Lawson v. Warner et al
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr
Defendant: Bernard Warner, Kim Wyman, Jeffrey A Uttecht, Roy Gonzales, Bailey, Rand Simmons, L Wonders, Che, Miller, Ford, Gunter, Ayers, Stuenkel, John 1 Doe and John Doe, 2
Case Number: 3:2014cv05100
Filed: February 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 66 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr; this action is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 7/2/2015 (DN). (cc to pltf)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by 5/8/15 signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. (MET) cc: plaintiff
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 56 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr; the court dismisses the complaint, but not the action itself; plaintiff has 30 days to submit an amended complaint; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 3/2/2015 (DN). (cc to pltf)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 49 Motion to convert Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to a Motion for Summary Judgment, and granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Karen L Strombom denying 39 Motion for Extension of Time but will grant Mr. Lawson a short extension, until September 26, 2014, to file a response to defendants Motion to Dismiss. Defendants reply will be due on or before October 3, 2014 and denying 42 Motion to file surreply. The MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Thereof 36 is re-noted for 10/3/2014. (MET) cc: plaintiff
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Karen L Strombom granting 28 Motion to Stay Discovery; granting 33 Motion to supplement memorandum. (MET) cc: plaintiff
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 20 Motion to Change Venue signed by Judge Karen L Strombom.(MET) cc: plaintiff
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class mailed on 2/5/14 to all Defendants & AG signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. (MET) cc: plaintiff
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Warner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Robert Lawson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Wyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rand Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Wonders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Che
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuenkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?