Scott v. Moniz et al

Plaintiff: Lori Lee Scott
Defendant: Ernest Moniz and Ciber Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv05684
Filed: August 28, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING, denying 85 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 2, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON FEDERAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
June 19, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE, continuing 57 Motion for Sanctions, subject to renoting after discovery is complete. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 15, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT CIBER'S AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT, denying 46 Motion to Dismiss; denying 47 Motion to Strike ; denying 50 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Moniz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Lee Scott
Represented By: Robert S Milesnick(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciber Inc
Represented By: Megan Burrows Carpenter(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael Anthony Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?