Islas v. Bank of America
Plaintiff: Ivan Gabriel Islas
Defendant: Bank of America
Case Number: 2:2024cv00493
Filed: April 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Ivan Gabriel Islas. Noted by clerk for 5/3/2024. (SB)
April 16, 2024 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (IFP Granted) filed by Ivan Gabriel Islas. (SB)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court recommends the complaint be reviewed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) before issuance of summons. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
April 16, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #2 Sealed Document. ***Action Required*** Redaction.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KS) (cc Plaintiff via USPS)
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson. ***Action Required*** Summons in Wrong Format.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KS) (cc plaintiff via USPS)
April 11, 2024 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit by Plaintiff Ivan Gabriel Islas re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson. Sealed administratively due to personal information. (KS)
April 11, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson filed by Ivan Gabriel Islas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Application for Court-Appointed Counsel, #5 Proposed Summons (signed by plaintiff)) (KS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Islas v. Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Gabriel Islas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?