Triple Diamond Investments LLC v. Tonkon Torp LLP et al
Plaintiff: Triple Diamond Investments LLC
Defendant: Tonkon Torp LLP, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Steven Wilker and Eric Beach
Case Number: 3:2015cv05594
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2016 ***Civil Case Terminated per #54 . (MGC)
June 7, 2016 Filing 54 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by parties (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rylander, Kurt)
May 12, 2016 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated due to reported settlement. Parties to file dismissal paperwork by /12/2016. (TG)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (TG)
March 30, 2016 Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #45 Amended Complaint by Defendant Tonkon Torp LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/30/2016, (Caldwell, Carey)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendants' answer due 4/1/2016.(TG)
March 2, 2016 Filing 50 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #45 Amended Complaint by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Kalmanson, Matthew)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting #48 Motion for Extension of Time; Defendants have until March 4, 2016 to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (TG)
February 16, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION to Amend #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , by Defendant Tonkon Torp LLP. Noting Date 2/16/2016, (Caldwell, Carey)
February 16, 2016 NOTICE TO FILER REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE - ACTION REQUIRED: the #46 Stipulated Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer lacks a valid signature; and therefore, has been removed from the Court's calendar until such time as it is corrected and re-filed. Pursuant to Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, "the following procedure applies when a stipulation or other document requires two or more signatures: The filing party shall initially confirm that the content of the document is acceptable to all persons required to sign the document, and shall obtain either physical signatures or authorization for the electronic signatures of all parties on the document. Physical, facsimile, or electronic signatures, consistent with the formats for attorney signatures, are permitted. The filing party may then file the document electronically, indicating the signatories as "s/ Jane Doe," "s/ John Smith," etc." Once prepared, the amended motion should to be re-filed and noted in CM/ECF. If you require assistance, please feel free to call the Helpdesk at 206-370-8440. Thank you. (GMR)
February 12, 2016 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Kalmanson filed by Defendant Tonkon Torp LLP re #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Caldwell, Carey)
February 12, 2016 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Tonkon Torp LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Carey)
February 5, 2016 Filing 45 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Triple Diamond Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rylander, Kurt)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 *Amended* MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *THREE DAY* Jury Trial is set for 6/6/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joinder of Parties due by 3/2/2016, Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/28/2016, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 12/28/2016, Motions due by 1/9/2017, Discovery completed by 2/6/2017, Dispositive motions due by 3/8/2017, Motions in Limine due by 5/1/2017, Pretrial Order due by 5/15/2017, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 5/16/2017, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 5/16/2017, Deposition Designations due by 5/16/2017, Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Amended trial date per the request and agreement of counsel. (MGC)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part #35 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may amend complaint or otherwise respond by 2/5/2016. (TG)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *THREE DAY* Jury Trial is set for 5/9/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joinder of Parties due by 2/5/2016, Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/31/2016, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/30/2016, Motions due by 12/12/2016, Discovery completed by 1/9/2017, Dispositive motions due by 2/8/2017, Motions in Limine due by 4/3/2017, Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2017, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 4/18/2017, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 4/18/2017, Deposition Designations due by 4/18/2017, Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2017 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 18, 2015 Filing 41 REPLY, filed by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker, TO RESPONSE to #35 Amended MOTION to Dismiss (Kalmanson, Matthew)
December 18, 2015 Filing 40 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rylander, Kurt)
December 14, 2015 Filing 39 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Triple Diamond Investments LLC, to #35 Amended MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rylander, Kurt)
December 4, 2015 Filing 38 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker.(Caldwell, Carey)
December 1, 2015 ***Motion terminated: #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven Wilker, Tonkon Torp LLP, Eric Beach, Caroline Harris Crowne, Paul Conable. (TG)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting #36 Stipulated Motion. Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/4/2015, Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2015.(TG)
November 24, 2015 Filing 36 Joint Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Plaintiff Triple Diamond Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 11/24/2015, (Rylander, Kurt)
November 17, 2015 ***Motion terminated: #30 MOTION to Dismiss Claims 1, 3, 4 to Am. Compl filed by Steven Wilker, Tonkon Torp LLP. *** Re-filed as Docket #35. (MET)
November 16, 2015 Filing 35 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 12/18/2015, (Caldwell, Carey)
November 16, 2015 Filing 34 EXHIBIT Exh. 12-21 by Defendants Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker (Caldwell, Carey)
November 16, 2015 Filing 33 EXHIBIT Exh. 6-11 re #31 Declaration by Defendants Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker (Caldwell, Carey)
November 16, 2015 Filing 32 EXHIBIT 1-5 re #31 Declaration by Defendants Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker (Caldwell, Carey)
November 16, 2015 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Matthew Kalmanson filed by Defendants Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Claims 1, 3, 4 to Am. Compl (Caldwell, Carey)
November 16, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Claims 1, 3, 4 to Am. Compl by Defendants Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 12/18/2015, (Caldwell, Carey)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting #27 Stipulated Motion. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/20/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/27/2015, Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2015.(TG)
November 9, 2015 Filing 28 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Triple Diamond Investments LLC, to #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rylander, Kurt)
November 6, 2015 Filing 27 Joint Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Plaintiff Triple Diamond Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 11/6/2015, (Rylander, Kurt)
November 2, 2015 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND, filed by Triple Diamond Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rylander, Kurt) Modified on 11/3/2015 (GMR).
October 12, 2015 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Kalmanson (with Exhibits 16 (parts 1 and 2) -18 filed by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 (part 2) of 18, #2 Exhibit 16 (part 3) of 18, #3 Exhibit 17 of 18, #4 Exhibit 18 of 18)(Kalmanson, Matthew)
October 12, 2015 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Kalmanson with Exhibits 13 -16 (part 1) of 18 filed by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 of 18, #2 Exhibit 14 of 18, #3 Exhibit 15 of 18, #4 Exhibit 16 (part 1) of 18)(Kalmanson, Matthew)
October 12, 2015 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Kalmson with Exhibit 1 -12 of 18 filed by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of 18, #2 Exhibit 2 of 18, #3 Exhibit 3 of 18, #4 Exhibit 4 of 18, #5 Exhibit 5 of 18, #6 Exhibit 6 of 18, #7 Exhibit 7 of 18, #8 Exhibit 8 of 18, #9 Exhibit 9 of 18, #10 Exhibit 10 of 18, #11 Exhibit 11 of 18, #12 Exhibit 12 of 18)(Kalmanson, Matthew)
October 12, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 11/13/2015, (Kalmanson, Matthew)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 10/12/2015.(TG)
September 28, 2015 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Caldwell, Carey)
September 28, 2015 Filing 19 Second DECLARATION of Carey Caldwell filed by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker re #18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Caldwell, Carey)
September 28, 2015 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker. Noting Date 9/28/2015, (Caldwell, Carey)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendants' answer due 10/4/2015. (TG)
September 24, 2015 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings by William M. McCool. Judge J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (Cc to BHS) (KAM)
September 24, 2015 ***Consent deadline terminated; case reassigned to a district judge. (KAM)
September 16, 2015 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Tonkon Torp LLP (Kalmanson, Matthew)
September 9, 2015 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Tonkon Torp LLP must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/16/2015. (GMR)
September 8, 2015 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal Supplement to Notice of Removal of Civil Action by Defendants Caroline Harris Crowne, Steven Wilker (Caldwell, Carey)
September 8, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gordon L Welborn on behalf of Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker. (Welborn, Gordon)
September 8, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carey Caldwell on behalf of Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker. (Caldwell, Carey)
September 8, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew J Kalmanson on behalf of Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker. (Kalmanson, Matthew)
September 4, 2015 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal Updated Verification of State Court Records by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker (Kalmanson, Matthew)
September 4, 2015 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker (Kalmanson, Matthew)
September 4, 2015 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Triple Diamond Investments LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rylander, Kurt)
August 31, 2015 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Kalmanson filed by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Kalmanson, Matthew)
August 31, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Eric Beach, Paul Conable, Caroline Harris Crowne, Tonkon Torp LLP, Steven Wilker. (Kalmanson, Matthew)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (TW)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 11/23/2015, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/9/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/16/2015, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (TW)
August 25, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT OR DECLINE FORM. If consent or decline, return the executed form by 10/23/2015. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
August 25, 2015 JSR ddl NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 11/23/2015, (TW)
August 24, 2015 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
August 24, 2015 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (GMR)
August 24, 2015 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/31/2015. (GMR)
August 21, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County, case number None; (Receipt # 0981-4133846), filed by Caroline Crowne, Steven Wilker. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kalmanson, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triple Diamond Investments LLC v. Tonkon Torp LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triple Diamond Investments LLC
Represented By: Kurt Marcus Rylander
Represented By: Mark E Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonkon Torp LLP
Represented By: Matthew J Kalmanson
Represented By: Carey Caldwell
Represented By: Gordon L Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Conable
Represented By: Matthew J Kalmanson
Represented By: Gordon L Welborn
Represented By: Carey Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Harris Crowne
Represented By: Matthew J Kalmanson
Represented By: Carey Caldwell
Represented By: Gordon L Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wilker
Represented By: Carey Caldwell
Represented By: Matthew J Kalmanson
Represented By: Gordon L Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Beach
Represented By: Carey Caldwell
Represented By: Matthew J Kalmanson
Represented By: Gordon L Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?