Harris v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Damien Harris
Defendant: Dusty Pierpoint, Scott Jackson, Thurston County, Thurston County Narcotics Task Force, City of Lacey, Lacey Police Department, State of Washington, Rob McKenna, Bernard Warner, Michael Boone, Kenneth Lundquist and Loreli Thompson
Case Number: 3:2012cv06008
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 37 Granting Plaintiff's motion to dismiss this action without prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 8/22/2014 (DN). (cc to pltf)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the undersigned denies Mr. Harris' 31 Motion to Continue the stay and lifts the stay in this case. The undersigned will give Defendants who have appeared until 8/1/2014, to file an answer or other appropriate pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER directing plaintiff to file an updated status by 3/28/14. Plaintiff will need to inform the Court why a stay of this action is still appropriate. Defendants may file a response to Plaintiff's status report on or before 4/4/14. Clerk office is instructed to note this matter for the Court's review on 4/11/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay; granting 15 Motion to Amend. The Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint as his amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dusty Pierpoint
Represented By: Julie Kamerrer Carignan
Represented By: Donald L Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jackson
Represented By: David V. Klumpp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thurston County
Represented By: David V. Klumpp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thurston County Narcotics Task Force
Represented By: David V. Klumpp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lacey
Represented By: Julie Kamerrer Carignan
Represented By: Donald L Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Police Department
Represented By: Julie Kamerrer Carignan
Represented By: Donald L Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob McKenna
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Warner
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Boone
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lundquist
Represented By: Julie Kamerrer Carignan
Represented By: Donald L Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loreli Thompson
Represented By: Julie Kamerrer Carignan
Represented By: Donald L Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?