Pure Imagination LLC v. Adaptics Limited
Plaintiff: Pure Imagination LLC
Defendant: Adaptics Limited and John Doe 1-5
Case Number: 3:2014cv05976
Filed: December 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER denying 324 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Contentions; granting 327 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas; granting in part and denying in part 357 Defendant's Motion for Leave for additional depositions; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER denying 317 and 321 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER on Second Markman Claims Construction re 265 Brief - Opening filed by Adaptics Limited, 264 Brief - Opening, filed by Perfect Company; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 252 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER on MARKMAN Claims Construction; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER re 140 Court concludes that TC Heartland has no impact on this case and venue here is proper; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Imagination LLC v. Adaptics Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Imagination LLC
Represented By: Mark E Beatty
Represented By: Kurt Marcus Rylander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adaptics Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?