Greiner v. Wall et al
Plaintiff: June B. Greiner
Defendant: Cameron Wall and Ten Unknown Agents
Case Number: 3:2014cv05579
Filed: July 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 196 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (KMC)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER denying 154 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 155 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER denying 146 Defendants' Motion to Apply Law of the Case Doctrine and Mandate Rule; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER finding as moot 120 Motion to Certify Order on Interlocutory Appeal; granting 121 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 83 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss against the individual agents for violations of the Fourth Amendment and the federal knock and announce statute, and those claims (ONLY) are DISMISSED with prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 72 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint; denying 78 Motion to Compel without prejudice; denying 79 Motion to Compel without prejudice; striking 34 trial schedule, clerk will issue new scheduling order; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint within 10 days of this Order, and serve in due course; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greiner v. Wall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June B. Greiner
Represented By: Bradley W Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Wall
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten Unknown Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?