Baker v. Avenue 5 Residential et al
Plaintiff: Justin Baker
Defendant: Avenue 5 Residential and Columbia Washington Walton Lofts Residential Properties LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00300
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #18 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA)
April 13, 2024 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Appoint Counsel Amended complaint and letters for attorney, filed by Plaintiff Justin Baker. (Attachments: #1 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel My letter for Honorable Coughenour, #2 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel Mental counselor letter for Honorable Coughenour) Noting Date 4/15/2024, (Baker, Justin)
March 30, 2024 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by Justin Baker. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint page 2 defendant 2 amended complaint, #2 Summons summons for amended complaints)(Baker, Justin)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP)
March 28, 2024 Filing 15 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Avenue 5 Residential, Columbia Washington Walton Lofts Residential Properties LLC. (KRA)
March 27, 2024 Filing 14 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #12 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter corrected for address missing by Plaintiff Justin Baker (Baker, Justin)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA)
March 27, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #10 Praecipe for a Summons. ***Action Required*** Summons Form Incomplete.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KRA)
March 27, 2024 Filing 11 Disregard filed in error Notice of Filing Deficiency re #10 Praecipe for a Summons. ***Action Required*** Summons Form Incomplete.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KRA) Modified to strike duplicative entry, no document attached, see corrected entry at Dkt. No. #12 on 3/27/2024 (KRA).
March 26, 2024 Filing 10 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Justin Baker (Baker, Justin)
March 15, 2024 Filing 9 Proposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel for equitable disabilities access to representation for medically incapable plaintiff, filed by Plaintiff Justin Baker. (Attachments: #1 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel Letter from UW to equitably participate in court, #2 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel UW letter of accommodations for living environment, #3 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel Washington State Human Rights Commission findings of elements to prevail, #4 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel UW medical letter to support living situation, #5 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel Personal letter to your honor requesting equitable representation) Noting Date 3/15/2024, (Baker, Justin)
March 12, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE: Plaintiff Justin Baker has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
March 11, 2024 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (IFP Granted), filed by Justin Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (KRA)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (KRA) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
March 11, 2024 IFP deficiency corrected re #3 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter. (KRA) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
March 8, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge S. Kate Vaughan filed by Justin Baker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Email Transmission) (KRA)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Justin Baker. (Attachments: #1 Email Transmission) (KRA)
March 5, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid, Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 4/4/2024 to correct IFP application (cc: Letter and IFP form to plaintiff via USPS) (CR)
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 PROPOSED Complaint and Request of Injunction filed by Plaintiff Justin Baker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Email Transmission of Case) (CR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Avenue 5 Residential et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Baker
Represented By: Justin Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avenue 5 Residential
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Washington Walton Lofts Residential Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?