Thomas v. Kellogg Company et al
Plaintiff: Patty Thomas, Jennifer Dowling, Kelley Dye, Jr, Robert Gibson, Laura Wisby, David Rink, Judy Brashear, David Mastenbrook, Armond McWell, Soliman Sayedi and Bruce Johnson
Defendant: Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, Kellogg USA Inc, Keebler Holding Corp, Keebler Foods Company and Keebler Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv05136
Filed: February 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (DK)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER approving the Parties' Final Settlement Agreement, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Re 559 Final Approval/Fairness Hearing (DK)
May 18, 2018 Filing 559 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Dara Kaleel; Pla Counsel: Matt Dunn (Pltf Patty Thomas present); Def Counsel: James Nelson, James Boudreau; CR: Kathy Vernon (Vernon & Assoc); Final Approval/Fairness Hearing held on 5/18/2018. No objections presented; Court finds settlement fair and reasonable; order of approving final settlement entered. RE #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs . (DK)
May 11, 2018 Filing 558 ERRATA re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Patty Thomas (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 557 DECLARATION of Matthew Dunn filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - updated list of the 750 Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit 2 - GSD Billing, #3 Exhibit 3 - P. Expenses, #4 Exhibit 3 - 1 - P. Expenses, #5 Exhibit 3 - 2 - P. Expenses, #6 Exhibit 3 - 3 - P. Expenses, #7 Exhibit 3 - 4- P. Expenses, #8 Exhibit 3 - 5 - P. Expenses, #9 Exhibit 3 - 6 - P. Expenses, #10 Exhibit 3 - 7 - P. Expenses, #11 Exhibit 3 -8 - P. Expenses, #12 Exhibit 3 - 9 - P. Expenses, #13 Exhibit 3 -10 - P. Expenses, #14 Exhibit 3 -11 - P. Expenses)(Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 556 DECLARATION of Edward Tuddenham filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 555 DECLARATION of Michael C. Subit filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 554 DECLARATION of Michelle J. Kopperud filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 553 DECLARATION of Thomas Perteete filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 552 DECLARATION of Susan Mayhugh filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 551 DECLARATION of Robert Gibson filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 550 DECLARATION of Patricia Thomas filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 549 DECLARATION of Michael Walz filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 548 DECLARATION of Michael Carns filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 547 DECLARATION of Loren Gerwick filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 546 DECLARATION of Laura Wisby filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 545 DECLARATION of Kelly Moore filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 544 DECLARATION of Judy Brashear filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 543 DECLARATION of Gregory Oyster filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 542 DECLARATION of Eddy Miller filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 541 DECLARATION of Deborah Ternet filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 540 DECLARATION of David Updyke filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 539 DECLARATION of Bruce Johnson filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 538 DECLARATION of Aleta Stock filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs (Dunn, Matt)
May 10, 2018 Filing 537 MOTION for Final Approval of FLSA Settlement, Service Payments, and Attorneys Fees and Costs , filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/18/2018, (Dunn, Matt)
March 28, 2018 Filing 536 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing Re Final Approval of FLSA Settlement set for 5/18/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom B before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER re #534 Stipulated MOTION for Preliminary Settlement Approval and to Authorize Notice, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK)
March 14, 2018 Filing 534 Stipulated MOTION for Preliminary Settlement Approval and to Authorize Notice, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dunn Declaration, #2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit Proposed Notice, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/14/2018, (Dunn, Matt)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 533 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Deadline to File Request for Approval of Settlement re #532 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time , signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
February 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deadline extended - Dismissal/Settlement papers now due by 3/14/2018. (DK)
February 23, 2018 ***Motion terminated: #532 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Request for Approval of the Settlement and Proposed Order filed by Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (DK)
February 22, 2018 Filing 532 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Request for Approval of the Settlement and Proposed Order, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Boudreau, James)
February 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deadline extended for dismissal paperwork. Dismissal/Settlement papers now due by 2/23/2018. (DK)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER granting #530 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Request Approval of the Settlement; the deadline to file the motion is 2/23/18; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 2/1/2018 (DN). (cc to Dan Getman)
January 31, 2018 Filing 530 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Request Approval of the Settlement and Proposed Order, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. Noting Date 1/31/2018, (Dunn, Matt)
January 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Court was notified this case settled on 12/15/17, therefore, Dismissal/Settlement papers are due by 2/6/2018. (DK)
December 14, 2017 Filing 529 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 268, 269, 270, and 271 and the Testimony of Plaintiffs' "Fact Witness," Jason Kandel at Trial Regarding Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 268, 269, 270, and 271; and, in the Alternative, for a Qualification Hearing Outside the Presence of the Jury to Determine the Scope of Mr. Kandel's Testimony Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 , filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/29/2017, (Nelson, James)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 528 MINUTE ORDER - Due to a delay in the Court's current trial, jury selection in this matter will begin on Tuesday, December 19, 2017 at 9:00 AM instead of on Monday, December 18; as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 14, 2017 Filing 527 OBJECTIONS re #526 Notice-Other,,,,,,,,, KELLOGG COMPANY AND KELLOGG SALES COMPANY'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION COUNTERDESIGNATIONS by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Nelson, James)
December 14, 2017 Filing 526 NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS ; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designation with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Baker, Alicia, #2 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Bell, David Scott, #3 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Carns, Michael, #4 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Dowling, Jennifer, #5 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Dye, Kelly, #6 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Gibson, Robert Part 1, #7 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations Part 2, #8 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Hoak, Kenneth, #9 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Kivett, Kelly, #10 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Mastenbrook, David, #11 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Oyster, Gregory, #12 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Perteete, Thomas, #13 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Rink, David, #14 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Smith, Joseph, #15 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Sumrall, Kurt, #16 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Tarr, Gus, #17 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Volk, Richard, #18 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Walz, Michael, #19 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Weiss, Jennifer, #20 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Whitehead, Thomas, #21 Exhibit Kellogg's Deposition Designations with Plaintiffs Counter Designations - Wisby, Laura)(Nelson, James)
December 14, 2017 Filing 525 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 1 Clifton, #2 2 Defendants' Counter Designation - Dombkiewicz, #3 2 Defendants' Counter Designation - Dombkiewicz II, #4 4 Groulx, #5 5 Kaminski, #6 6 Kaminski II, #7 7 Defendants' Counter Designation - Kelly_Part1, #8 7 Defendants' Counter Designation - Kelly_Part2, #9 7 Defendants' Counter Designation - Kelly_Part3, #10 7 Defendants' Counter Designation - Kelly_Part4, #11 7 Defendants' Counter Designation - Kelly_Part5, #12 8 Plaintiffs_ Dep Designations 2017.10.14 - Nilles - Kellogg Redactions, #13 9 Plaintiffs_ Dep Designations 2017.10.14 - OConnell - Kellogg Redactions, #14 10 Oldre,Keith, #15 11 Plaintiffs_ Dep Designations 2017.010.14 - Pennington - Kellogg Redactio..._Part1, #16 11 Plaintiffs_ Dep Designations 2017.010.14 - Pennington - Kellogg Redactio..._Part2, #17 12 Pennington II, #18 13 Defendants' Counter, #19 14 Defendants' Counter Designation - Reed_Part1, #20 14 Defendants' Counter Designation - Reed_Part2, #21 15 Plaintiffs_ Dep Designations 2017.10.14 - Salmon - Kellogg Redactions, #22 16 Defendants' Counter Designation - Whitaker)(Dunn, Matt)
December 14, 2017 Filing 524 EXHIBIT B re #523 MOTION to Substitute PARTY PURSUANT TO FED. R.CIV. P. 25(A) by Plaintiff Patty Thomas (Sweeney, Michael)
December 14, 2017 Filing 523 MOTION to Substitute PARTY PURSUANT TO FED. R.CIV. P. 25(A), filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit-unredacted Death Certificate, #2 Exhibit A Redacted Death Certificate, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/29/2017, (Sweeney, Michael) Modified on 12/14/2017 (PS).
December 14, 2017 Filing 522 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, TO RESPONSE to #491 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Report (Sweeney, Michael)
December 14, 2017 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #523 MOTION to Substitute PARTY PURSUANT TO FED. R.CIV. P. 25(A) : Amended docket text to correctly indicate exhibit titles, per counsel request (PS)
December 13, 2017 Filing 521 Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company Joint Statement of Disputed Instructions and Disputed Verdict Forms (Nelson, James)
December 13, 2017 Filing 520 Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff Patty Thomas (Dunn, Matt)
December 13, 2017 Filing 519 Proposed Voir Dire by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
December 13, 2017 Filing 518 STATEMENT Joint Neutral Statement of the Case by Plaintiff Patty Thomas (Dunn, Matt)
December 13, 2017 Filing 517 TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jury Instruction & Question, #2 Exhibit Bouaphakeo Jury Instruction)(Dunn, Matt)
December 13, 2017 Filing 516 Proposed Voir Dire by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, James)
December 13, 2017 Filing 515 TRIAL BRIEF by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Nelson, James)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER on the #511 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Court ADMITS Attorney Meagan Rafferty for all plaintiffs, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER on the #510 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Court ADMITS Attorney Michelle L DuCharme for Kellogg Company, and Kellogg Sales Company, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER on the #509 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Court ADMITS Attorney Tiffany S Fordyce for Kellogg Company, and Kellogg Sales Company, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG)
December 12, 2017 Filing 511 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Meagan Rafferty FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Judy Brashear, Jennifer Dowling, Kelley Dye, Jr, Robert Gibson, Bruce Johnson, David Mastenbrook, Armond McWell, David Rink, Soliman Sayedi, Patty Thomas, Laura Wisby (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5125079 (Subit, Michael)
December 12, 2017 Filing 510 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michelle L. DuCharme FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5124992 (Nelson, James)
December 12, 2017 Filing 509 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tiffany S. Fordyce FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5124979 (Nelson, James)
December 11, 2017 Filing 508 REPLY by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company to #505 Response (non motion) (Nelson, James)
December 11, 2017 Filing 507 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, to #491 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Report . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, James)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #503 Stipulated Motion for Variance from Local Civil Rule 83.1(D) in Connection with the Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tiffany S. Fordyce and Michelle L. Ducharme; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
December 11, 2017 Filing 505 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #504 Objections to Plaintiffs Second Amended Witness List and Request to Preclude Plaintiffs from Calling Undeposed Opt-Ins (Sweeney, Michael)
December 8, 2017 Filing 504 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Witness List by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Nelson, James)
December 8, 2017 Filing 503 Stipulated MOTION for Variance from Local Rule 83.1(d), filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/8/2017, (Nelson, James)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 502 AMENDED ORDER re #500 Dismissing Claims of 34 Non-Responding Plaintiffs Pursuant to 1/20/16 Order; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 6, 2017 Filing 501 STATEMENT Defendants' Suggestions of Death of Opt-In Plaintiffs William Trout and Roger Lecocq by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James M. Nelson in Support)(Nelson, James)
December 1, 2017 Filing 500 NOTICE OF LODGING OF AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER ; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, James)
December 1, 2017 Filing 499 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Dara Kaleel; Pla Counsel: Matt Dunn, Michael Sweeney, Michael Subit; Def Counsel: James Boudreau, James Nelson; CR: Barry Fanning; Telephone Pretrial Conference held on 12/1/2017. Dkt 495 addressed. Jury selection/voire dire procedures reviewed, as well as witness logistics and trial scheduled discussed. Courtroom technology should be available for tutorial on 12/14 from 11:00 - 12:00. Trial briefs & proposed jury instructions due 12/13/17. Counsel shall also file a joint proposed Statement of the Case. (DK)
November 30, 2017 Filing 498 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2017 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Angela Nicolavo, angela_nicolavo@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3832. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (AN)
November 30, 2017 Filing 497 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #495 Notice-Other PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS OF 58 NON-RESPONDING PLAINTIFFS PURSUANT TO JANUARY 20, 2016 ORDER (Nelson, James)
November 29, 2017 Filing 496 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Witness List, #2 Exhibit Kellogg's Witness List, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit Kellogg's Exhibit List)(Dunn, Matt)
November 28, 2017 Filing 495 NOTICE OF LODGING OF PROPOSED ORDER ; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Nelson, James)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #472 Defendants' Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #474 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
November 27, 2017 Filing 493 NOTICE of Withdrawal of REPLY re #490 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Sweeney, Michael)
November 27, 2017 Filing 492 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #491 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Report (Sweeney, Michael)
November 27, 2017 Filing 491 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Report , filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 R. Speakman Supp Report - November 13, 2017) Noting Date 12/15/2017, (Sweeney, Michael)
November 22, 2017 Filing 490 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, TO RESPONSE to #474 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Sweeney, Michael)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER on STIPULATION #486 Dismissal of Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 22, 2017 Filing 488 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 487 MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ordered that a pre-trial conference is scheduled for November 30, 2017, at noon in Courtroom B, to address the motions in limine, voir dire, and any other outstanding pre-trial issues. Entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
November 21, 2017 Filing 486 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs by parties (Dunn, Matt)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER on STIPULATION #482 , Pretrial Order due by 11/29/2017; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/21/2017 (DN). (cc to Getman)
November 20, 2017 Filing 484 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, to #474 MOTIONS IN LIMINE . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Nelson, James)
November 20, 2017 Filing 483 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #472 MOTIONS IN LIMINE . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 30(b)(6) Notice Kellogg Deposition, #2 Exhibit B Sweeney 5-23-16 email, #3 Exhibit C Kellogg Deposition Ex 8, Willard Bishop Study, #4 Exhibit D Excerpts from Holton Deposition)(Dunn, Matt)
November 20, 2017 Filing 482 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER as the Deadline to File Their Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by parties (Dunn, Matt)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 481 MINUTE ORDER - Consistent with the Court's ruling at the omnibus hearing November 9, Plaintiffs' Motion for Court to Calculate Damages Based on Jury Verdict [#445] is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defenses or Compel #459 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Speakman #442 is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 13, 2017 Filing 480 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company for proceedings held on 11/9/2017, Requesting Attorney: James M Nelson. (Nelson, James)
November 10, 2017 Filing 479 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, TO RESPONSE to #459 MOTION to Strike Defenses or Compel Production (Dunn, Matt)
November 9, 2017 Filing 478 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Dara Kaleel; Pla Counsel: Michael Sweeney; Def Counsel: James Boudreau, James Nelson; CR: Angela Nicolavo; Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2017. Counsel present argument; matters under advisement. (DK)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER granting #469 Stipulated Deadline to File Motions in Limine and Proposed Order: Jury Trial is set for 12/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom B before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Pretrial Order due by 11/20/2017, Trial briefs to be submitted by 12/4/2017, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 12/4/2017; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 11/7/2017 (DN). (cc to Getman)
November 6, 2017 Filing 476 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, to #459 MOTION to Strike Defenses or Compel Production . Oral Argument Requested. (Nelson, James)
November 6, 2017 Filing 475 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #474 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Dunn, Matt)
November 6, 2017 Filing 474 MOTIONS IN LIMINE , filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Separation Agreement, #2 LinkedIn Profile) Noting Date 11/24/2017, (Dunn, Matt)
November 6, 2017 Filing 473 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #472 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Nelson, James)
November 6, 2017 Filing 472 MOTIONS IN LIMINE , filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Signs, #2 Declaration of Dr. Speakman)(Nelson, James)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #442 Motion to Exclude Elizabeth Loftus testimony is GRANTED, Motion to Exclude Speakman will be addressed at oral argument; denying #450 Motion to Strike Kandel; granting #458 Motion to Strike McCortt and Roark; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
November 3, 2017 Filing 470 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #458 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' October 6, 2017 Amended Initial Disclosures Identifying Fact Witnesses James McCartt and Robert Roark and to Preclude Their Testimony at Trial (Nelson, James)
November 3, 2017 Filing 469 Stipulated MOTION extend the deadlines to file in Limine and Proposed Order, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. Noting Date 11/3/2017, (Dunn, Matt)
November 3, 2017 Filing 468 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: A Motion Hearing is set for 11/9/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom B before Judge Ronald B. Leighton, re #442 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Of Defendants Experts, and #445 MOTION for Court to Calculate Damages Based on Jury Verdict . (DK)
October 30, 2017 Filing 467 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #458 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' October 6, 2017 Amended Initial Disclosures Identifying Fact Witnesses James McCartt and Robert Roark and to Preclude Their Testimony at Trial . (Sweeney, Michael)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 466 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #464 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Motions in Limine, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
October 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions in Limine due by 10/30/2017. (DK)
October 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions in Limine due by 11/6/2017. (DK)
October 27, 2017 Filing 465 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #450 MOTION Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Initial Disclosures Identifying Fact Witness Jason Kandel and to Preclude Mr. Kandel's Testimony at Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Nelson, James)
October 26, 2017 Filing 464 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Motions in Limine, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. Noting Date 10/26/2017, (Dunn, Matt)
October 24, 2017 Filing 463 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #459 MOTION to Strike Defenses or Compel Production . Filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. Noting Date 10/10/2017, (Dunn, Matt)
October 23, 2017 Filing 462 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #450 MOTION Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Initial Disclosures Identifying Fact Witness Jason Kandel and to Preclude Mr. Kandel's Testimony at Trial . (Sweeney, Michael)
October 20, 2017 Filing 461 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, TO RESPONSE to #445 MOTION for Court to Calculate Damages Based on Jury Verdict (Sweeney, Michael)
October 19, 2017 Filing 460 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #459 MOTION to Strike Defenses or Compel Production . Filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. Noting Date 11/3/2017, (Dunn, Matt)
October 19, 2017 Filing 459 MOTION to Strike Defenses or Compel Production , filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) Noting Date 11/13/2017, (Dunn, Matt)
October 19, 2017 Filing 458 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' October 6, 2017 Amended Initial Disclosures Identifying Fact Witnesses James McCartt and Robert Roark and to Preclude Their Testimony at Trial , filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/3/2017, (Nelson, James)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MINUTE ORDER RE: TRIAL SCHEDULE, entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
October 18, 2017 Filing 456 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Dara Kaleel; Pla Counsel: Matt Dunn, Micahel Sweeney, Michael Subit; Def Counsel: James Boudreau, James Nelson, Christiana Signs; CR: Angela Nicolavo; Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/18/2017. Trial schedule discussed with counsel. The current trial date of 11/27/17 is CONTINUED to 12/18/17. The 11/17/17 pretrial conference is STRICKEN and will not be rescheduled; motions in limine deadline extended one week to 10/20/17. (DK)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER denying #439 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss out-of-state opt-ins and to decertify this FLSA collection action; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
October 16, 2017 Filing 454 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, to #445 MOTION for Court to Calculate Damages Based on Jury Verdict . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, James)
October 16, 2017 Filing 453 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, TO RESPONSE to #442 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Of Defendants Experts (Sweeney, Michael)
October 13, 2017 Filing 452 PRAECIPE to attach document re #451 Declaration,, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Nelson, James)
October 13, 2017 NOTICE TO FILER-LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE: The Declaration of Christina L Signs #451 , lacks a valid signature. Pursuant to Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, actual signatures are required for all individuals who not the filing attorney. To correct the omission, please promptly file only the correctly formatted signature page as an attachment, using the event "Praecipe to Attach Document" under "Other Documents". Please do not re-file the entire document. If you require additional help, please contact the ECF Help Desk at 206-370-8440. Thank you. (CMG)
October 12, 2017 Filing 451 DECLARATION of Christiana L. Signs in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Initial Disclosures Identifying Fact Witness Jason Kandel and to Preclude Mr. Kandel's Testimony at Trial filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company re #450 MOTION Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Initial Disclosures Identifying Fact Witness Jason Kandel and to Preclude Mr. Kandel's Testimony at Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christiana L. Signs)(Nelson, James)
October 12, 2017 Filing 450 MOTION Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Initial Disclosures Identifying Fact Witness Jason Kandel and to Preclude Mr. Kandel's Testimony at Trial , filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/27/2017, (Nelson, James)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER granting #448 Stipulated Motion re #442 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Of Defendants Experts : Re-noted to 10/16/2017; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 10/12/2017 (DN). (cc to Dan Getman)
October 11, 2017 Filing 448 Stipulated MOTION to Renote Plaintiffs Motion, Doc 442, to October 16, 2017, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. Noting Date 10/11/2017, (Sweeney, Michael)
October 10, 2017 Filing 447 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, to #442 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Of Defendants Experts. Oral Argument Requested. (Nelson, James)
October 5, 2017 Filing 446 MOTION to Consider Doc 445 as a Sur-Reply to Defendants Motion to Decertify re #439 MOTION to Dismiss Out-of-State Opt-Ins Based on New Supreme Court Case and to Decertify FLSA Collective Action Based on Smith, et al., v. Kellogg Sales Company and Absence of Expert Testimony, #445 MOTION for Court to Calculate Damages Based on Jury Verdict , filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/20/2017, (Sweeney, Michael)
October 5, 2017 Filing 445 MOTION for Court to Calculate Damages Based on Jury Verdict , filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Monroe 442-2, #2 Exhibit B - Henry 442-3, #3 Exhibit C - Olibas 442-4, #4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/20/2017, (Sweeney, Michael)
September 29, 2017 Filing 444 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #439 MOTION to Dismiss Out-of-State Opt-Ins Based on New Supreme Court Case and to Decertify FLSA Collective Action Based on Smith, et al., v. Kellogg Sales Company and Absence of Expert Testimony (Nelson, James)
September 28, 2017 Filing 443 UNREDACTED SEALED #442 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Of Defendants Experts, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas (Sweeney, Michael)
September 28, 2017 Filing 442 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Of Defendants Experts, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - REDACTED, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) Noting Date 10/13/2017, (Sweeney, Michael)
September 25, 2017 Filing 441 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #439 MOTION to Dismiss Out-of-State Opt-Ins Based on New Supreme Court Case and to Decertify FLSA Collective Action Based on Smith, et al., v. Kellogg Sales Company and Absence of Expert Testimony. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sweeney, Michael)
September 7, 2017 Filing 440 REQUEST by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Out-of-State Opt-Ins Based on New Supreme Court Case and to Decertify FLSA Collective Action Based on Smith, et al., v. Kellogg Sales Company and Absence of Expert Evidence re #439 MOTION to Dismiss Out-of-State Opt-Ins Based on New Supreme Court Case and to Decertify FLSA Collective Action Based on Smith, et al., v. Kellogg Sales Company and Absence of Expert Testimony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Nelson, James)
September 7, 2017 Filing 439 MOTION to Dismiss Out-of-State Opt-Ins Based on New Supreme Court Case and to Decertify FLSA Collective Action Based on Smith, et al., v. Kellogg Sales Company and Absence of Expert Testimony, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/29/2017, (Nelson, James)
July 27, 2017 Filing 438 REPORT from Mediator James A. Smith, Jr. regarding failure of mediation on July 26, 2017 (Smith, James)
June 26, 2017 Filing 437 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Matt Dunn. Filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
May 15, 2017 Filing 436 NOTICE of Temporary Interruption of Telephone Service ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER denying #430 Motion to Join Opt-Ins' State Law Claims for Collective Treatment by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB)
April 21, 2017 Filing 434 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, TO RESPONSE to #430 MOTION to Join Opt-Ins State Law Claims for Collective Treatment (Sweeney, Michael)
April 17, 2017 Filing 433 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, to #430 MOTION to Join Opt-Ins State Law Claims for Collective Treatment . Oral Argument Requested. (Nelson, James)
April 13, 2017 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 432 Order to Re-Note Motion, : Counsel shall adhere to all the states dates submitted in the Joint Stipulation #431 . (JAB)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING #430 MOTION to Join Opt-Ins State Law Claims for Collective Treatment. s/Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Noting Date 4/21/2017. Counsel shall adhere to all the states dates submitted in the Joint Stipulation #431 .(JAB) Modified on 4/13/2017 (JAB).
April 6, 2017 Filing 431 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Order (Unsigned) re #430 MOTION to Join Opt-Ins State Law Claims for Collective Treatment (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Boudreau, James) Modified on 4/12/2017 (JAB).
March 28, 2017 Filing 430 MOTION to Join Opt-Ins State Law Claims for Collective Treatment , filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. Noting Date 4/14/2017 4/21/2017, (Sweeney, Michael) Modified on 4/12/2017 (JAB).
March 23, 2017 Filing 429 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2016 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2017, (DZ) (Main Document 429 replaced on 3/31/2017) (SG).
December 27, 2016 Filing 428 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt) Modified on 12/28/2016: updated firm name. (CMG).
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES ; Length of Trial: *20 DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for 11/27/2017 at 09:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Attorney settlement conference to be held by 5/19/2017, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/8/2017, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 9/22/2017, Motions in Limine due by 10/23/2017, Pretrial Order OR Exhibit and Witness Lists are due by 11/13/2017, Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/13/2017, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 11/13/2017. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER denying #394 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #397 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #400 Motion to Certify Class; the applicability of judicial estoppel is reserved; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
November 21, 2016 Filing 425 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: Michael Sweeney, Michael Subit; Def Counsel: James Boudreau, Christiana Signs, James Nelson; CR: Debbie Zurn; In Court Hearing held on 11/21/2016. Oral argument presented on the pending motions. The #392 MOTION To Decertify FLSA Collective Action is DENIED. #394 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Patty Thomas and #400 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Patty Thomas are under advisement. Court will issue a written ruling. Hearing concluded. (JAB)
November 10, 2016 Filing 424 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #392 MOTION To Decertify FLSA Collective Action , #400 MOTION to Certify Class , #394 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment : Oral Argument is set for Monday, 11/21/2016 at 01:30 PM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Leighton.(JAB)
August 19, 2016 Filing 423 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #394 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Nelson, James)
August 19, 2016 Filing 422 DECLARATION of James M. Nelson filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company re #392 MOTION To Decertify FLSA Collective Action (Nelson, James)
August 19, 2016 Filing 421 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #392 MOTION To Decertify FLSA Collective Action (Nelson, James)
August 19, 2016 Filing 420 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, TO RESPONSE to #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Sweeney, Michael)
August 19, 2016 Filing 419 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, TO RESPONSE to #400 MOTION to Certify Class (Sweeney, Michael)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER granting #414 Motion to Seal; documents are sealed and will remain sealed; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER granting #406 Motion to Seal; the documents are sealed and will remain sealed; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
July 29, 2016 Filing 416 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #414 MOTION to Seal , #415 Response to Motion,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 5-1, #3 Exhibit 5-2, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 19, #11 Exhibit 20, #12 Exhibit 25, #13 Exhibit 26, #14 Exhibit 42, #15 Exhibit 51, #16 Exhibit 55, #17 Exhibit 58)(Sweeney, Michael)
July 29, 2016 Filing 415 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #394 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5-1, #7 Exhibit 5-1, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13-1, #16 Exhibit 13-2, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 54, #54 Exhibit 55, #55 Exhibit 56, #56 Exhibit 57, #57 Exhibit 58, #58 Exhibit 59, #59 Exhibit 60, #60 Exhibit 61, #61 Exhibit 62, #62 Exhibit 63, #63 Exhibit 64, #64 Exhibit 65, #65 Exhibit 66, #66 Declaration)(Sweeney, Michael)
July 29, 2016 Filing 414 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/12/2016, (Dunn, Matt)
July 29, 2016 Filing 413 REQUEST by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #412 Declaration, #411 Response to Motion (Nelson, James)
July 29, 2016 Filing 412 DECLARATION of James M. Nelson in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company re #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1-20, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1-20, Part 3, #4 Exhibit 1-20, Part 4, #5 Exhibit 1-20, Part 5, #6 Exhibit 1-20, Part 6, #7 Exhibit 1-20, Part 7, #8 Exhibit 1-20, Part 8)(Nelson, James)
July 29, 2016 Filing 411 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, to #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Nelson, James)
July 29, 2016 Filing 410 REQUEST by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class re #409 Declaration, #408 Response to Motion (Nelson, James)
July 29, 2016 Filing 409 DECLARATION of James M. Nelson in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify State Law Class Actions filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company re #400 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-16, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1-16, Part 2)(Nelson, James)
July 29, 2016 Filing 408 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, to #400 MOTION to Certify Class . Oral Argument Requested. (Nelson, James)
July 29, 2016 Filing 407 UNREDACTED SEALED #405 Response to Motion,,,,,,,, #406 MOTION to Seal , by Plaintiff Patty Thomas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 Master Sales Contract CONFIDENTIAL, #2 Exhibit 7 Publix Business Review CONFIDENTIAL, #3 Exhibit 9 Contracts CONFIDENTIAL, #4 Exhibit 10 KMF Funds CONFIDENTIAL, #5 Exhibit 11 DSD Benefits CONFIDENTIAL, #6 Exhibit 13 CONFIDENTIAL 2006 TM Study, #7 Exhibit 14 CONFIDENTIAL 2008 TM Study, #8 Exhibit 15 2010 RSR Study Holton 27 - CONFIDENTIAL, #9 Exhibit 16 CONFIDENTIAL Willard Bishop Study, #10 Exhibit 18 Willard Bishop Engagement Letter CONFIDENTIAL, #11 Exhibit 19 242862 - CONFIDENTIAL - Syracuse Itinerary, #12 Exhibit 21 Workload Model Holton Ex 33, #13 Exhibit 22 CONFIDENTIAL 2008 Labor Budgeting., #14 Exhibit 24 Motus BSN 330959. CONFIDENTIAL, #15 Exhibit 36 Merchandising Survey Results)(Sweeney, Michael)
July 29, 2016 Filing 406 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J.D. Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/12/2016, (Sweeney, Michael)
July 29, 2016 Filing 405 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #392 MOTION To Decertify FLSA Collective Action . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J.D.Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs Brief in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Decertfy FLSA Collective Action, #2 Exhibit 1 Bussell Dec, #3 Exhibit 2 Holton Dep, #4 Exhibit 3 Salmon Dep, #5 Exhibit 4 Master Sales Contract CONFIDENTIAL, #6 Exhibit 5 Reed Dep, #7 Exhibit 6 Kelly Dep, #8 Exhibit 7 Publix Business Review CONFIDENTIAL, #9 Exhibit 8 Bussell Dep, #10 Exhibit 9 Contracts CONFIDENTIAL, #11 Exhibit 10 KMF Funds CONFIDENTIAL, #12 Exhibit 11 DSD Benefits CONFIDENTIAL, #13 Exhibit 12 Pennington Dep, #14 Exhibit 13 CONFIDENTIAL 2006 TM Study, #15 Exhibit 14 CONFIDENTIAL 2008 TM Study, #16 Exhibit 15 2010 RSR Study Holton 27 - CONFIDENTIAL, #17 Exhibit 16 CONFIDENTIAL Willard Bishop Study, #18 Exhibit 17 Groulx Dep, #19 Exhibit 18 Willard Bishop Engagement Letter CONFIDENTIAL, #20 Exhibit 19 242862 - CONFIDENTIAL - Syracuse Itinerary, #21 Exhibit 20 Johnson Itinerary, #22 Exhibit 21 Workload Model Holton Ex 33, #23 Exhibit 22 CONFIDENTIAL 2008 Labor Budgeting, #24 Exhibit 23 Job Duty Deposition Testimony Summary, #25 Exhibit 24 Motus BSN 330959. CONFIDENTIAL, #26 Exhibit 25 Crowell Written Warning KELLOGG-OPT-IN-EMAIL-075705, #27 Exhibit 26 Gibson Dep, #28 Exhibit 27 Hoak Dep, #29 Exhibit 28 McWell Dep, #30 Exhibit 29 Sales Account Team Email - Holton Exhibit 17, #31 Exhibit 30 Young Dep, #32 Exhibit 31 29378 ltr re new sync requirements for TMs, #33 Exhibit 32 59983-060065-Handheld user manual 2009, #34 Exhibit 33 Email Syncing Policy and Discipline KELLOGG-OPT-IN-EMAIL-321833-321834, #35 Exhibit 34 Account Team Email - Ex. 3 Holton, #36 Exhibit 35 Emails Directing Orders, #37 Exhibit 36 Merchandising Survey Results, #38 Exhibit 37 Perteete Dep, #39 Exhibit 38 Nilles Dep, #40 Exhibit 39 Kivett Dep, #41 Exhibit 40 Workwiths, #42 Exhibit 41 Mid-Year and Annual Reviews, #43 Exhibit 42 KELLOGG-293518, #44 Exhibit 43 Hixson Evaluation, #45 Exhibit 44 Summary of RSR Testimony)(Sweeney, Michael)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER granting #398 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Exhibits 3, 7, 10, 11, 16, 19, 20, 21, 22, 25, 26, 27, 29, 30, 33, 44, 54, 55, 57 and 58 to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #397 ; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting #401 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Exhibits 3, 4, 5, 9, and 10 to Plaintiffs Motion to Certify State Law Class Actions #400 ; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 7/19/2016 (DN).
July 1, 2016 Filing 402 UNREDACTED SEALED #400 MOTION to Certify Class , #401 MOTION to Seal , by Plaintiff Patty Thomas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Dunn, Matt)
July 1, 2016 Filing 401 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Sweeney Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/15/2016, (Dunn, Matt)
July 1, 2016 Filing 400 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Sweeney Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Russo Declaration, #17 Subit Declaration) Noting Date 8/19/2016, (Dunn, Matt)
July 1, 2016 Filing 399 UNREDACTED SEALED #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #398 MOTION to Seal , by Plaintiff Patty Thomas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit)(Dunn, Matt)
July 1, 2016 Filing 398 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Dunn Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/15/2016, (Dunn, Matt)
July 1, 2016 Filing 397 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Dunn Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Russo Declaration) Noting Date 8/19/2016, (Dunn, Matt)
July 1, 2016 Filing 396 REQUEST by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment on Claims of Individuals Who Did Not Disclose This Case in Bankrtupcy Proceedings re #394 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Nelson, James)
July 1, 2016 Filing 395 DECLARATION of James M. Nelson in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company re #394 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Exhibit Part 5, #6 Exhibit Part 6, #7 Exhibit Part 7, #8 Exhibit Part 8, #9 Exhibit Part 9)(Nelson, James)
July 1, 2016 Filing 394 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/19/2016, (Nelson, James)
July 1, 2016 Filing 393 DECLARATION of James M. Nelson in Support of Defendants' Motion to Decertify FLSA Collective Action filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company re #392 MOTION To Decertify FLSA Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Exhibit Part 5)(Nelson, James)
July 1, 2016 Filing 392 MOTION To Decertify FLSA Collective Action by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/19/2016, (Nelson, James)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER granting #389 Defendants' Motion for Leave to file an over-length brief of up to 65 pages; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
June 9, 2016 Filing 390 NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Order of Dismissal of Non-Responding Plaintiffs Pursuant to the January 20, 2016 Order re #338 Order on Motion for Discovery ; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, James)
June 8, 2016 Filing 389 MOTION for Leave to File Multiple Motions for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits for a Single Motion by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/8/2016, (Nelson, James)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER ON IN CAMERA re #311 MOTION to Compel and #347 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Compelling Production of Willard Bishop Study; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting #380 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Exhibit 3 [Dkt. #379] to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel LinkedIn Evidence; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER denying #373 Defendants Motion to Compel LinkedIn Evidence; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER denying #363 Defendants' Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER on STIPULATION #378 re extension: Fact Discovery Deadline is 5/30/16, only discovery requested and depositions noticed prior to 5/2/16 will be pursued after 5/2/16, Dispositive motions due by 7/1/2016; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting #360 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Document 361; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
May 13, 2016 Filing 382 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #373 MOTION to Compel LinkedIn Evidence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, James)
May 9, 2016 Filing 381 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #380 MOTION to Seal (Sweeney, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Filing 380 MOTION to File Under Seal re #379 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J.D. Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Boudreau 5-9-16 Email, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/20/2016, (Sweeney, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Filing 379 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #373 MOTION to Compel LinkedIn Evidence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Volk Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 Sweeney 4-5-16 letter, #3 Exhibit 3 Industrial Standards Study)(Sweeney, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Filing 378 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Discovery Deadline and Briefing Schedules by parties (Nelson, James)
May 6, 2016 Filing 377 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #363 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories (Nelson, James)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting #375 Stipulated Motion Withdrawing Pending Motion to Strike #366 ; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
May 4, 2016 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #375 Stipulated MOTION : corrected event type to put on the court's motions docket. (CMG)
May 3, 2016 Filing 375 JOINT STIPULATION and NOTICE to Withdraw Pending #366 MOTION to Strike Defendants Expert Witnesses ; by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Nelson, James) Modified on 5/4/2016: corrected event type to put on the court's motions docket (CMG).
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER on STIPULATION #372 re #363 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories : Re-Noted for 5/6/2016; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
April 28, 2016 Filing 373 MOTION to Compel LinkedIn Evidence by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/13/2016, (Nelson, James)
April 28, 2016 Filing 372 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO REPLY AND AMENDING NOTING DATE RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES by parties re #363 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories (Nelson, James)
April 27, 2016 Filing 371 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #363 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories. (Dunn, Matt)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER on STIPULATION re #368 Extension of Deadlines as set forth in this Order: Discovery completed by 5/16/2016, Dispositive motions due by 6/17/2016; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #357 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order; as more fully set forth herein; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
April 25, 2016 Filing 368 STIPULATION (JOINT) by parties (Sweeney, Michael)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 367 MINUTE ORDER re #347 Kellogg's MOTION for Reconsideration: Plaintiffs moved to compel production of a time-motion study prepared by Kelloggs consulting firm, Willard Bishop [Dkt. #311]. The Court ordered Kellogg to produce the Willard Bishop Study [Dkt. # 337]. Kellogg moved for reconsideration [Dkt. #347], arguing the study is a privileged communication and work product. Plaintiffs argue reconsideration is inappropriate because Kellogg did not present the Study to the Court when it opposed Plaintiffs Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs are incorrect that the Court cannot review a withheld document to determine whether it is privileged or not. Kelloggs Motion for Reconsideration [Dkt. #347] is GRANTED. Kellogg shall produce the Willard Bishop Study for in camera review within ten days of this Order; as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
April 21, 2016 Filing 366 MOTION to Strike Defendants Expert Witnesses by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Defendants' Expert Disclosure, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/6/2016, (Sweeney, Michael)
April 15, 2016 Filing 365 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #357 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, James)
April 15, 2016 Filing 364 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #347 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Compelling Production of Willard Bishop Study. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Email re Industrial Engineer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Except from Kellogg Privilege Log, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Email re Job Title)(Dunn, Matt)
April 14, 2016 Filing 363 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/29/2016, (Nelson, James)
April 14, 2016 Filing 362 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #360 MOTION to Seal (Dunn, Matt)
April 13, 2016 Filing 361 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 7 - Joint Business Plan by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #360 MOTION to Seal , #359 Response to Motion,,, (Dunn, Matt)
April 13, 2016 Filing 360 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) Noting Date 4/22/2016, (Dunn, Matt)
April 13, 2016 Filing 359 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #357 MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - ESI Deposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - ESI Deposition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - ESI Deposition, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - ESI Deposition, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Email, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Deposition Notice, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Joint Business Plan (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Reed Deposition, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Letter, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Organizational Chart, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Thomas Deposition, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Deposition Notice, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Crowell Deposition, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Pennington Deposition, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Outside Counsel Emails, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Email)(Dunn, Matt)
April 7, 2016 Filing 358 RESPONSE by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company re #355 Statement Related to Joint Notice of Non-Response (Nelson, James)
April 5, 2016 Filing 357 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Proposed Order Granting Kellogg Company and Kellogg Sales Company's First Motion for Protective Order) Noting Date 4/15/2016, (Nelson, James)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER re #347 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Compelling Production of Willard Bishop Study by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. The Court is inclined to grant in camera review and invites the Plaintiffs to respond to the motion within 10 days. Reply is due by 4/15/2016. Motion #347 renoted to 4/15. (JAB)
March 25, 2016 Filing 355 STATEMENT of Plaintiffs re #354 Notice-Other, of Joint Notice of Non-Response Pursuant to Court's Order Dated January 20, 2016 by Plaintiff Patty Thomas (Getman, Dan)
March 24, 2016 Filing 354 NOTICE Joint Notice of Non-Response Pursuant to Court's Order Dated January 20, 2016 ; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Notice of Non-Response, #2 Exhibit B to Joint Notice of Non-Response)(Nelson, James)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER on the #352 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael J.D. Sweeney for plaintiffs, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG)
March 24, 2016 Filing 352 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael J.D. Sweeney FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Judy Brashear, Jennifer Dowling, Kelley Dye, Jr, Robert Gibson, Bruce Johnson, David Mastenbrook, Armond McWell, David Rink, Soliman Sayedi, Patty Thomas, Laura Wisby (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4387811 (Subit, Michael)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER of STIPULATION re #350 DISMISSING Plaintiffs' Fourteenth Cause of Action; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
March 14, 2016 Filing 350 STIPULATION Stipulated Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Fourteenth Cause of Action by parties (Nelson, James)
March 2, 2016 Filing 349 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #347 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Compelling Production of Willard Bishop Study. Filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Noting Date 3/1/2016, (Nelson, James)
March 1, 2016 Filing 348 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #347 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Compelling Production of Willard Bishop Study (Nelson, James)
March 1, 2016 Filing 347 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Compelling Production of Willard Bishop Study by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Noting Date 3/18/2016, (Nelson, James)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting #345 Stipulated Motion to Stay Case Pending Mediation: Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Kellogg's Discovery Demands 3/15/16, Identify Affirmative Experts (for certification and merits issues only) 4/4/16, Initial Affirmative Expert Reports due 4/4/16, Fact Discovery completed by 5/2/2016, Identify Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 5/2/2016, Expert Discovery Deadline (for certification and merits issues only) 5/30/16; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
February 16, 2016 Filing 345 Stipulated MOTION To Stay Case Pending Mediation And Continue Court Deadlines For Additional Two Weeks And [Proposed] Order by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
February 16, 2016 Filing 344 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting #336 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, to be come effective on 3/18/16; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting #341 Stipulated Motion: Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Kellogg's Discovery Demands 3/1/16, Identify Affirmative Experts and Expert Reports (for certification and merits issues only) due 3/21/16, Fact Discovery completed by 4/18/2016, Identify Rebuttal Experts and Reports due by 4/18/2016, Expert Discovery Deadline (for certification and merits issues only) due 5/16/16; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
January 26, 2016 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #341 Stipulated MOTION : corrected event type to put on the court's motion docket. (CMG)
January 25, 2016 SETTING the NOTING DATE for the #341 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Stay Case for 1/25/2016. (CMG)
January 25, 2016 Filing 341 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Case Pending Mediation and Continue Court Deadlines for 45 Days by parties (Nelson, James) Modified on 1/26/2016 - corrected event type to put on the court's docket. (CMG).
January 25, 2016 Filing 340 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, to #336 MOTION to Compel Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery, #2 Proposed Order)(Nelson, James)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting #318 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses/Dismiss Unresponsive Plaintiffs by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 STIPULATION AND ORDER setting Discovery Deadlines as follows: Identify Affirmative Experts (for certification and merits issues only) by Feb. 5, 2016: Initial Affirmative Expert Reports (for certification and merits issues only) due by Feb. 5, 2016: Fact Discovery Deadline is March 4, 2016; Identify Rebuttal Expert and Rebuttal Expert Reports by March 4, 2016; Expert Discovery Deadline (for certification and merits issues only) due by April 1, 2016. Briefing schedule for summary judgment motions, Plaintiffs motion for Rule 23 class certification, and Kelloggs motion to decertify the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) collective action as follows: Motions filed by April 8, 2016. Oppositions to motions due by May 6, 2016; Replies due by May 27, 2016. Stipulation approved by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER granting #311 Motion to Compel Defendants to produce the Willard Bishop study, time stamp records including KSTARS, CRS/Motus and ARIFleet data by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (see order for details)(JAB)
January 11, 2016 Filing 336 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/29/2016, (Dunn, Matt)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER on the #333 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christiana L Signs for Kellogg Company and Kellogg Sales Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MET)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER on the #332 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian T Feeney for Kellogg Company and Kellogg Sales Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MET)
December 23, 2015 Filing 333 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christiana L. Signs FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4278803 (Nelson, James)
December 23, 2015 Filing 332 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian T. Feeney FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4278786 (Nelson, James)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting #328 Stipulated Motion for Variance from Local Civil Rule 83.1(D) for Christiana L. Signs; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #329 Stipulated Motion for Variance from Local Civil Rule 83.1(D) for Brian T. Feeney; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
December 21, 2015 Filing 329 Stipulated MOTION for Variance from Local Civil Rule 83.1(d) in Connection With the Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian T. Feeney by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/21/2015, (Nelson, James)
December 21, 2015 Filing 328 Stipulated MOTION for Variance from Local Civil Rule 83.1(d) in Connection With the Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christiana L. Signs by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/21/2015, (Nelson, James)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER on STIPULATION re #326 ORDER LIFTING STAY; Fact Discovery completed by 3/4/2016; Identify Affirmative Experts and Expert Reports (for certification and merits issues only) due by 2/5/16; Identify Rebuttal Expert and Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 3/4/2016; Expert Discovery Deadline (for certification and merits issues) only due by 4/1/16; Summary Judgment motions to be filed by 4/8/16, Oppositions to be filed by 5/6/16, and replies filed by 5/27/16; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 15, 2015 Noting Date Reset re #311 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Discovery, #318 Defendants' MOTION for Discovery to Compel Responses: Motions reset for 1/8/2016; as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
December 14, 2015 Filing 326 Stipulated MOTION and [PROPOSED] ORDER by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
December 2, 2015 Filing 325 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, Kellogg USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #318 MOTION for Discovery io Compel Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Nelson, James)
November 20, 2015 Filing 324 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #318 MOTION for Discovery io Compel Responses. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Dunn, Matt)
November 6, 2015 Filing 323 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 20 days. (Nelson, James)
September 21, 2015 Filing 322 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue)(Dunn, Matt)
September 16, 2015 Filing 321 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue, #3 Consent to Sue)(Dunn, Matt)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #319 Motion to Stay in order to conduct Mediation for Settlement purposes; Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2015; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
August 26, 2015 Filing 319 Joint MOTION to Stay re #318 MOTION for Discovery io Compel Responses and for the purposes of mediation by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. Noting Date 9/4/2015, (Getman, Dan)
August 20, 2015 Filing 318 MOTION for Discovery io Compel Responses by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/4/2015, (Nelson, James)
August 7, 2015 Filing 317 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, TO RESPONSE to #311 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Getman, Dan)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER on STIPULATION re #315 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines Regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery and [Proposed] Order filed by Patty Thomas; Noting Date 8/7/2015; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
July 30, 2015 Filing 315 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines Regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery and [Proposed] Order by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
July 27, 2015 Filing 314 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, to #311 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Nelson, James)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting #311 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines re: #311 MOTION to Compel Discovery; new Nothing Date is 7/31/2015; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
July 15, 2015 Filing 312 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES by parties re #311 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Nelson, James)
July 9, 2015 Filing 311 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/24/2015, (Dunn, Matt)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 310 REVISED MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES ; Length of Trial: *Counsel to advise regarding the length of trial*. Jury Trial is reset for 4/11/2016 at 09:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/14/2015, Motions due by 11/23/2015, Discovery completed by 10/9/2015, Dispositive motions due by 1/12/2016, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 2/3/2016, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 3/8/2016, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 3/15/2016, Motions in Limine due by 3/7/2016, Pretrial Order due by 3/25/2016, Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2016 at 08:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/25/2016, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/28/2016. s/Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting #308 Stipulation to extend discovery by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Discovery completed by 10/9/2015. Clerk to issue new scheduling order. (JAB)
May 12, 2015 Filing 308 Stipulated MOTION To Extend Discovery Deadline and Other Case Deadlines by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/12/2015, (Boudreau, James)
March 26, 2015 Filing 307 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #300 Defendants' Motion to authorize additional depositions; denying an additional 50 depositions; granting an additional 20 depositions; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER denying #290 Defendants' Motion to strike untimely filed consents to sue; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER denying re #289 Defendants MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Count IX (Arizona Wage Act); signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER denying #289 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
February 27, 2015 Filing 302 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #300 Second MOTION Additional Depositions from Representative Sample of Plaintiffs (Nelson, James)
February 23, 2015 Filing 301 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #300 Second MOTION Additional Depositions from Representative Sample of Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Portion of 30(b)(6) Transcript)(Dunn, Matt)
February 9, 2015 Filing 300 Second MOTION Additional Depositions from Representative Sample of Plaintiffs by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James M. Nelson, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Authorize Additional Depositions) Noting Date 2/27/2015, (Nelson, James)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER on STIPULATION #296 for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Discovery to be completed by 6/8/2015; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
January 30, 2015 Filing 298 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #289 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James M. Nelson, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Nelson, James)
January 30, 2015 Filing 297 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #290 MOTION Strike untimely filed Consents to Sue (Nelson, James)
January 29, 2015 Filing 296 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/29/2015, (Nelson, James)
January 28, 2015 Filing 295 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue, #2 Consent to Sue)(Dunn, Matt)
January 23, 2015 Filing 294 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #289 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Dunn, Matt)
January 23, 2015 Filing 293 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #290 MOTION Strike untimely filed Consents to Sue . (Dunn, Matt)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER on STIPULATION #291 for extension of time to reply to #289 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and #290 MOTION Strike untimely filed Consents to Sue ; Plaintiffs' deadline is 1/23/15; Defendant's deadline is 1/30/15; Noting Date has been reset to 1/30/2015. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
January 5, 2015 Filing 291 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond by parties re #289 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #290 MOTION Strike untimely filed Consents to Sue (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Matt)
December 18, 2014 Filing 290 MOTION Strike untimely filed Consents to Sue by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/9/2015, (Nelson, James)
December 16, 2014 Filing 289 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/9/2015, (Nelson, James)
December 15, 2014 Filing 288 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of David M. Fairbrother)(Dunn, Matt)
November 24, 2014 Filing 287 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Robin Walsh)(Dunn, Matt)
November 19, 2014 Filing 286 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Rhonda Spencer)(Dunn, Matt)
November 3, 2014 Filing 285 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Maxwell B. Daugherty)(Dunn, Matt)
October 28, 2014 Filing 284 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Tina L. Lee)(Dunn, Matt)
October 17, 2014 Filing 283 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Debra Beddo)(Dunn, Matt)
October 16, 2014 Filing 282 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Belinda Sue Mills)(Dunn, Matt)
October 7, 2014 Filing 281 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Darryl A. Johnson Sr.)(Dunn, Matt)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER denying #256 Defendants' Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #257 Defendants' Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #258 Defendants' Motion to Compel; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting #276 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Discovery completed by 3/5/2015 signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 9/24/2014 (JAB).
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting #273 Motion for Clarification; Plaintiff's deadline to file a Rule 23 class certification is 45 days after the close of discovery; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER denying #272 Motion to Appoint Magistrate Judge; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
September 15, 2014 Filing 276 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendant Kellogg Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/5/2015, (Nelson, James) Modified on 9/15/2014 (MET).
September 15, 2014 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #276 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery : Modified to reflect Joint Motion. (MET)
September 15, 2014 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #276 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . Noting Date 9/15/2014. CR 7(d)(1) Same Day Motions. Stipulated motions (see LCR 10(g) shall be noted for consideration for the day they are filed. (MET)
September 9, 2014 Filing 275 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
September 5, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Giuseppe Recchia)(Dunn, Matt)
August 28, 2014 Filing 273 MOTION Clarification of the Minute Order Setting Trial, Pretrial Dates (Doc. 238) re #238 Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates,,, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/5/2014, (Dunn, Matt)
August 28, 2014 Filing 272 MOTION to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Hear Discovery Disputes by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Getman, Dan)
August 22, 2014 Filing 271 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #257 MOTION to Compel Each Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to First Set of Interrogatories (Nelson, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 270 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #256 MOTION to Compel and Deem Requests Admitted (Nelson, James)
August 21, 2014 Filing 269 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #258 MOTION to Compel Each Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to First Set of Request for Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of James M. Nelson)(Nelson, James)
August 18, 2014 Filing 268 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Mark Caldwell)(Dunn, Matt)
August 13, 2014 Filing 267 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #256 MOTION to Compel and Deem Requests Admitted. (Getman, Dan)
August 13, 2014 Filing 266 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #258 MOTION to Compel Each Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to First Set of Request for Production of Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Requests for Walz, #2 Exhibit 2 Def. Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 Model Summary, #4 Exhibit 4 Sayedi Paystub, #5 Exhibit 5 TM Expectations, #6 Exhibit 6 Activity Log Instructions)(Getman, Dan)
August 11, 2014 Filing 265 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #261 MOTION for Relief from a Deadline to Respond to Defendants Motion to Compel (Docs 256-258) ; by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
August 8, 2014 Filing 264 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Adam Hughes)(Dunn, Matt)
August 7, 2014 Filing 263 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
August 4, 2014 Filing 262 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #258 MOTION to Compel Each Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to First Set of Request for Production of Documents, #256 MOTION to Compel and Deem Requests Admitted, #257 MOTION to Compel Each Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to First Set of Interrogatories. Filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Noting Date 8/22/2014, (Nelson, James)
August 1, 2014 Filing 261 MOTION for Relief from a Deadline to Respond to Defendants Motion to Compel (Docs 256-258) by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Email, #2 Exhibit 2 Picture, #3 Exhibit 3 Representative Discovery letter, #4 Exhibit 4 letter, #5 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/15/2014, (Dunn, Matt)
July 31, 2014 Filing 260 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Sue of James B. McCartt ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
July 30, 2014 Filing 259 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Michael Walz)(Dunn, Matt)
July 24, 2014 Filing 258 MOTION to Compel Each Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to First Set of Request for Production of Documents by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/8/2014, (Nelson, James)
July 24, 2014 Filing 257 MOTION to Compel Each Opt-In Plaintiffs' Responses to First Set of Interrogatories by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/8/2014, (Nelson, James)
July 24, 2014 Filing 256 MOTION to Compel and Deem Requests Admitted by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James M. Nelson ISO Defendants' Motions, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/8/2014, (Nelson, James)
July 10, 2014 Filing 255 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Christopher Malatesta)(Dunn, Matt)
June 23, 2014 Filing 254 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Pamela McKeldin)(Dunn, Matt)
June 19, 2014 Filing 253 NOTICE Of Filing Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Sandra Johnson, #2 Consent to Sue of Kim Trowbridge)(Getman, Dan)
June 13, 2014 Filing 252 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) - Stipulated Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Red-line version pursuant to LCR 26(c))(Nelson, James)
June 12, 2014 Filing 251 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Kara Carper.)(Dunn, Matt)
June 2, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Eric Holland)(Dunn, Matt)
May 30, 2014 Filing 249 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Richard Newton)(Dunn, Matt)
May 19, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Alfonso Vasquez)(Dunn, Matt)
May 8, 2014 Filing 247 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Sheree Magera)(Dunn, Matt)
May 7, 2014 Filing 246 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Christine Putman)(Dunn, Matt)
April 25, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE of Filing of Withdrawal of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Dennis Henry withdrawal, #2 James McCarty withdrawal)(Dunn, Matt)
April 24, 2014 Filing 244 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of William C. Wangerin)(Dunn, Matt)
April 23, 2014 Filing 243 Letter from Matthew Dunn re #238 Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates,,, . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dunn, Matt)
April 21, 2014 Filing 242 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Johanna Goosey, #2 Consent to Sue of Robin Sweeney)(Dunn, Matt)
April 17, 2014 Filing 241 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Karen Etheridge)(Dunn, Matt)
April 17, 2014 Filing 240 Letter from Matthew Dunn re 237 Scheduling Conference,, Clarification of Minutes Entry. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dunn, Matt)
April 16, 2014 Filing 239 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of William R. Clark)(Dunn, Matt)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES ; Jury Trial is set for 9/14/2015 at 09:00 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/18/2015, Motions due by 10/14/2014, Discovery completed by 11/5/2014, Dispositive motions due by 2/6/2015, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 7/8/2015, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/4/2015, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 8/18/2015, Motions in Limine due by 8/10/2015, Pretrial Order due by 8/28/2015, Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2015 at 08:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/28/2015, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/28/2015. s/Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
April 16, 2014 Filing 237 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: Dan Getman, Matt Dunn; Def Counsel: James Boudreau, James Nelson; CR: None; Scheduling Conference held on 4/16/2014. Counsel outlines their position regarding bifurcation & scheduling. The Court authorizes 20 deposition with leave to allow counsel to file a motion for more. The Court declines to bifurcate. Discovery shall be completed by November 5, 2014. Motion for class certification to be submitted in compliance with LCR23. Call concluded.(JAB)
April 14, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Joseph Edmonds, #2 Consent to Sue of Allen Johnson)(Dunn, Matt)
April 10, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Wendy Hixson)(Dunn, Matt)
April 9, 2014 Filing 234 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Alexis Piggee and Phyllis Wagoner.)(Dunn, Matt)
April 8, 2014 Filing 233 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jami Baker, Rudy Green, Nancy Larimer, Todd Montgomery and James Osby.)(Dunn, Matt)
April 7, 2014 Filing 232 ANSWER to #216 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company.(Nelson, James)
April 7, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of David Scott Bell, Cindy Bennett, Kathy A. Bergeron, Grady L. Chuculate, Dompey Courage, Angel Courtney, Sheldan Crowell, Kelly L. DiLorenzo, Anthony D. Garner and Cory Gherke., #2 Consent to Sue of Keith Gittens, Randall Hab, Tamika Harris, Dennis C. Henry, Matt Holmes, Marquez Jones, Monica Karousos, Aaron Baird Kelly, Kerry Lyons and Arturo Maldonado., #3 Consent to Sue of James K. McCarty Jr., Charles M. McConville, Steven Mosier, Jeanie L. Nelson, Travis Nesby, Hope Newton, Robert A. Oberst, Antonio Pryor, Aaron Reeves and Luis Ribeiro., #4 Consent to Sue of Amy Rose, Gus Tarr, Analia Uribe, Steven Lee Wanie, Glen Weber and Stephanie Wintle.)(Dunn, Matt)
April 4, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Greg Anderson, John W. Beers, Gregory S. Broadfoot, Jason Caserio, Lori Chucci, Sandy Cole, Brandon Dowling, Marcus Freeman, Yonadan Gonzalez and Suzanne Lomax., #2 Consent to Sue of John Morin, James R. Perry, Ronald G. Raab, Charles K. Reid, Harvey T. Sandefur, Robert St. Clair, Robert Stewart, Gary M. Temke, Maris Tharp, Ryan Tigges and Gregory Wiggins.)(Dunn, Matt)
April 4, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE of Filing of Withdrawal of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Eric T. Kennedy Withdrawal)(Dunn, Matt)
April 3, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Tami Baker, Jaqueline Burkink, Gary Childress, Michael Davis II, Mark Glover, William A. Greco, Donna Howell, Richard J. Klauser, Alfred Passero and Timothy J. Pfannenstiel., #2 Consent to Sue of Larry Ragin, Darrel Shelton, Loyd Vaughn, Walter Watt Jr., and Michael Workman.)(Dunn, Matt)
April 2, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Patrick M. Blake, James J. Carter, John J. Dempsey, Mark Francescon, Michael Ray Parks and Jody Rabinsowitz.)(Dunn, Matt)
April 1, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of John F. Conschafsky, Mike McDade, Emily Ann Melton, William Mettler Jr., Carlos Quiles, Sheila Shaffar and Donna Skinner.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 31, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Martin J. Alexa, George Argentino, Martin Ball, Crescenzo Carovillano, Loren E. Gerwick Jr., James Harris Jr., Frank Henderson, Anthony E. Hill, Gregg Hoover and Ray Johnson., #2 Consent to Sue of Christie Kelly, Thomas Kincaid, Vicki Koshir, William Krogman, Kent A. Kurtz, Mark Lowe, Tim McCoy, Gregory McDonald, Terry N. Mobley and Teresa M. Moore., #3 Consent to Sue of Lylah-Denise T. Ramsey, Sally Roscoe, Timothy J. Scanlon, Gary D. Sherrod, Derek Tykwinski, and Robert L. Williams Jr.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 28, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Darrell W. Bishop, Douglas R. Bumgarner, Jeanne Godwin, Mark S. Graham, Philip Lee Nussbaum, Vince Renfrow and Brian K. Wallace.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 27, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Douglas J. Byrd, David Ricky Campbell, Kristina M. Farias, Rickey Frazier, Linn E. Major, Ronald W. Martin, James Oberst, Lori Rademaker and Randolph V. Thompson.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 26, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE of Filing of Consent To Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Robert Vassallo, #2 Consent to Sue of Eric Wilson, #3 Consent to Sue of Richard Yaworski)(Dunn, Matt)
March 25, 2014 Filing 221 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of William T. Estes, #2 Consent to Sue of Richard T. Wood)(Dunn, Matt)
March 24, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Audeliz Benique, Richard Blum, Douglas J. Buescher, David Cordes, Tammy J. Cornmesser, Kristin DeVoe, Rodney Downey, Robert Etscheidt, Thomas C. Gambill, Michael T. Jackson Sr. and Lonnie Jones., #2 Consent to Sue of Harold Karas, Clint Koch, Joe R. Loya, Dave Madewell, Andrew W. Pollock, Timothy J. Prior, Aubrey E. Smith, E. Neal Staley, Aleta Stock, Kurt Sumrall and Brian Treadaway.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MINUTE ORDER Terminating the In-Court scheduling conference 217 set for 4/4/14 and resetting as a Telephone Conference for 4/16/2014 at 09:00 AM, PST. s/Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
March 21, 2014 Filing 218 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Darrell Aschenbeck, Steve Blevins, Ronald Coker, James Michael Robinson, Robert F. Rutledge and Derrick Sellars.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 20, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE of Hearing: Pursuant to the request of counsel, an In-court Scheduling Hearing is set for 4/4/2014 at 02:00 PM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. s/Jean Boring as directed. (JAB)
March 20, 2014 Filing 216 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, filed by Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Getman, Dan)
March 20, 2014 Filing 215 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Thomas J. Bottichio, William E. Burd, Michael Cueto, Patricia Freyburger, Sara Judd, James T. McKeague, David Meindl, Kirk D. Mushrush, Michael Santangelo Jr., Joseph A. Slattery and Ty Wheeler.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #199 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
March 19, 2014 Filing 213 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jeremy Faulk, Wendell Mead, Robert Reyes, Cathy L. Thomas, Jacob Ulland and Ken Zabriskie.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 18, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Tommy Braswell, Blake Burnett, Kathy Crouch, Jesus DeLaCruz, Mark Ficker, Thomas A. Perteete and Robert L. Piehl.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 17, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of James E. Arnold, Don E. Barrett Jr., Terry L. Baun, Edward J. Bowman, Ernest P. Boyer,Kevin Bradford, Brandi Brinson, Genisa Carpenter, Hoyt Wayne Clark, Belinda Gilgenbach, Bonnie Jones, Richard Kellogg and John G. Kent., #2 Consent to Sue of Ken Kollasch, Christopher Dale Lasseter, Jon B. Leonardelli, Tim Randall, James B. Robbins, Michael Rodewald, Cynthia A. Scaggs, Barbara J. Sheaks, Gary Simone, Kristin Smith, Alan Stanton, Craig Taormina and Doug Teckenbrock.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 14, 2014 Filing 210 AMENDMENT to #209 Joint Status Report by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Boudreau, James)
March 14, 2014 Filing 209 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Boudreau, James)
March 14, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Virgil W. Allen, Jesus Armenta Jr., Steven Barton, Cedric Burch, Derell Collins, William E. Gray Jr., Tony Madden, Alan L. Upchurch, Kim Volpenheim and Dana Warren.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 13, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Frances A. Estevez, Mark Fluss, Lydia A. Gallegos, Marcus W. Gould, Dameon Holmes, Joseph E. Hunley Jr., Monica Mullis, Kevin A. Pompey, Tom Smircich, Kevin L. Smith, Jesus E. Varela and Casey Wallace.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 12, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Brian Harvey, Doug W. Justice and Joseph Riker.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 11, 2014 Filing 205 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Roy K. Forsht, James Hager, Richard Miller, Takayuki Nagano, Rachel Realmuto, Craig A. Stoller, Earl Thompson, Corey Wagner and Nancy Wagner.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 10, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Michael DiSanto, Duane Fauser II, Edward R. Halenda Jr., Jeremy C. Kemp, Dawn McCoy, Cheryl McGuire, Brian E. Rindt, Michael Rosales, Jerry Stacy, John Michael Stout, Jeff Tarleton, Jason Trogdon and Floyd Truby.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 7, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Robert Burns, Craig Guertin, Jeffry Horak, Katherine Howell, Thomas Moseley and Chad Napper.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 6, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Norman J. Barney, Jerry S. Honea and Wade Shauers.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER re #175 Parties' joint submission regarding an "impasse" over interpretation of the Court's prior Order, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
March 5, 2014 Filing 200 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #199 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #142 Amended Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 3rd Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 3rd Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Getman, Dan)
March 5, 2014 Filing 199 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #142 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. Noting Date 3/21/2014, (Getman, Dan)
March 5, 2014 Filing 198 NOTICE of Filing of Cosent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Scott Andryauskas, Bonnie D. Crawford-Cook and Richard Kellam.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 4, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Tina Caldwell, Thomas C. Fisher, Rocco Giunta, Kenny Hadel, David Olsen, Doran Randall, Dennis J. Rieder and George F. Whitaker.)(Dunn, Matt)
March 3, 2014 Filing 196 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of Jerrod W. Blake, Mike J. Boschsler, Garrett Cole Brashear, Staci Davis Chesser, Robert L. Conger, Courtland Coons, Andrew F. Dalton, Trey Danzey, Jerome Diakow and Donna Doan., #2 Consent to Sues of Robert A. Dudley, Ruth J. Dye, Mark Elston, Lisa A. Fahlman, John C. Galloway, Zenaida Garcia, Scott Gard, Romeo Hesano, Adam S. Hill, Jonathan Jenkins and Deborah Keen., #3 Consent to Sues of Jeffrey J. Kelly, Eric T. Kennedy, Guy Kerstetter, Bobby Ray Key, Thomas J. Korgie, Nick Kuvakos, Melanie Lewis, Rommel P. Manalo, Julie M. Mayhew, Richard McFaddin and Ronald E. McLeod., #4 Consent to Sues of Larry Nebel, Ramon Ress, Randall Scott, Thomas E. Scott, Jennifer Steinmetz, William P. Thacker, Samantha Tudtud, Fred B. Thompson, Richard L. Torlone, Jennifer Weiss and Melissa L. Vider.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 28, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of Annie Brooks, L. Allen Carter, William Davis, John F. Fabanish, Timothy Golden, Nathan Lane, Walter Neal, Phyllisa Pearson, Michael Pritchett, Shanendooh Spier, Larry W. Tasker, Mark D. Van Horn and Alberto Vela.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 28, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE of Filing of Withdrawal of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Brian J. Stewart Withdrawal)(Dunn, Matt)
February 27, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of Tommy Anthony, Larry O. Cole, Tiffany L. Gatto, Robert J. Goettel, Raymond E. Grant Jr., Matthew Gregory, Susan Hart, Joseph J. Jankiewicz Jr., Dana K. Lee and Felicia Kornegay., #2 Consent to Sues of Edward McLaughlin, Michael Onorato, Heather Pellegrino, Jeri L. Rivard, Stanley Scherer, Adam Schiff, Gregory R. Scott, Stephen Ray Simmons, Alan Slack and Brain Suddoth.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 26, 2014 Filing 192 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Rodger Lecocq, John J. Keech III, Codi Loper, Eldon Lytle, Mike McDaid, Jean Mienders, Michael J. OConnor, Heather Parker, John D. Pavlik and Gary L. Qualls., #2 Consent to Sue of Anton P. Raterman, Chad A. Ritter, Luther G. Scarlett, Sandra Schnetter, Edward Schwartz, William B. Sigler, Mark Slager, Daniel A. Snyder, Matthew Steege, Ronald Stigger and Kelly J. Story., #3 Consent to Sue of Gregory Talbot, Scott Tubo, Leslie Turpening, Karen Wagner, Steven Ray Warden, Sam Villanueva, Eddie A. Weaver, Greg Klueber, Stephen P. Wehner and Ryan Williams.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 26, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of Carla Alvarado, James D. Anderson, Susan H. Besozzi, Wendy Blalock, Kevin Bridges, Mike Carns, Roger D. Carroll, Juan I. Cavazos, David Cole and Pauls Cortes., #2 Consent to Sues of Russell W. Culpepper, Peggy Davis, Tommy Davis, Robin Echerd, Melaine Feldman, Michael Feldman, Timothy T. Finch, Alfredo Flores, David F. Updyke Jr. and Thomas K. Gabbie., #3 Consent to Sues of Keith P. Graaff, William Guffgy, Jim Harris, Chad Heeter, Jennifer Hie, James Hough, Mark Howell, William Irizarry, Stephanie A. Johnson and Susan Lanham.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 19, 2014 Filing 190 Letter from Defendants & Plaintiffs to Judge Leighton with Attachments. (Nelson, James)
February 19, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of Louis Reeise, Brian J. Stewart and Juan O. Vidaurri.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 18, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of Andrew Donnelly, Kris W. Ferguson, Tamsen Gaskell, Craig A. Glasscock, Allen C. Greeley, William L. Guy III, Tracey Hiles, Carolyn Heinowski, Jonathan C. Hoyle and David Loffer., #2 Consent to Sues of Anthony Scott Mallard, Jackie McCall, John D. McDevitt, James McGuire, Misty Coral Pace, Jarrad J. Paul, Penny Nelson, Charles Pemberton, Garth A. Peter and Chad Prologo., #3 Consent to Sues of Buffy Prouty, Scott Quiring, Edward J. Raggie, Jeffrey Ralston, Rollin J. Reading III, Joseph Rigdon, Bob Roberts, Eddy M. Sanchez, Bert Seabourn, and Sheila Simpson., #4 Consent to Sues of Alicia Venher-Slick, Devin Stokes, Tina Venzon, Christopher S. Voss, Barry J. Wagoner, Larry G. Weathers, Clifton A. Wiggins, Michelle D. Williams, John Scott Wilson, Tracy W. Wilson, and Devin L. Zickfoose.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 18, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of James J. Arre, Angela Borgstedt, Ronald Brown, Kelly A. Embert, Raul Galvan, Kurt A. Harris,Jr., Kenneth E. Hoak, Christopher W. King, Randy Kuchenbecker and Adam MacDormand., #2 Consent to Sues of Dean R. Moran Jr., Gregory J. Oyster, Marcus Perez, Michael F. Phillips, Thomas H. Priaulx, Richard Robertson, Anthony J. Rosa, Amy L. Rutmann, Richard Stutes and Richard M. Volk., #3 Consent to Sues of Christopher Adams, Wesley T. Berry Jr., Travis Boyer, Vicki A. Brzozowski, Clare Buhrandt, Bryan L. Chapman, Getman J. Cordero, Cary Culp, Genie Deckard and Steven DeMott.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 14, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of Dale Stewart, Fiona Stimus, Jason Williams, Gregory C. Atchley, Keith Bishop, Vickie Jo Bolles, Richard Briggs, David H. Brown, Daniel J. Bustad, Rhonda Canterberry, and Randy Hansen., #2 Consent to Sues of David H. Hasenbein, Joe Hernandez, Michael Garrett, Justin Avery Godfrey, Jennifer Gust, Susan K. Larkins, Kimberly J. Pasch, Edward L. Pence, Bruce W. Johnson, Jason Ledbetter and Walter C. Loyd., #3 Consent to Sues of Catherine McCabe, Michael McCoy, Scott Osborne, Melanie Payne, Danny W. Peavler, Thomas Rankin, John Richardson, Linda K. Wilson, Alexis Vazquez, Wade Washburn, Deena Waters and Steven Wochner.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 14, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of Nicolas E. Arneson, Raymond Bass Jr., Matthew Bench, Alan W. Bolding, Jeff Bostie, James W. Carnes, Vicki J. Cook, Stephanie Couture, Richard DeWald, Dale Dolechek and John Feher., #2 Consent to Sues of James Manly Hobbs, Michelle Hutte, Chad Gasterland, James M. Gooch, Rondell Jones II, Mark Kohlhagen, Raymond Laird, Derrick Lockett, Jeff Monroe, James P. Morgan, and Nancy Moquist., #3 Consent to Sues of David J. Pearce, Brenda Potratz, Melanie Y. Richard, Joseph Restivo, Michael Schram, Mark A. Sikorg, Paul C. Shoemaker, Jeffery Smith, Scot Smith, William Smith and Douglas J. Speer.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2014, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
February 12, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Broderick Brookshire, Charles Grabowski, Erick Matson, William T. Olander, Arthur Pedersen, Edward Jerry Prager, Monica L. Rook, Piarus Tatum, Reginald Taylor, Dusty Veach and Julie Vihstadt.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 11, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of Mark F. Bonn, Andrea Weiand Burgoa, Corey F. Chase, Jerome W. Cortazzo, Sinead C. DeRoiste, Jeff Evans, Bret R. Hanisch, Johnny Hincher, Elizabeth N. Jansen, Brion Knepp and Robert LaPelle., #2 Consent to Sues of Larry Larson, Sam A. Marzula Jr., Charles A. Mencias, Leeann Morningstar, Michelle M. Nyers, Alex M. Orosz, Karen Rogers, William R. Trout, Thomas C. Tuck, Kenneth Watson, Robert Wiltsie, and Stephen Ron Yelman.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 10, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of Lisa J. Baldridge, Daron J. Ballard, Marie Boulton, Christopher L. Cabello, Gorman Champion, Patrick Cox, James D. Dennis, Shannon DiRose, Corey M. Estok, Greg Findlay, Eddie Garcia and Robert A. Haley., #2 Consent to Sues of Gregory Hillman, John E. Jones, Mike Kapustka, Karen A. LaRocca, John Lucarelli, Efrain Montemayor, Luis S. Moreno, Bradley E. Neal, James M. Robinette, Derrick Z. Seabaugh, Paul Sylvester, Esteban Tijerina and John E. Wetter.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 7, 2014 Filing 180 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Thomas P. Carlson, Brian Flynn, Michael J. Forte, Douglas C. Gantt, Michael W. Reid, and Jan Zindt.)(Dunn, Matt)
February 7, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE of Filing of Corrected Spelling of Consent to Sue (Document#74-3) ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Lisa Lajoie)(Dunn, Matt)
February 6, 2014 Filing 178 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sues ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sues of Dennis Bargerhuff, Tony L. Blackwell, Angel L. Cruz, Michael J. Hetrick, Christopher J. Horvath, Joseph P. Kelly, Michael E. Olson, Adam Pedraza, John Rahija, Dawn Segar and Edward M. Smith)(Dunn, Matt)
February 6, 2014 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #164 MOTION to Compel Each Plaintiff's Responses to First Set of Interrogatories: motion is reinstated as the Notice to Withdraw Pending Motion #177 leaves one issue for review. (CMG)
February 4, 2014 Filing 177 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #164 MOTION to Compel Each Plaintiff's Responses to First Set of Interrogatories ; by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Nelson, James)
February 3, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Marie Boulton)(Dunn, Matt)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Clarifying #168 MOTION for Reconsideration re #166 Order on Motion to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by Kellogg Company, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
January 22, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Armon McWell)(Dunn, Matt)
January 21, 2014 Filing 173 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #168 MOTION for Reconsideration re #166 Order on Motion to Certify FLSA Collective Action. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matt Dunn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Getman, Dan)
January 21, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Timothy H. Beatty)(Dunn, Matt)
January 17, 2014 Filing 171 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, TO RESPONSE to #164 MOTION to Compel Each Plaintiff's Responses to First Set of Interrogatories (Nelson, James)
January 15, 2014 Filing 170 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Diana Adkins, #2 Consent to Sue of Christine Draska)(Dunn, Matt)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #168 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
January 13, 2014 Filing 168 MOTION for Reconsideration re #166 Order on Motion to Certify FLSA Collective Action by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 1/13/2014, (Nelson, James)
January 13, 2014 Filing 167 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, to #164 MOTION to Compel Each Plaintiff's Responses to First Set of Interrogatories. (Attachments: #1 Dunn Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Dunn, Matt)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #81 Motion to Certify FLSA Collective Action, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
January 8, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Ronald Johnson)(Dunn, Matt)
January 2, 2014 Filing 164 MOTION to Compel Each Plaintiff's Responses to First Set of Interrogatories by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Nelson, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/17/2014, (Nelson, James)
December 26, 2013 Filing 163 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Wenceslado Castellano Jr.)(Dunn, Matt)
December 23, 2013 Filing 162 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Richard Quezada)(Dunn, Matt)
December 20, 2013 Filing 161 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Steve Eckholt, #2 Consent to Sue of Mark Waggoner)(Dunn, Matt)
December 12, 2013 Filing 160 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Alphonso Clark, #2 Consent to Sue of Kevin Simcox)(Dunn, Matt)
December 10, 2013 Filing 159 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Paul T. Smart, #2 Consent to Sue of John Lowenthal)(Dunn, Matt)
December 9, 2013 Filing 158 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Michael D. McEwen, #2 Consent to Sue of Laveshia Yarborough-Wall)(Dunn, Matt)
December 4, 2013 Filing 157 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Pamela A. Pierce)(Dunn, Matt)
December 2, 2013 Filing 156 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jesse B. Keesee, #2 Consent to Sue of Charles Latta III)(Dunn, Matt)
November 27, 2013 Filing 155 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Donald M. Smith, #2 Consent to Sue of Bruce L. Jones)(Dunn, Matt)
November 22, 2013 Filing 154 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jeffrey Manier)(Dunn, Matt)
November 21, 2013 Filing 153 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Troy R. Hawkins, #2 Consent to Sue of David Mastenbrook)(Dunn, Matt)
November 20, 2013 Filing 152 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Aaron Noble, #2 Consent to Sue of Cynthia Rubino)(Dunn, Matt)
November 19, 2013 Filing 151 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of David Aldrich, #2 Consent to Sue of Tony Cain)(Dunn, Matt)
November 14, 2013 Filing 150 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Cynthia Meuth)(Dunn, Matt)
November 12, 2013 Filing 149 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Kathryn E. McFarland, #2 Consent to Sue of Mary Jo Oesterling)(Dunn, Matt)
November 8, 2013 Filing 148 ANSWER to #142 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Kellogg Company.(Boudreau, James)
November 6, 2013 Filing 147 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jessica Quigley)(Dunn, Matt)
October 29, 2013 Filing 146 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Sunshine Walling)(Dunn, Matt)
October 25, 2013 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Matt Dunn filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 - 30b6 Deposition, #2 Exhibit 9 - Variable Labor Report, #3 Certificate of Service)(Getman, Dan)
October 25, 2013 Filing 144 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, TO RESPONSE to #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
October 23, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Joseph Reed, #2 Consent to Sue of Michael White)(Dunn, Matt)
October 22, 2013 Filing 142 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action and FLSA Collective Action against defendant(s) Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, filed by Robert Gibson, Kelley Dye, Jr, Patty Thomas, Jennifer Dowling, Laura Wisby, David Rink. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dunn, Matt)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #125 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
October 18, 2013 Filing 140 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Paula Wiemer)(Dunn, Matt)
October 11, 2013 Filing 139 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas, TO RESPONSE to #125 MOTION to Amend #56 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Second Amended Complaint With Changes Notated)(Dunn, Matt)
October 10, 2013 Filing 138 NOTICE of Filing of Cosent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Curtis Barker)(Dunn, Matt)
October 9, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Wendy Lynn Frey, #2 Consent to Sue of Sharon Ziegler)(Dunn, Matt)
October 7, 2013 Filing 136 NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION REPORTER CERTIFICATES IN SUPPORT OF re #133 MOTION to Certify Class OPPOSITION ; filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Nelson, James)
October 7, 2013 Filing 135 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, to #125 MOTION to Amend #56 Amended Complaint,. (Nelson, James)
October 7, 2013 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #133 MOTION to Certify Class OPPOSITION : Corrected descriptive language, added hyperlink to show what document is being responded too, and terminated the noting date. (CMG)
October 7, 2013 ***TERMINATING the NOTING DATE for ECF No. #133 MOTION to Certify Class OPPOSITION filed by Kellogg Company, Kellogg USA Inc, Kellogg Sales Company, as this is actually an Opposition to the Motion to Certify Class (ECF No. 81). (CMG)
October 4, 2013 Filing 134 REQUEST For Oral Argument by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company for Oral Argument re #133 MOTION to Certify Class OPPOSITION. (Nelson, James)
October 4, 2013 Filing 133 MOTIONOPPOSITION to Plaintiff's #81 Motion to Certify Class OPPOSITION by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, Kellogg USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patty Thomas Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit Jennifer Dowling Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit Kelley Dye Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit Robert Gibson Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit Brussell Declaration and Attachments, #6 Exhibit Declarations In Support Of, #7 Exhibit Soliman Sayedi Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit KUSA Sales Job Profile, #9 Exhibit Jeff Williams Declaration) Noting Date 9/6/2013, (Nelson, James) Modified on 10/7/2013: Corrected at the request of counsel, document should have been posted as a Response/Opposition to the motion and not a "Motion" (CMG).
October 4, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Stephen Kern)(Dunn, Matt)
September 30, 2013 Filing 131 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Monte Nevills, #2 Consent to Sue of Reuben J. Garza)(Dunn, Matt)
September 27, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Kurt Pfeffer)(Dunn, Matt)
September 25, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jeff Postma, #2 Consent to Sue of Tammy Ward, #3 Consent to Sue of Christopher Vaughn)(Dunn, Matt)
September 23, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Gary Pulling)(Dunn, Matt)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER on STIPULATION re #120 Stipulation, filed by Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice; response and reply dates are set forth in this order, and the Motion is renoted for 10/25/2013. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
September 20, 2013 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Dowling, Kelley Dye, Jr, Robert Gibson, Patty Thomas re #125 MOTION to Amend #56 Amended Complaint, (Getman, Dan)
September 20, 2013 Filing 125 MOTION to Amend #56 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Jennifer Dowling, Kelley Dye, Jr, Robert Gibson, Patty Thomas. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) Noting Date 10/11/2013, (Getman, Dan)
September 20, 2013 Filing 124 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Coy Knights)(Dunn, Matt)
September 19, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jeffery Thomas Anthony)(Dunn, Matt)
September 17, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Lisa Friedrich, #2 Consent to Sue of Jonathan Suchon)(Dunn, Matt)
September 16, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Julie Kohlman)(Dunn, Matt)
September 13, 2013 Filing 120 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER AS TO DEADLINES REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONDITIONALLY CERTIFY A FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION AND TO ISSUE NOTICE by parties re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice. (Nelson, James)
September 13, 2013 Filing 119 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Darrell Farren, #2 Consent to Sue of Kimberly Waymoth, #3 Consent to Sue of Sherri Harris, #4 Consent to Sue of Tammy L. Blaha)(Dunn, Matt)
September 12, 2013 Filing 118 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Joseph W. Wellweber, #2 Consent to Sue of Doug Byrd, #3 Consent to Sue of Susan Litcrell)(Dunn, Matt)
September 10, 2013 Filing 117 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Ryan Fiser, #2 Consent to Sue of Dennison D. Tieman)(Dunn, Matt)
September 9, 2013 Filing 116 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Craig Glassman)(Dunn, Matt)
September 6, 2013 Filing 115 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on 8/26/2013 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Teri Hendrix by telephone at 253-882-3831. or by e-mail at Teri_Hendrix@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2013, (Hendrix, Teri)
September 6, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jeannine Crabtree, #2 Consent to Sue of Thomas Wegrzyn)(Dunn, Matt)
September 5, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Mary L. Brown)(Dunn, Matt)
September 4, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Denisse De La Pava-Robles)(Dunn, Matt)
September 3, 2013 Filing 111 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Michael L. Sparano, #2 Consent to Sue of Patti Lambert Spain, #3 Consent to Sue of Deborah M. Vogliardo)(Dunn, Matt)
August 29, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Bonita Giglio)(Getman, Dan)
August 29, 2013 Filing 109 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Erwin Recalde)(Getman, Dan)
August 28, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE of filing of consent to sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Judy Brashear, #2 Consent to Sue of David Hayes)(Getman, Dan)
August 27, 2013 Filing 107 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: Michael Subit, Matt Dunn (Phone); Def Counsel: James Boudreau, James Nelson; CR: Teri Hendrix; Status Conference held on 8/27/2013. After discussion the Court determines that discovery will be allowed. Court approves the stipulation as to Deadlines Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Conditionally Certify a FLSA Collective Action and to Issue Notice and Order. Hearing concluded.(JAB)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER on STIPULATION re #103 Deadlines Re Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify a FLSA Collective Action and to Issue Notice and Order: Def's Response due by 9/20/13; Pltf's Reply due by 10/3/13; FLSA statute of limitation is tolled for 3 weeks. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
August 26, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE of filing Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of James Case, #2 Consent to Sue of Carl Kowal, #3 Consent to Sue of James McCartt, #4 Consent to Sue of Rhonda Nemitz)(Getman, Dan)
August 23, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of William C. Bowen)(Dunn, Matt)
August 22, 2013 Filing 103 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice Parties' Stipulation as to Deadlines Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Conditionally Certify a FLSA Collective Action and to Issue Notice and Order (Nelson, James)
August 21, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Rhonda Blanton)(Dunn, Matt)
August 19, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Daniel Sullivan)(Dunn, Matt)
August 15, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Karen Ranuio Matney)(Dunn, Matt)
August 14, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Stephanie Estel)(Dunn, Matt)
August 13, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Sherry Zimmerman, #2 Consent to Sue of Jane I. Hoven)(Dunn, Matt)
August 12, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Randy Wallace, #2 Consent to Sue of Mary R. Montoya)(Dunn, Matt)
August 12, 2013 Filing 96 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2013 at 09:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Leighton.(JAB)
August 9, 2013 Filing 95 EXHIBIT 1 Notice re #82 Memorandum by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 Postcard, #2 Exhibit 3 Kellogg's 2011 Annual Report, #3 Exhibit 4 Special Filing See remarks, #4 Exhibit 5 History, #5 Exhibit 6 Sherri Day, Pepsi Bottling Settles Case on Overtime, #6 Exhibit 7 Notice-Other)(Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 94 DECLARATION of Vito Viviano filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 93 DECLARATION of Patty Thomas filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Paul Scafede filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Soliman Sayed filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Steve S. Moody filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Teresa Maxwell filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Kelly Kivett filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Eleazar Jiminez filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Robert Gibson filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 85 DECLARATION of Kelley Dye filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Jennifer Dowling filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Stephanie Ater filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas re #81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 81 MOTION to Certify a FLSA Collective Action and Issue Notice by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/6/2013, (Getman, Dan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 80 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Gregory J. Munkelt, #2 Consent to Sue of Anthony M. Prince)(Dunn, Matt)
August 7, 2013 Filing 79 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Frank Gardiner, #2 Consent to Sue of Scott Kenney, #3 Consent to Sue of James Sparks)(Dunn, Matt)
August 6, 2013 Filing 78 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Helen Conley)(Dunn, Matt)
August 2, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Michael R. Przybyszewski, #2 Consent to Sue of Jeffrey Maragh, #3 Consent to Sue of Jeffrey Bobrow)(Dunn, Matt)
August 1, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Andrea Flajole, #2 Consent to Sue of Alan L. Bradley, #3 Consent to Sue of Robert Munson)(Dunn, Matt)
July 31, 2013 Filing 75 Joint STATUS REPORT AND RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Getman, Dan)
July 31, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Kevin Walthers, #2 Consent to Sue of Steven Nani, #3 Consent to Sue of Lisa Cajoie)(Dunn, Matt)
July 30, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Anne LeRoy, #2 Consent to Sue of Ronald J. Jubber Jr., #3 Consent to Sue of Linda K. Hutchkiss)(Dunn, Matt)
July 29, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Robert Martinez, #2 Consent to Sue of Thomas Beckmann, #3 Consent to Sue of James Ganpat, #4 Consent to Sue of Christian Garcia, #5 Consent to Sue of Joseph Garzino)(Dunn, Matt)
July 26, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Brent E. Tuggle)(Dunn, Matt)
July 26, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jason McConnell, #2 Consent to Sue of Jeffrey A. Truesdell)(Dunn, Matt)
July 25, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of TIffany Sutton, #2 Consent to Sue of Diane Stein)(Dunn, Matt)
July 22, 2013 Filing 68 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jennifer Clayborn, #2 Consent to Sue of Eddy A. Miller, #3 Consent to Sue of Leonard Newman)(Dunn, Matt)
July 18, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE of filing Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Marcella Holman)(Getman, Dan)
July 18, 2013 Filing 66 NOTICE of filing of Consents to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Marsha Adams, #2 Consent to Sue of Michael Controne, #3 Consent to Sue of Mark Harsanye, #4 Consent to Sue of Michael Jarvis, #5 Consent to Sue of Norma Jenkins, #6 Consent to Sue of Joseph Smith, #7 Consent to Sue of Brian VandeBrake, #8 Consent to Sue of Tom Whitehead, #9 Consent to Sue of Mark Yapuncich, #10 Consent to Sue of Anthony Zito)(Getman, Dan)
July 16, 2013 Filing 65 ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint by Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company.(Nelson, James)
July 11, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE of FIling of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Kim P. Bjorklund)(Dunn, Matt)
July 10, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Dion P. McLain, #2 Consent to Sue Tony Smith)(Dunn, Matt)
July 8, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Janice Nannette Ivey, #2 Consent to Sue of Mary N. Ivey)(Dunn, Matt)
July 5, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Mark Trent, #2 Consent to Sue of Jeffrey M. Rolfe)(Dunn, Matt)
July 3, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Dennis D. Adams)(Dunn, Matt)
July 1, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Mark Tuttle, #2 Consent to Sue of Charles Michael Nelson, #3 Consent to Sue of Deborah Ternet)(Dunn, Matt)
June 27, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Rhona Schiffres, #2 Consent to Sue of Joanie Devens)(Dunn, Matt)
June 27, 2013 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to James N. Boudreau, Esq. on 6/26/2013, filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Dowling, Kelley Dye, Jr, Robert Gibson, Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
June 25, 2013 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION AND FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION against defendant(s) Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, filed by Patty Thomas.(Getman, Dan)
June 25, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Martin Little, #2 Consent to Sue of Mitchell Medcalf)(Dunn, Matt)
June 24, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Michael Learo, #2 Consent to Sue of Debra D. Mills)(Dunn, Matt)
June 18, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Susan Mayhugh)(Dunn, Matt)
June 17, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Ron Lynch)(Dunn, Matt)
June 14, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Cheryl Cole, #2 Consent to Sue of Heidi Warren)(Dunn, Matt)
June 13, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Ronald Prater)(Dunn, Matt)
June 11, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jennifer Dowling)(Dunn, Matt)
June 10, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Neil Smith, #2 Consent to Sue of Anita McMahen, #3 Consent to Sue of John Mele, #4 Consent to Sue of Brent Hampton)(Dunn, Matt)
June 4, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Alan Reeves Wilson)(Dunn, Matt)
May 28, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Craig L. Rumsey)(Dunn, Matt)
May 24, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Joe Wheeler, #2 Consent to Sue of Gregory L. Oswalt)(Dunn, Matt)
May 21, 2013 At request of counsel, the Initial Scheduling Dates have been terminated. The Deadline for FRCP 26(f) Conference will be 10 days after the defendants have answered; Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) will be due 20 days after the answer; and the Joint Status Report will be due 15 days after the answer. (DN)
May 20, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Steve S. Moody)(Dunn, Matt)
May 16, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Ronald Fowler)(Dunn, Matt)
May 15, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Ray Thomas Lathery, #2 Consent to Sue of Elliott Somers)(Dunn, Matt)
May 14, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Jon Ritner)(Dunn, Matt)
May 13, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Soliman S. Sayed, #2 Consent to Sue of Ferdinando A. Tirro)(Dunn, Matt)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER on the #38 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS James N Boudreau for Kellogg Company and Kellogg Sales Company, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CMG)
May 8, 2013 Filing 38 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James N. Boudreau FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Keebler Company, Keebler Foods Company, Keebler Holding Corp, Kellogg Company and Kellogg Sales Company, Kellogg USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3202198. (Nelson, James) Modified on 5/8/2013:to correct the defendants being represented. (CMG).
May 8, 2013 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #38 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: corrected PHV application to show which defendants were actually being represented (CMG)
May 7, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Shannon Pruitt)(Dunn, Matt)
May 6, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Karin S. Hudgins)(Dunn, Matt)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #22 Motion for variance on appearing pro hac vice for James Boudreau, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
May 2, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Stephanie M. Ater)(Dunn, Matt)
May 1, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Delipe M. Bans III)(Dunn, Matt)
April 30, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Kelly Kivett)(Dunn, Matt)
April 29, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Paul Scafede)(Getman, Dan)
April 26, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue of Chad Johnson ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Chad Johnson)(Dunn, Matt)
April 26, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent to Sue of Kim Bergren ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Dunn, Matt)
April 25, 2013 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company. (Nelson, James)
April 24, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Laura J. Wisby, #2 Consent to Sue of Glen R. Sullivan, #3 Consent to Sue of Brad Murphey, #4 Consent to Sue of Katherine Bennett)(Dunn, Matt)
April 22, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Robert D. Gibson)(Dunn, Matt)
April 16, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Samuel L. Parker JR., #2 Consent to Sue of Jodi Ignowski)(Dunn, Matt)
April 15, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Alfonso Burciaga, #2 Consent to Sue of Eleazar Jimenez, #3 Consent to Sue of Joh Van Hoey)(Dunn, Matt)
April 12, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Teresa Maxwell)(Dunn, Matt)
April 11, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION for Variance From Local Civil Rule 83.1(D) in Connection with the Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James Boudreau by Defendant Keebler Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion For Variance) Noting Date 4/26/2013, (Nelson, James)
April 11, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of John Weisser, #2 Consent to Sue of David R. Rink)(Dunn, Matt)
April 9, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Steven Feiles)(Dunn, Matt)
April 5, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James M Nelson on behalf of Defendant Kellogg Company. (Nelson, James)
April 4, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Vito Viviano)(Dunn, Matt)
April 1, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Kim Bergren, #2 Consent to Sue of Ronald L. Custer Jr., #3 Consent to Sue of Kelley R. Dye Jr., #4 Consent to Sue of Arthur Garland, #5 Consent to Sue of Timothy R. Tolan, #6 Consent to Sue of Judy M. Welch)(Dunn, Matt)
March 19, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Teri Geier)(Dunn, Matt)
March 13, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Sue ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue of Michael Heiner)(Dunn, Matt)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on the #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Matt Dunn for Patty Thomas, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CMG)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on the #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Dan Getman for Patty Thomas, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CMG)
March 12, 2013 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matt Dunn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Patty Thomas (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3137359. (Subit, Michael)
March 12, 2013 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dan Getman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Patty Thomas (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3137327. (Subit, Michael)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2013, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/15/2013, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/22/2013, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
February 27, 2013 NOTICE to Filer: DOCUMENTS REQUIRED BUT NOT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT: In the future, please rememer the Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and all Summons(es) should be attachments to your Complaint. Thank you. (DJ)
February 27, 2013 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (DJ)
February 27, 2013 Summons(es) issued via U.S. Postal Service as to defendant(s) Keebler Company, Keebler Foods Company, Keebler Holding Corp, Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company, Kellogg USA Inc. (DJ)
February 26, 2013 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Subit, Michael)
February 26, 2013 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Subit, Michael)
February 26, 2013 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Subit, Michael)
February 26, 2013 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Subit, Michael)
February 26, 2013 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Subit, Michael)
February 26, 2013 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Patty Thomas. (Subit, Michael)
February 26, 2013 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Patty Thomas.. (Subit, Michael)
February 26, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-3121397), filed by Patty Thomas.(Subit, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Kellogg Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Thomas
Represented By: Dan Getman
Represented By: Matt Dunn
Represented By: Meagan Rafferty
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dowling
Represented By: Dan Getman
Represented By: Matt Dunn
Represented By: Meagan Rafferty
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley Dye, Jr
Represented By: Dan Getman
Represented By: Matt Dunn
Represented By: Meagan Rafferty
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gibson
Represented By: Dan Getman
Represented By: Matt Dunn
Represented By: Meagan Rafferty
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Wisby
Represented By: Dan Getman
Represented By: Matt Dunn
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Represented By: Meagan Rafferty
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rink
Represented By: Dan Getman
Represented By: Matt Dunn
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Represented By: Meagan Rafferty
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Brashear
Represented By: Dan Getman
Represented By: Matt Dunn
Represented By: Meagan Rafferty
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mastenbrook
Represented By: Dan Getman
Represented By: Matt Dunn
Represented By: Meagan Rafferty
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armond McWell
Represented By: Dan Getman
Represented By: Matt Dunn
Represented By: Meagan Rafferty
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soliman Sayedi
Represented By: Dan Getman
Represented By: Matt Dunn
Represented By: Meagan Rafferty
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Dan Getman
Represented By: Matt Dunn
Represented By: Meagan Rafferty
Represented By: Michael J.D. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Represented By: James N Boudreau
Represented By: Brian T Feeney
Represented By: Christiana L Signs
Represented By: James M Nelson
Represented By: Michelle L DuCharme
Represented By: Tiffany S Fordyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Sales Company
Represented By: James N Boudreau
Represented By: Brian T Feeney
Represented By: Christiana L Signs
Represented By: James M Nelson
Represented By: Michelle L DuCharme
Represented By: Tiffany S Fordyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg USA Inc
Represented By: James M Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keebler Holding Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keebler Foods Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keebler Company
Represented By: James M Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?