Tuumalo v. United States Passport Agency
Plaintiff: Misikana Tuumalo
Defendant: U.S. Passport Agency and United States Passport Agency
Case Number: 2:2024cv00286
Filed: March 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the State Department's motion for relief from a deadline (Dkt. #5 ) and VACATES its initial scheduling order (Dkt. #4 ). The Court will not issue another scheduling order until after Ms. Tuumalo perfects service and the pleadings have closed. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SS) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
March 14, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Relief from Deadline, filed by Defendant United States Passport Agency. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/22/2024, (Strong, James)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/26/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/9/2024. (AD) cc: Plaintiff via US mail
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CC: Pro Se Plaintiff via USPS)(MIH)
March 4, 2024 Judge James L. Robart added. (MIH)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant United States Passport Agency (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strong, James)
March 1, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court case number 23-2-06830-1 SEA; filed by United States Passport Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strong, James) (No Fee Required) Modified on 3/4/2024 to add Complaint text to attachment (MIH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuumalo v. United States Passport Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misikana Tuumalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Passport Agency
Represented By: James C. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Passport Agency
Represented By: James C. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?