Ward v. EHW Constructors, J.V. et al
Plaintiff: Perry A Ward
Defendant: EHW Constructors, J.V., Skanska USA Inc, American Bridge Company, Ringer II Crane Barge and Nova Group Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv05338
Filed: May 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 108 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion for Summary Judgment.(TG)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 86 Motion to Suspend Voluntary Maintenance and Cure Payments by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER denying 84 Motion to Compel by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Kelly F Walsh; L Lane Roy and Jonathan A Tweedy terminated.(TG)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 68 Motion to Compel Rule 35 Examination by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2016: # 1 Order Compelling Examination) (TG).
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying in part 28 Motion for Summary Judgment.(TG)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part, denying in part, and reserving ruling on 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Perry A Ward. EHW may file response to Ward's additional evidence by 4/29/2016, Ward may file a reply by 5/6/2016, and 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment: renoted to 5/6/2016. (TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. EHW Constructors, J.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry A Ward
Represented By: Thomas C Evans
Represented By: H. L. George Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EHW Constructors, J.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanska USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bridge Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ringer II Crane Barge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?