Hahn v. Sinclair

Respondent: Steve Sinclair
Petitioner: Aaron Hahn
Case Number: 3:2013cv05263
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 ; plaintiff filed an updated Prison Trust Account Statement; in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 7/30/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
August 28, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge Karen L Strombom.(MET) cc: Petitioner
November 15, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Aaron Hahn; Petitioner's habeas petition is denied on the merits and dismissed with prejudice; Petitioner is denied issuance of a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/15/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
May 31, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aaron Hahn. $5.00 filing fee or Show Cause Response due by 6/21/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Petitioner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hahn v. Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.