Robertson v. Kitsap County et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Robertson
Defendant: Kitsap County, Conmed, Inc., Arlen Johnson, Barbara Mull, Sue Stevens and Bruce Kaler
Case Number: 3:2015cv05422
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 86 Defendants Johnson's and Steven's Motion to Certify; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 82 Defendants Johnson and Stevens' Motion for Reconsideration; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 80 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Arlen Johnson, Sue Stevens; the Court adopts the Report & Recommendation 79 ; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that the discovery period is re-opened. All discovery must be completed on or before 2/21/17. The Clerk is directed to RE-NOTE the Motions for Summary Judgment ( 35 , 43 ) for 3/24/2017. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (CMG)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge David W. Christel. (MET)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 Objections to Report and Recommendation; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is granted-in-part and denied-in-part, dismissing Fifth and Eighth Amendment claims, all other claims remain; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Clerk RE-NOTE Defendants' 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for 9/11/2015. If Plaintiff wishes to file a response with respect to his claims against Defendant Kitsap County, his response is due 9/7/15 and Defendants' supplemental reply, if any, will be due on or before 9/11/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (CMG)(cc to Plaintiff) Modified on 8/20/2015: struck the indication that order was mailed to Plaintiff - as Plaintiff has counsel that will receive a copy via electronic means. (CMG).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Kitsap County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Robertson
Represented By: Anthony Clarence Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitsap County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conmed, Inc.
Represented By: Craig L. McIvor
Represented By: Marc Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlen Johnson
Represented By: Craig L. McIvor
Represented By: Marc Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Mull
Represented By: Craig L. McIvor
Represented By: Marc Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Stevens
Represented By: Craig L. McIvor
Represented By: Marc Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Kaler
Represented By: Craig L. McIvor
Represented By: Marc Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?