Allenmore Medical Investors, LLC v. City of Tacoma et al
Plaintiff: Allenmore Medical Investors, LLC
Defendant: City of Tacoma, Marilyn Strickland, Lauren Walker, Ryan Mello, Jake Fey, Victoria Woodards, Marty Campbell, David Boe and John Doe 1-20
Case Number: 3:2014cv05717
Filed: September 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 145 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees; granting a reduced attorney fee; denying prejudgment interest; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re 45 MOTION for Discovery In Camera Review filed by Allenmore Medical Investors, LLC; Defendant City of Tacoma is COMPELLED to disclose documents within 10 days of this order; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; counsel is directed to e-file the Amended Complaint within 5 days; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allenmore Medical Investors, LLC v. City of Tacoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tacoma
Represented By: Jean Pollis Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Strickland
Represented By: Jean Pollis Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Walker
Represented By: Jean Pollis Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Mello
Represented By: Jean Pollis Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Fey
Represented By: Jean Pollis Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Woodards
Represented By: Jean Pollis Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Campbell
Represented By: Jean Pollis Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Boe
Represented By: Jean Pollis Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-20
Represented By: Jean Pollis Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allenmore Medical Investors, LLC
Represented By: Tyler B. Ellrodt
Represented By: Anthony L Rafel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?