Clark v. Glebe et al
Plaintiff: Mark Wayne Clark
Defendant: Patrick R Glebe, Kerry Arlow, Al Lopez, Tambra Zander, Cheryl Matthynssens, Christopher Reed, Erik Knudson, John & Jane Does and Tracy Harding
Case Number: 3:2010cv05203
Filed: March 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2011 Filing 54 JUDGMENT BY COURT. (MET) cc: plaintiff
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #52 Dismissing this matter by Stipulation with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. Signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle. (DN) Modified on 4/1/2011 (DN). (Copy mailed to plaintiff.)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on the #51 Stipulated MOTION for Order of Dismissal filed by Pat Glebe, Al Lopez, Kerry Arlow. Noting Date 3/31/2011, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (MET) cc: Plaintiff
March 30, 2011 Filing 51 Stipulated MOTION for Order of Dismissal by Defendants Kerry Arlow, Pat Glebe, Al Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit pp 3-6, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/30/2011, (Carr, Douglas)
March 21, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION for Discovery by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support) Noted correctly by clerk for 4/8/2011. (MET)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER on STIPULATION re #48 Voluntarily Dismissing Defendants Christopher Reed, Tambra Zander, Erik Knudson, and Cheryl Matthynssens. Christopher Reed, Tambra Zander, Erik Knudson and Cheryl Matthynssens terminated with prejudice and without fees or costs to any of the parties. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 12/15/2010 (DN). (Copy mailed to plaintiff.)
December 6, 2010 Filing 48 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiffs Zander, Matthynssen, Reed & Knudson by parties. (Freimund, Jeffrey)
November 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #43 DENYING plaintiff's motion for entry of default, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/26/2010 (DN). (Copy mailed to plaintiff.)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time: Discovery completed by 5/9/2011, Dispositive motions due by 6/30/2011, and Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
November 15, 2010 Filing 45 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kerry Arlow, Pat Glebe, Al Lopez, to #44 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Carr, Douglas)
November 8, 2010 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. Noted correctly by clerk for 11/19/2010. (MET)
November 3, 2010 Filing 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #27 MOTION for Default filed by Mark Wayne Clark. Noting Date 11/26/2010, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (MET) cc: Plaintiff
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time; the plaintiff will have 45 days to properly serve the defendants; denying #41 Motion ; denying #25 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #26 Motion; and denying #29 Motion to Intervene signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. The following schedule shall now be applied: Discovery completed by 3/1/2011, Dispositive motions due by 4/21/2011, Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2011. (MET) cc: Plaintiff
November 3, 2010 MOTION REFERRED: re #43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #27 MOTION for Default filed by Mark Wayne Clark to Judge Leighton. (MET)
October 22, 2010 Filing 41 MOTION to Process Subpoenas re #37 Praecipe-Other by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Mark Clark) Noted by clerk for 11/12/2010. (MET)
October 22, 2010 Filing 40 RESPONSE, by Defendants Erik Knudson, Cheryl Matthynssens, Christopher Reed, Tambra Zander, to #38 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Freimund, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2010 Filing 39 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kerry Arlow, Pat Glebe, Al Lopez, to #38 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Carr, Douglas)
October 14, 2010 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. Noted correctly by clerk for 10/29/2010. (MET)
October 6, 2010 Filing 37 PRAECIPE for clerk to issue deposition subpoenas by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. (MET)
October 1, 2010 Filing 36 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kerry Arlow, Pat Glebe, Al Lopez, to #29 MOTION to Intervene. (Carr, Douglas)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #34 Motion for Reconsideration to Amend Complaint, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 9/30/2010 (DN). A copy of this Order was mailed to plaintiff by regular mail.
September 23, 2010 Filing 33 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kerry Arlow, Pat Glebe, Al Lopez, to #26 MOTION Withdraw Court's Scheduling Order re #18 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines. (Carr, Douglas)
September 23, 2010 Filing 32 RESPONSIVE BRIEF To Motion for Default by Defendants Erik Knudson, Cheryl Matthynssens, Christopher Reed, Tambra Zander.. (Freimund, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2010 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint of Mark Wayne Clark by Erik Knudson, Cheryl Matthynssens, Christopher Reed, Tambra Zander.(Freimund, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey A.O. Freimund on behalf of Defendants Erik Knudson, Cheryl Matthynssens, Christopher Reed, Tambra Zander, Tracy Harding. (Freimund, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2010 Filing 34 OBJECTION and/or MOTION for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's #24 Order denying the Motion to Amend by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. Noting Date 10/8/2010, (CMG)
September 22, 2010 REFERRING the #34 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order on Motion to Amend TO: Judge Leighton (CMG)
September 20, 2010 Filing 29 MOTION for Court Intervention by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. Noted by clerk for 10/8/2010. (MET)
September 15, 2010 Filing 28 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark, TO RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Amend #3 Complaint. (MET)
September 15, 2010 Filing 27 MOTION for Default on Defendants Who Have Not Served Notice of Appearance. by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. Noted correctly by clerk for 9/15/2010. (MET)
September 10, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Withdraw Court's Scheduling Order re #18 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. Noted correctly by clerk for 10/1/2010. (MET)
September 10, 2010 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. Noted correctly by clerk for 9/24/2010. (MET)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #20 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: Plaintiff
August 27, 2010 Filing 23 PRAECIPE to issue subpoena duces tecum to ISRB Records Custodian by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. Per lc ES subpoena was issued on proper form and returned to plaintiff on 9/1/10 with plaintiff's original subpoena to ISRB. (MET)
August 27, 2010 Filing 22 PRAECIPE to issue subpoena duces tecum to Spectrum Health Systems by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. Per lc ES subpoena was issued on proper form and returned to plaintiff on 9/1/10 with plaintiff's original subpoena to Spectrum Health. (MET)
August 27, 2010 Filing 21 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kerry Arlow, Pat Glebe, Al Lopez, to #20 MOTION to Amend #3 Complaint,,. (Carr, Douglas)
August 18, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend #3 Complaint, by Plaintiff Mark Wayne Clark. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint) Noted correctly by clerk for 9/3/2010, (MET)
August 18, 2010 Filing 19 Letter/request for clarification on scheduling order, USMO forms and other matters from Mark Wayne Clark. (MET)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery completed by 11/5/2010, Dispositive motions due by 12/3/2010, Joint Status Report due by 5/6/2011, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (MET) cc: Plaintiff
July 20, 2010 Filing 17 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND by Kerry Arlow, Pat Glebe, Al Lopez.(Carr, Douglas)
June 18, 2010 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE on Pat Glebe by US Marshal's Office re: Civil Rights Complaint on 6/4/10 (MET)
June 18, 2010 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE on Kerry Arlow by US Marshal's Office re: Civil Rights Complaint on 5/27/10 (MET)
June 18, 2010 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED on Erik Knudson by US Marshal's Office re: Civil Rights Complaint on 6/17/10; subject not located at provided address. (MET)
June 18, 2010 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office for Al Lopez re: Civil Rights Complaint on 6/9/10 (MET)
June 18, 2010 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED on 6/17/10 as to Cheryl Matthyassens by US Marshal's Office re: Civil Rights Complaint (MET)
June 18, 2010 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED on 6/17/10 by US Marshal's Office re: Civil Rights Complaint (MET)
June 16, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas Wayne Carr on behalf of Defendants Pat Glebe, Kerry Arlow, Al Lopez. (Carr, Douglas)
June 11, 2010 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Al Lopez mailed on 4/6/2010. (MET)
June 9, 2010 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Pat Glebe mailed on 6/4/2010 (MET)
June 3, 2010 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Kerry Arlow mailed on 4/6/2010 (MET)
June 1, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by Defendant Tambra Zander on 5/24/10 (MET)
May 27, 2010 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Tambra Zander mailed on 4/6/2010 (MET)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by US Marshal; Service packages for Defendants sent to USM on 4/6/10; General Order sent to Pltf. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
April 1, 2010 Filing 3 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against defendant John & Jane Does(Lead Oddyseey Supervisor of Spectrum Company), Pat Glebe, Kerry Arlow, Al Lopez, Tambra Zander, Cheryl Matthynssens, Christopher Reed, Erik Knudson, John & Jane Does(Owner of Spectrum Company (Oddyssey); (Receipt # T-7185). Filed by Mark Wayne Clark.(MET)
March 24, 2010 Filing 2 LETTER to Mark Wayne Clark re: IFP deficiency (no declaration/application, no acknowledgment/authorization, no trust account); only recd written consent - has until 4/26/2010 to correct. (MET)
March 24, 2010 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Mark Wayne Clark. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)(MET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Glebe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Wayne Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R Glebe
Represented By: Douglas Wayne Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Arlow
Represented By: Douglas Wayne Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Lopez
Represented By: Douglas Wayne Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tambra Zander
Represented By: Jeffrey A.O. Freimund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Matthynssens
Represented By: Jeffrey A.O. Freimund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Reed
Represented By: Jeffrey A.O. Freimund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Knudson
Represented By: Jeffrey A.O. Freimund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Harding
Represented By: Jeffrey A.O. Freimund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?