Bailon et al v. Seok AM #1 Corp et al

Plaintiff: Atanacio Bailon, Miguel A Esquivel, Pablo Esquivel, E Ismael Guido, Jose M Morales and Adan Nieves
Defendant: Seok AM #1 Corp, Seok AM Corp, Sung Ki Min and Jane Doe Min
Case Number: 3:2009cv05483
Filed: August 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 28 Stipulated Motion re 30 Exhibit, 29 Stipulated MOTION SCHMITT DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATED MOTION RE DISMISSAL Defendant Seok AM#1 dismissed with prejudice. Court retains jurisdiction to enforce settlement agreement but otherwise will be administratively closed, by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SC)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial and Pretrial Deadlines. If a stipulated dismissal is not received sooner, the parties shall file a Status Report with the court by 6/14/2010, by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SC)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Protective Order by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SC)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO CLARIFY THE RECORD AND RENOTE 10 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims, to Strike Insufficient Defenses, and for Protective Order re: Immigration Status Discovery ; Noting Date 12/4/2009, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (SC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailon et al v. Seok AM #1 Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atanacio Bailon
Represented By: Andrea L Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A Esquivel
Represented By: Andrea L Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Esquivel
Represented By: Andrea L Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E Ismael Guido
Represented By: Andrea L Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M Morales
Represented By: Andrea L Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adan Nieves
Represented By: Andrea L Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seok AM #1 Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seok AM Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung Ki Min
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Min
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?