Rodriquez v. Astrue et al

Plaintiff: Diego M Rodriquez
Defendant: Michael J Astrue and Stephen Breen
Case Number: 3:2009cv05241
Filed: April 23, 2009
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 17 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
June 15, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re denial of the 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Diego M Rodriquez. Noting Date 7/10/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; copy mailed to Plaintiff)
May 28, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MULTITPLE MOTIONS - The folLowing motions are DENIED: 10 MOTION to demand this case assigned to United States District Court Judge Approved by Congress and the Senate of the Unites is my constitutitional right filed by Diego M Rodriquez; 8 MOTION for Mandamus Relief filed by Diego M Rodriquez; 9 MOTION for Mandamus filed by Diego M Rodriquez and 7 MOTION to Demand this case be assigned to USDC judge filed by Diego M Rodriquez. (Motions terminated). Order signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. (PL)
May 27, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Assign a District Court Judge, denying 8 Motion to Assign a District Court Judge, denying 9 Motion for Mandamus Reliefdenying 10 Motion for Mandamus Relief by Judge Karen L Strombom.(JLP)(copy mailed to Plaintiff)
May 1, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and 2 MOTION for Mandamus Relief. Show Cause Response/amended documents due by 5/31/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; copy mailed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriquez v. Astrue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego M Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?