Amazon.com, Inc. et al v. Bartley et al
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc and The Ergo Baby Carrier Inc
Defendant: Justin Raley, Michael Bartley, Sebastian Gonzalez Rojas, Kathryn Sposato, Ikon Namdidie, Michael Sutton, Does 1-10, Jean Batalien, Rachel Diekmann, Hazel Flores an individual doing business as Webox.com Prep Center and Jean St Vil
Case Number: 2:2024cv01188
Filed: August 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2024 Filing 20 Amended Summons issued as to Defendant Sebastian Gonzalez Rojas. (KRA)
September 4, 2024 Filing 19 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, as to Sebastian Gonzalez Rojas by Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC, The Ergo Baby Carrier Inc (Commerson, Scott)
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/2/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/9/2024. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
August 7, 2024 Filing 17 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Michael Bartley, Rachel Diekmann, Hazel Flores, Jean Batalien, Ikon Namdidie, Justin Raley, Sebastian Gonzalez Rojas, Kathryn Sposato, Jean St Vil, Michael Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons) (RE)
August 7, 2024 Filing 16 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (RE)
August 7, 2024 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE)
August 5, 2024 Filing 15 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, re Sebastian Gonzalez Rojas by All Plaintiffs (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 14 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, re Rachel Diekmann by All Plaintiffs (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 13 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, re Namdidie Ikon by All Plaintiffs (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 12 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, re Michael Sutton by All Plaintiffs (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 11 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, re Michael Bartley by All Plaintiffs (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 10 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, re Kathryn Sposato by All Plaintiffs (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, re Justin Raley by All Plaintiffs (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, re Jean St. Vil by All Plaintiffs (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, re Jean Batalien by All Plaintiffs (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, re Hazel Flores d/b/a Webox.com Prep Center by All Plaintiffs (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 5 PRAECIPE re #1 Complaint, Trademark Report by All Plaintiffs (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Counterfeit Enforcement Action ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Ergo Baby Intermediate Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate Ergo Baby Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate EBP Lifestyle Brands Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Compass Group Diversified Holdings, LLC for The Ergo Baby Carrier, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by The Ergo Baby Carrier, Inc.. (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Commerson, Scott)
August 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Equitable Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-8573822) filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., The Ergo Baby Carrier, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Commerson, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com, Inc. et al v. Bartley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebastian Gonzalez Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Sposato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ikon Namdidie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Batalien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Diekmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel Flores an individual doing business as Webox.com Prep Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean St Vil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ergo Baby Carrier Inc
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?