Hahn v. Waddington et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Hahn
Defendant: Doug Waddington, Scott Russell and Robert Martin
Case Number: 3:2014cv05047
Filed: January 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER ADOPTING the 112 Report and Recommendations; defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; and Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Aaron Hahn, Prisoner ID: 332715)(CMG)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. Plaintiff's Deadline for submitting Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is 1/19/2018. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Aaron Hahn, Prisoner ID: 332715)(GMR)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER the U.S. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke's Order Regarding Equitable Tolling construed here as a report and recommendation 65 IS ADOPTED; Defendants' Objection to and Appeal from Magistrate Judge's Order 67 ARE DENIED; and this case IS RE-REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Aaron Hahn, Prisoner ID: 332715)(CMG)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Aaron Hahn, Prisoner ID: 332715)(GMR)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REFERRING CASE to U.S. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke for further proceedings, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Aaron Hahn, Prisoner ID: 332715)(CMG)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 33 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Aaron Hahn, denying 34 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Aaron Hahn.Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Walla Walla address . Modified on 1/6/2015 (JL).
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail; mailed on 6/4/14 to Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff w/instruction sheet)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 15 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Aaron Hahn. The case is RE-REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Strombom for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 4/11/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hahn v. Waddington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Waddington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?