Boag et al v. Litton Loan Servicing et al
Plaintiff: Randy Boag and Katherine Boag
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing, HSBC Bank USA, Northwest Trustee Services Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Does 1-10, Ownit Mortgage Solutions Inc, Wells Fargo Bank and Discovery Financial Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv05838
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle sanctioning Robert Penfield. (TG)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle re: 65 MOTION for Relief From Deadlines and 57 MOTION for Relief Motion for Relief from Discovery Orders and Other Relief: RENOTED to 10/25/2013. Plaintiffs to show cause by 10/18/2013 why action should not be remanded to state court. Attorney Penfield to show cause by 10/16/2013 why sanctions should not be imposed on him. (TG)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Compel by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle Granting Dismissal of Certain Claims re Dkts. 15 and 19. (TG)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 45 Motion to Compel and requiring Plaintiffs to respond and pay monetary sanctions.(TG)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss; Wells Fargo Bank terminated. (TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boag et al v. Litton Loan Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Boag
Represented By: Charles M. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Boag
Represented By: Charles M. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ownit Mortgage Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery Financial Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?