Bolton v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Scott Carroll Bolton
Defendant: Director of Lucent Technologies, CEO of Lucent Technologies, State of Washington and John and Jane Doe of Lucent Technologies
Case Number: 3:2013cv05639
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 Dismissing this action for failure to comply with court order; in forma pauperis status revoked for purpose of appeal. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 11/1/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to file an Amended 5 Complaint that gives the Court the factual basis of his claim in more detail and explains why the corporate officers were acting under color of state law. Plaintiff's amended complaint must be filed on or before 9/6/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff & Snohomish County Corrections)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolton v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Lucent Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO of Lucent Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe of Lucent Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Carroll Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?