Carlson v. Lewis County Hospital District No. 1 et al
Plaintiff: Eric Carlson
Defendant: Lewis County Hospital District No. 1, Ross Jones, Judy Ramsey, Kenton Smith, Marc Fisher, Shannon Kelly and Sheri Hendricks
Case Number: 3:2015cv05913
Filed: December 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Lewis
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, denying 74 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 62 Motion to Continue; renoting 29 MOTION for Reconsideration re 28 Order on Motion to Compel. Jury Trial is set for 5/22/2017 at 09:30 AM in A Courtroom before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Discovery completed by 3/17/2017, Dispositive motions due by 4/3/2017, Motions in Limine due by 4/24/2017, Pretrial Order due 5/5/17; Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in A Courtroom before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/12/2017, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 5/12/2017. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND/OR CLARIFICATION AND RENOTING MOTION, denying 31 Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery; granting in part and renoting 29 MOTION for Reconsideration re 28 Order on Motion to Compel to 1/13/17. Status Hearing set for 1/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in A Courtroom before Judge Robert J. Bryan.Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that Defendants' 29 MOTION for Reconsideration and/or Clarification is RENOTED for January 6, 2017. The deadline for Defendants' counsel to inform the Court of whether they intend to continue in this case is RESET for January 20, 2017. The deadline for all parties to inform the Court of whether an extension of time for all remaining deadlines is appropriate is RESET for January 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (CMG)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND FOR WAIVER OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE, granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Compel. Defendants' counsel shall inform the Court of whether they intend to continue to represent Defendants and both parties shall inform the Court of whether an extension of time for all remaining deadlines is appropriate on or before January 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. Lewis County Hospital District No. 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Carlson
Represented By: Joseph D. Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis County Hospital District No. 1
Represented By: Diana S Shukis
Represented By: Victoria Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Jones
Represented By: Diana S Shukis
Represented By: Victoria Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Ramsey
Represented By: Diana S Shukis
Represented By: Victoria Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenton Smith
Represented By: Diana S Shukis
Represented By: Victoria Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Fisher
Represented By: Diana S Shukis
Represented By: Victoria Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Kelly
Represented By: Diana S Shukis
Represented By: Victoria Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Hendricks
Represented By: Diana S Shukis
Represented By: Victoria Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?