Moussa v. Safeway Inc et al
Plaintiff: Zeina A. Moussa and Zeina A Moussa
Defendant: Petro Haulers, Inc., Safeway Inc., James Clayton, Jane Doe Clayton, Petro Haulers Express, LLC, Petro Haulers Inc, Safeway Inc and Petro Haulers Express LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00281
Filed: February 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Kymberly K Evanson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Length of Trial: *7-8 days*. Jury Trial is set for 5/5/2025 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Joinder of Parties due by 5/7/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/7/2024, Discovery Motions due by 11/6/2024, Discovery completed by 12/6/2024, Dispositive motions due by 1/6/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 3/6/2025, Motions in Limine due by 3/31/2025, Proposed jury instructions due by 4/14/2025, Pretrial Order due by 4/14/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/21/2025, Proposed voir dire questions due by 4/21/2025, Deposition Designations due by 4/21/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2025 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
April 8, 2024 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7-8. (Smith, Scott)
March 14, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Scott David Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Zeina A Moussa. (Smith, Scott)
March 14, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Francisco Alfredo Duarte on behalf of Plaintiff Zeina A Moussa. (Duarte, Francisco)
March 8, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Petro Haulers Inc. (Pujolar, Martin)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/28/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/11/2024, Joint Status Report due by 4/18/2024. (DS)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson for all further proceedings, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. The Honorable Grady J Leupold is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM)
March 6, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 3/13/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
March 4, 2024 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file (MIH)
March 4, 2024 Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold added. (MIH)
March 4, 2024 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Petro Haulers Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/11/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MIH)
February 29, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal with JURY DEMAND by Safeway Inc..(Kugler, John)
February 29, 2024 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Safeway Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court records)(Kugler, John)
February 29, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Albertsons Companies, Inc. for Safeway Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Safeway Inc.. (Kugler, John)
February 29, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-22213-0 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8370797) filed by Safeway Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kugler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moussa v. Safeway Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Haulers, Inc.
Represented By: Martin J Pujolar
Represented By: Paul S Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Represented By: John Turner Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Clayton
Represented By: Martin J Pujolar
Represented By: Paul S Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Clayton
Represented By: Martin J Pujolar
Represented By: Paul S Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Haulers Express, LLC
Represented By: Martin J Pujolar
Represented By: Paul S Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Haulers Inc
Represented By: Martin J Pujolar
Represented By: Paul S Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc
Represented By: John Turner Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Haulers Express LLC
Represented By: Paul S Smith, III
Represented By: Martin J Pujolar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeina A. Moussa
Represented By: Preet Bassi Kode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeina A Moussa
Represented By: Preet Bassi Kode
Represented By: Francisco Alfredo Duarte
Represented By: Scott David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?