Parker v. State of Washington

Petitioner: Andre T Parker
Respondent: State of Washington
Case Number: 3:2014cv05303
Filed: April 11, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 27 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to petitioner)
July 7, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class/Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested; mailed on 7/7/14 to Respondent & AG's office. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG;cc to Petitioner)
April 14, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE AN AMENDED PETITION OR MOTION TO CHANGE THE CASE CAPTION and name a proper respondent; petitioner's pleading must be filed on or before May 23, 2014; signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: petitioner w/blank petition form)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andre T Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?