Branch v. Boe
Petitioner: Derrick Branch
Respondent: Jeri Boe
Case Number: 2:2024cv00517
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address Filed by Petitioner Derrick Branch. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(AMD)
June 10, 2024 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD filed by Respondent Jeri Boe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, pages 1-331, #2 Exhibit 11-21, pages 332-889, #3 Exhibit 22-50, pages 890-3272, #4 Exhibit 51-56, pages 3273-3923)**PRINT NEF ONLY: Documents will be served in paper form.**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(Samson, John)
June 10, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Jeri Boe. Noting Date 7/8/2024, **PRINT ALL**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(Samson, John)
June 10, 2024 ***Option to Consent deadline terminated. Case remains assigned as is, no further action necessary. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(GMR)
June 10, 2024 Per Clallam Bay Correction Center, Mr. Branch is currently at Washington Correction Center awaiting transfer to Airway Heights Correction Center. Plaintiff's address updated to and docket entries for 6/10/2024 re-generated to Mr. Branch, including dkt. #10 and #11 . **DO NOT PRINT**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(AMD)
June 10, 2024 NOTICE TO FILER: re #12 Notice of Change of Address. RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington Corrections Center-Shelton. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(AMD)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(AMD)
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Joseph Samson on behalf of Respondent Jeri Boe. **PRINT ALL**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(Samson, John)
May 7, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. To consent to a US Magistrate Judge, return the executed form by 6/6/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(TE)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 28 U.C.S. 2254 PETITION by email upon Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington. Signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (This Order, Notice of Option of Consent, & PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus #4 emailed on 5/7/2024) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(TE)
May 7, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed by Petitioner Derrick Branch. Noting Date 5/28/2024, **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(TE)
May 7, 2024 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # IFP Granted) filed by Derrick Branch.**76 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(TE)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(TE)
April 16, 2024 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(AMD)
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theresa L Fricke, filed by Derrick Branch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 Proposed Motion to Appoint Counsel)**84 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Derrick Branch, Prisoner ID: 376096)(AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch v. Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeri Boe
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?