Brown et al v. Pacific Market International LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mackenzie Brown, Meiling Robinson, Shea Ritchie and Nora McCarl
Defendant: Pacific Market International LLC and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 2:2024cv00635
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2024 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at #https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
May 8, 2024 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Davit Avagyan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Mackenzie Brown, Shea Ritchie, Meiling Robinson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8460096 (Dennett, Jason)
May 7, 2024 Filing 24 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Central California and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MIH)
May 7, 2024 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of California Central, Case Number 2:24-cv-01765. (MIH)
May 7, 2024 Judge Tana Lin added. (MIH)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE #19 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Having considered the stipulation of Plaintiffs Mackenzie Brown, Meiling Robinson, and Shea Ritchie and Defendant Pacific Market International, LLC, and for good cause appearing therein, the stipulation is GRANTED. This action is hereby TRANSFERRED in its entirety, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington, where three related actions are currently pending before the Hon. Tana Lin. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to transfer this action to the Western District of Washington. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rolm) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
April 30, 2024 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of Defendants stipulated transfer request filed by Plaintiffs Mackenzie Brown, Shea Ritchie, Meiling Robinson. (Avagyan, Davit) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
April 24, 2024 Filing 20 Notice Plaintiffs Notice of Nonopposition to Defendants Transfer Request filed by Plaintiffs Mackenzie Brown, Shea Ritchie, Meiling Robinson. (McCarl, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 21, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington filed by Defendant Pacific Market International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Speyer, James) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiff Nora McCarl's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #12 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with regard to Nora McCarl ONLY; and 2. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar with regard to Nora McCarl ONLY. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Not Signed In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. MISSING proposed order to DISMISS ONLY ONE PLAINTIFF From the case and first amended complaint... (as to plaintiff Nora McCarl) Other error(s) with document(s): As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as a Separate Attachment thereto.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 19, 2024 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan McCarl counsel for Plaintiffs Mackenzie Brown, Nora McCarl, Shea Ritchie, Meiling Robinson. Elisabeth Nations is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Mackenzie Brown et al.. (McCarl, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 19, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel Rushing McCarl LLP. (McCarl, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 19, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan McCarl counsel for Plaintiffs Mackenzie Brown, Nora McCarl, Shea Ritchie, Meiling Robinson. Elisabeth Nations is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Mackenzie Brown. (McCarl, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 19, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Nora McCarl pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to All Defendants. (McCarl, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 19, 2024 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Plaintiffs amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Mackenzie Brown(McCarl, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #9 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. The stipulation is GRANTED. 2. PMI's deadline to respond to the initial complaint is HELD IN ABEYANCE until Plaintiffs file an amended pleading. 3. PMI shall file its response to Plaintiffs' forthcoming amended pleading within 60 days after service of the amended pleading. (rolm) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 8, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Order To Extend Time To Respond To Initial Complaint filed by defendant Pacific Market International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Speyer, James) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR Motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) Modified on 3/6/2024 (lc). [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 5, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 5, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 5, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 4, 2024 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, Pacific Market International, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Meiling Robinson, Shea Ritchie, Mackenzie Brown, Nora McCarl. Filed in State Court on 2/1/2024 Submitted with Attachment Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 4, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions of Proceedings Pursuant to Local Rule 83-1.4 filed by Defendant Pacific Market International, LLC. (Speyer, James) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pacific Market International, LLC, identifying The HAVI Group, LP. (Speyer, James) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 4, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Pacific Market International, LLC. (Speyer, James) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CA Superior Court Los Angeles County, case number 24STCV02653 Receipt No: ACACDC-37027995 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Pacific Market International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Summons, #3 Exhibit C Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Exhibit E Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet, #6 Exhibit F Minute Order, #7 Exhibit G Certificate of Mailing, #8 Exhibit H Initial Status Conference Order, #9 Exhibit I Certificate of Mailing, #10 Exhibit J Minute Order) (Attorney James F. Speyer added to party Pacific Market International, LLC(pty:dft))(Speyer, James) [Transferred from cacd on 5/7/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Pacific Market International LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mackenzie Brown
Represented By: Elisabeth Grace Nations
Represented By: John Rushing
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Ryan McCarl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meiling Robinson
Represented By: Davit Avagyan
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Elisabeth Grace Nations
Represented By: John Rushing
Represented By: Ryan McCarl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shea Ritchie
Represented By: Davit Avagyan
Represented By: Elisabeth Grace Nations
Represented By: John Rushing
Represented By: Ryan McCarl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora McCarl
Represented By: Davit Avagyan
Represented By: Elisabeth Grace Nations
Represented By: John Rushing
Represented By: Ryan McCarl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Market International LLC
Represented By: E Alex Beroukhim
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: James F Speyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?