Choquette v. Warner et al
Plaintiff: Etienne L Choquette
Defendant: Bernard Warner, William Hayes, Cris DaValli, G. Steven Hammond, Kelly Remy, Kenneth Lauren, Christine Bunnell, Bo Stanbury, Mary Keppler, Patricia Cristianson, Frank Longana, William Rollins, Eric Larson, Joan Palmer, Phu Ngo, Glen Silver, H Jon Reyes, E Moore, Kenneth Sawyer and Michelle Southern
Case Number: 3:2015cv05838
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 112 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Michelle Southern, Cris DuVall, G. Steven Hammond, Kevin Bovenkamp, William Hayes. (TG)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 109 Plaintiff's objections to Dkt. 107; denying 111 Defendants' objections to Dkt. 107.(TG)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying plaintiff's motions to exclude ( 93 , 94 , and 96 ) and defendants' motion to strike (Dkt. 97 at 2-3), signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDERSetting Hearing on the 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 94 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of John Kenney, 93 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of William Hayes, and 96 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Robert Herzog for 12/7/2017 at 10:00 AM in D Courtroom before Judge J Richard Creatura. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 76 Motion for Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting the 66 Motion to Continue and Setting Pretrial Discovery Deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/24/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/24/2017, and the Discovery Plan is due by 5/24/2017. The currently pending Motion for Summary Judgment 64 is re-noted for 7/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER directing the Clerk to rename defendants' 64 MOTION TO DISMISS to a Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be stayed and held in abeyance. Defendants' response to plaintiff's request for a continuance pursuant to Rule 56(d) is due on or before January 27, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 62 Report and Recommendations. (TG)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 58 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. The Clerk is directed to docket the attached proposed third amended complaint, Dkt. 58-1, as plaintiff's third amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff shall submit the full names and addresses of the unserved defendants on or before 9/2/16. Granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file his response to defendants' 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on or before 9/2/16. The Clerk shall note this matter for the Court's consideration on 9/9/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Etienne Choquette, Prisoner ID: 345717)(CMG)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) by Judge J Richard Creatura. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Etienne Choquette, Prisoner ID: 345717)(MET)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choquette v. Warner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etienne L Choquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cris DaValli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Steven Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Remy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lauren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Bunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo Stanbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Keppler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Cristianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Longana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phu Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Jon Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Southern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?