Ponton et al v. JP Morgan Chase & Co et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Ponton, Sr, Tomika Ponton, Ronald Ponton, Sr doing business as Mexico Moving Company and Ronald Ponton, Sr individually and doing business as Mexico Moving Company
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2024cv00248
Filed: February 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 ***Motion terminated: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case and #1 Complaint filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, JP Morgan Chase & Co is STRICKEN pursuant to Defendants' #25 NOTICE to Strike Motion. (VE)
April 4, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE TO STRIKE re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case , #1 Complaint ; filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Devlin, John)
April 2, 2024 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA mailed on 4/1/2024 (Henry, Christina)
April 2, 2024 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant JP Morgan Chase & Co mailed on 4/1/2024 (Henry, Christina)
March 22, 2024 Filing 22 REPLY, filed by All Plaintiffs, TO RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Transfer Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - SD Texas Admissions, #3 Exhibit C- Emails with Counsel, #4 Exhibit D - Court's Docket Order on Stipulation, #5 Exhibit E - Satisfaction of Judgment, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Ronald Ponton Sr, #7 Exhibit G -Declaration of Tomika Ponton)(Springs, Venus)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Cedillos for DEFENDANTS JP Morgan Chase & Co and JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Venus Yvette Springs for PLAINTIFFS Ronald Ponton, Sr and Tomika Ponton, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 19, 2024 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #15 by attorney Michael Cedillos will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or #WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (MG)
March 18, 2024 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, to #4 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Proposed Order)(Devlin, John)
March 15, 2024 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case , #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(Devlin, John)
March 13, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Ronald Ponton, Sr, Tomika Ponton, to #4 MOTION to Transfer Case , #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case , #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Henry, Christina)
March 12, 2024 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Venus Springs FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Ronald Ponton, Sr, Tomika Ponton (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8386527 (Henry, Christina)
March 12, 2024 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael Cedillos FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8386275 (Devlin, John)
March 7, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:22-cv-00307-RSM, by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Devlin, John)
March 7, 2024 Filing 13 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
March 7, 2024 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The Court acknowledges the requirements of FRCP 16(b), but finds good cause to defer entry of an initial case scheduling order pending its ruling on Plaintiffs' #4 MOTION to Transfer Case. (VE)
March 7, 2024 CASE REASSIGNED to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. All future documents filed in this case must bear the cause number 2:24-CV-0248-RAJ. (KMP)
March 6, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour for all further proceedings, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. The Honorable Grady J Leupold is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM)
March 5, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John S Devlin, III on behalf of Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Devlin, John)
March 4, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JP Morgan Chase & Co. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Long, Timothy)
March 4, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Long, Timothy)
March 4, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 3/11/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
March 4, 2024 Noting Date Reset re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case, Noting Date: 3/22/2024; #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Response, Noting Date: 3/15/2024. (MW)
March 1, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case , #1 Complaint , filed by Defendants JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Noting Date 3/15/2024 3/1/2024, (Long, Timothy) Modified on 3/4/2024 (MW).
March 1, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy J. Long on behalf of Defendant JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Long, Timothy)
March 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy J. Long on behalf of Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Long, Timothy)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Plaintiffs Ronald Ponton, Sr, Tomika Ponton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Noting Date 3/22/2024 2/28/2024, (Henry, Christina) Modified on 3/4/2024 (MW).
February 27, 2024 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MIH) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/28/2024 to flatten image) (MIH).
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Pro Hac Vice Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Modified on 2/27/2024 to add CC information (MIH) CC via Ad Hoc for Attorney Venus Yvette Springs.
February 27, 2024 Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold added. (MIH)
February 27, 2024 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff dba Mexico Moving Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/5/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MIH)
February 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # CWAWDC-8362897) filed by Tomika Ponton, Ronald Ponton, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Henry, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponton et al v. JP Morgan Chase & Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ponton, Sr
Represented By: Christina Latta Henry
Represented By: Venus Yvette Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomika Ponton
Represented By: Christina Latta Henry
Represented By: Venus Yvette Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ponton, Sr doing business as Mexico Moving Company
Represented By: Christina Latta Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ponton, Sr individually and doing business as Mexico Moving Company
Represented By: Venus Yvette Springs
Represented By: Christina Latta Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co
Represented By: Michael Cedillos
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Timothy J. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Michael Cedillos
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Timothy J. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?