Coots v. Doe #1 et al

Defendant: John Doe #2 and John Doe #1
Plaintiff: Casey D Coots
Case Number: 3:2014cv05547
Filed: July 9, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Lewis
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 11 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
September 3, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. (MET) cc: plaintiff & PLRA via ECF
August 14, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff to cure the defect in his 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis or SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff's response to this order must be filed on or before 9/19/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coots v. Doe #1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey D Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?