERICA LINE USA INC. (collectively HAL Defendants) to file their Response (Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss) to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended by fourteen (14) days and is now due on or before 3/29/2024. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MJV)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The Court being fully advised hereby ORDERS that the deadline for Defendant, ONESPAWORLD U.S., INC. (OSW), to file its Response (Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss) to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended by fourteen (14) days and is now due on or before 4/1/2024. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MJV)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 4/19/2024. (VE)
March 14, 2024 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant One Spa World US Inc. Noting Date 3/14/2024, (Fagenson, Rachael)
March 14, 2024 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants HAL Antillen NV LLC, Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line NV, Holland America Line USA Inc. Noting Date 3/14/2024, (Fagenson, Rachael)
March 14, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachael Fagenson on behalf of Defendant One Spa World US Inc. (Fagenson, Rachael)
March 14, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachael Fagenson on behalf of Defendants HAL Antillen NV LLC, Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line NV, Holland America Line USA Inc. (Fagenson, Rachael)
March 12, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on ONESPAWORLD U.S., INC. on 2/26/2024, filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Watt. (Moore, Bradley)
February 26, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Holland America Line-USA, Inc. on 2/23/2024, filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Watt. (Moore, Bradley)
February 26, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Holland America Line, Inc. on 2/23/2024, filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Watt. (Moore, Bradley)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Holland America Line Antillen NV, LLC on 2/23/2024, filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Watt. (Moore, Bradley)
February 26, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Holland America Line, NV on 2/23/2024, filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Watt. (Moore, Bradley)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) HAL Antillen NV LLC, Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line NV, Holland America Line USA Inc, One Spa World US Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MJV)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,,. ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. CC via Ad Hoc Attorney Silberman(MIH)
February 7, 2024 Filing 2 Disregard Docketed In Error Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Compliance with LCR 83.2 - Attorney Appearance and Withdrawal, Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MIH) Modified on 2/7/2024 Filed in error (MIH).
February 7, 2024 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (MIH)
February 7, 2024 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #2 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter, Disregard docket #2 , see corrected Notice at docket #3 : CC Attorney Silberman via Ad Hoc(MIH)
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) HAL Antillen NV LLC, Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line NV, Holland America Line-USA Inc, ONESPAWORLD US Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8341319) Attorney Bradley Jerome Moore added to party Lorrie Watt(pty:pla) filed by Lorrie Watt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to HOLLAND AMERICA LINE N.V. dba HOLLAND AMERICA LINE N.V. LLC, #3 Summons Summons to HAL ANTILLEN N.V. LLC, #4 Summons Summons to HOLLAND AMERICA LINE, INC., #5 Summons Summons to HOLLAND AMERICA LINE-USA INC., #6 Summons Summons to ONESPAWORLD U.S., INC.)(Moore, Bradley) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/8/2024 due to malformed PDF) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watt v. Holland America Line NV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrie Watt
Represented By: Bradley Jerome Moore
Represented By: Debora Silberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line NV doing business as Holland America Line NV LLC (dba)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAL Antillen NV LLC
Represented By: Brasilia Echevarria
Represented By: Rachael Fagenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line Inc
Represented By: Brasilia Echevarria
Represented By: Rachael Fagenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line-USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONESPAWORLD US Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line NV doing business as Holland America Line NV LLC
Represented By: Brasilia Echevarria
Represented By: Rachael Fagenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line USA Inc
Represented By: Brasilia Echevarria
Represented By: Rachael Fagenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Spa World US Inc
Represented By: Brasilia Echevarria
Represented By: Rachael Fagenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onespa World (Bahamas) Limited
Represented By: Brasilia Echevarria
Represented By: Rachael Fagenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?