Oatway v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Jordan Oatway
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., 700 Credit, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc and 700 Credit LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00523
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/9/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/23/2024, Joint Status Report due by 8/6/2024. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Wadsworth, Sara)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Oren R Depp for DEFENDANT Experian Information Solutions Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Oren R. Depp FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8487592 (Wadsworth, Sara)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant 700 Credit LLC. (NAW)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. No party has opposed the motion, and Experian has shown good cause. Experian must respond to the complaint by June 10, 2024. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lauren King for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Default against 700 Credit, LLC,, filed by Plaintiff Tyler Jordan Oatway. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dawn McCraw, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2024, (McCraw, Dawn)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/24/2024, (Wadsworth, Sara)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Wadsworth, Sara)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sara Jane Wadsworth on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Wadsworth, Sara)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant 700 Credit LLC on 4/24/2024 (McCraw, Dawn)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc on 4/24/2024 (McCraw, Dawn)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to Defendants 700 Credit LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons) (KS)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge David W. Christel added. (KS)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) 700 Credit, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8433344) Attorney Dawn M McCraw added to party Tyler Jordan Oatway(pty:pla) filed by Tyler Jordan Oatway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #3 Summons Proposed Summons as to 700 Credit, LLC)(McCraw, Dawn) Modified on 4/18/2024 to strike redundant document labels (KS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oatway v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Jordan Oatway
Represented By: Dawn M McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 700 Credit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Oren R Depp
Represented By: Sara Jane Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 700 Credit LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?