Barbu v. Pacific Market International LLC
Plaintiff: Laura Barbu
Defendant: Pacific Market International LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00258
Filed: February 24, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Referring Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Filing 30 REPLY, filed by Defendant Pacific Market International LLC, TO RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Stay All Proceedings (Wahi, Pallavi)
April 8, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate ; filed by Defendant Pacific Market International LLC. (Wahi, Pallavi)
April 8, 2024 Filing 28 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Laura Barbu, to #23 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Stay All Proceedings. Oral Argument Requested. (Feldman, Lori)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Parties' #26 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer; Defendants answer due 5/24/2024. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
April 5, 2024 Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Pacific Market International LLC. Noting Date 4/5/2024, (Wahi, Pallavi)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Parties' #24 Stipulated MOTION For Agreed Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's #23 Motion to dismiss is RENOTED for 4/12/2024. Plaintiff SHALL file her response on 4/8/2024. Defendant SHALL file its reply on 4/12/2024. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
April 4, 2024 Filing 24 Stipulated MOTION For Agreed Briefing Schedule On Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Stay All Proceedings, filed by Defendant Pacific Market International LLC. Noting Date 4/4/2024, (Wahi, Pallavi)
April 2, 2024 Notice of Re-Setting Deadline(s) re Parties' #18 Notice/Stipulation. Pursuant to section III(A) of Judge Lin's Standing Order, the FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/31/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/14/2024, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 6/28/2024. (MJV)
March 29, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Stay All Proceedings, filed by Defendant Pacific Market International LLC. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 4/12/2024 4/26/2024 (Wahi, Pallavi) Modified noting date on 4/4/2024 (MJV).
March 29, 2024 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The HAVI Group LP, Other Affiliate PMI WW Brands, LLC, Other Affiliate PMI for Pacific Market International LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Pacific Market International LLC. (Wahi, Pallavi)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney E Alex Beroukhim for DEFENDANT Pacific Market International LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James F Speyer for PLAINTIFF Pacific Market International LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elie Salamon for DEFENDANT Pacific Market International LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 28, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE To Extend Initial Case Scheduling Deadlines ; filed by Defendant Pacific Market International LLC. (Wahi, Pallavi)
March 28, 2024 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY E. Alex Beroukhim FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Pacific Market International LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8408851 (Wahi, Pallavi)
March 28, 2024 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James F. Speyer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Pacific Market International LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8408849 (Wahi, Pallavi)
March 28, 2024 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elie Salamon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Pacific Market International LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8408843 (Wahi, Pallavi)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/24/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/8/2024, Joint Status Report due by 5/22/2024. (KMP)
March 27, 2024 Notice of Re-Setting Deadline(s) re Parties' #13 Notice/Stipulation. Pursuant to section III(A) of Judge Lin's Standing Order, Pacific Market International LLC's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 4/15/2024. (MJV)
March 27, 2024 Attorney Shelby Renee Stoner added for Defendant Pacific Market International LLC; per #12 Notice of Appearance. (MJV)
March 26, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Joint Parties Extending Deadlines ; filed by Defendant Pacific Market International LLC. (Wahi, Pallavi)
March 26, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Pallavi Mehta Wahi on behalf of Defendant Pacific Market International LLC. (Wahi, Pallavi)
March 25, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Joint Motion to Consolidate ; filed by Plaintiff Laura Barbu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Consolidate)(Feldman, Lori)
March 25, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Pacific Market International, LLC on 2/29/2024, filed by Plaintiff Laura Barbu. (Feldman, Lori)
March 18, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at #https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE (Text Only). Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin for all further proceedings related to 2:24-cv-00191-TL and 2:24-cv-00200-TL. Judge Lauren King no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (SS)
March 1, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:24-cv-00191-TL and 2:24-cv-00200-TL, by Plaintiff Laura Barbu. (Feldman, Lori)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
February 26, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Pro Hac Vice Admission, Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 3/4/2024. cc via ad hoc/ Attorney George(CDA)
February 26, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Pacific Market International LLC (CR)
February 26, 2024 Judge Lauren King added. (CR)
February 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Pacific Market International Laura Barbu with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8364528) Attorney Lori G Feldman added to party Laura Barbu(pty:pla) filed by Laura Barbu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Feldman, Lori) Modified on 2/26/2024 (STP). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/26/2024 due to malformed PDF) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbu v. Pacific Market International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Barbu
Represented By: Lori G Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Market International LLC
Represented By: E Alex Beroukhim
Represented By: Elie Salamon
Represented By: James F Speyer
Represented By: Pallavi Mehta Wahi
Represented By: Shelby Renee Stoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?