March 25, 2019 |
Filing
275
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 263 Report and Recommendation; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The R&R is ADOPTED. Defendant's motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 231 , is GRANTED. McDaniels's in forma pauperis status is REVOKED for purposes of appeal. The Clerk shall enter a JUDGMENT and close the case. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(SP)
|
January 9, 2019 |
Filing
271
ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 264 Motion for Extension of Time; Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiff's 268 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Terminating Plaintiff's 269 Objections; and Renoting the 263 Report and Recommendation for consideration on February 1, 2019. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
|
August 2, 2018 |
Filing
254
ORDER Denying 252 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. The Court will accept Plaintiff's alternative request. The Court will consider 251 Plaintiff's 50 typewritten pages as his Response for purposes of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
|
July 16, 2018 |
Filing
250
ORDER granting in part the 245 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff shall file his amended response on or before 8/13/18. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS**. The Clerk is directed to renote defendants' motion for summary judgment to 8/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(CMG)
|
June 14, 2018 |
Filing
244
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 241 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(TG)
|
May 15, 2018 |
Filing
240
ORDER LIFTING STAY AND DENYING OUTSTANDING NONDISPOSITIVE MOTIONS signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Plaintiff's 222 Motion to Lift Stay is Granted; Plaintiff's 223 Motion to Stay Dispositives is Denied; and the following are denied with leave to refile: 190 Motion to direct service; 191 Motion to Substitute; 208 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; and 209 Motion to Issue Subpoena. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
|
July 6, 2017 |
Filing
219
ORDER STAYING THE CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. This entire matter is stayed pending resolution of Plaintiff's appeal. The noting dates for motions 190 , 191 , 203 , 207 , 208 , and 209 are stricken. Parties are di rected to refrain from filing motions with the Court as they will not be considered while the case stayed. Within thirty days of the resolution of the appeal, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of this matter.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing
211
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND RE-NOTE PENDING MOTIONS by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. Parties are directed to show cause on or before June 30, 2017 why the case should not be stayed, pending the outcome of Plaintiff's appeal of the Or der Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The following motions are re-noted for June 30, 2017: Plaintiff's Motion for Service (Dkt. 190 ); (2) Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution (Dkt. 191 ); (3) Defendants& #039; Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 203 ); (4) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Dkt. 208 ); (5) Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Party (Dkt. 207 ); and (6) Plaintiff's Motion to Issue Subpoena (Dkt. 209 ). **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
|
March 20, 2017 |
Filing
177
ORDER denying 175 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(TG)
|
March 7, 2017 |
Filing
174
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 170 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Peter J. McDaniels. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(TG)
|
February 28, 2017 |
Filing
173
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 166 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(TG)
|
January 24, 2017 |
Filing
171
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 143 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Peter J. McDaniels. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(TG)
|
January 13, 2017 |
Filing
164
ORDER by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel Granting Plaintiff's 140 Motion to Stay; and Granting Plaintiff's 144 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. This matter is stayed until 3/31/2017. Plaintiff is directed to file a Status Report on or before 3/24/2017. The Clerk is directed to docket Plaintiff's proposed second amended complaint (Dkt. 144-1) as his Second Amended Complaint. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
|
November 29, 2016 |
Filing
142
ORDER by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel as to the following: Plaintiff's First 134 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED; Plaintiff's 117 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel is DENIED; Plaintiff's 127 Motion for Extension is GRANTED-IN-PART; Plaintiff's Second 128 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED-IN-PART; Defendants' 124 Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED; and the Clerk is directed to re-note Defendants' 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment for 1/6/2017. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
|
November 17, 2016 |
Filing
132
ORDER by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel DENYING Plaintiff's 118 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Motion; and Directing the Clerk to STRIKE Plaintiff's 122 2nd Motion for Preliminary Injunction from the Record as the Court will not consider it. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
|
September 6, 2016 |
Filing
102
ORDER Granting 96 Motion to File Overlength Replies, by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing
101
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for Extension of Time is granted-in-part and Plaintiff's Motion for Expert Witness is denied. All discovery must be completed by December 9, 2016 and any dispositive motions shall be filed and served on or before January 23, 2017. Additionally, the Court will not consider any additional extension of time unless good cause is shown. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.**6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(CMG)
|
August 31, 2016 |
Filing
95
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 84 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by Peter J. McDaniels. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(TG)
|
July 18, 2016 |
Filing
85
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 83 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(TG)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
40
ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle ADOPTING 13 Report and Recommendation and DECLINING TO ADOPT 25 Report and Recommendations. This matter is REFERRED to Judge Christel for further consideration. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(TG)
|
March 14, 2016 |
Filing
35
ORDER denying First 30 Motion for Reconsideration re 26 Order; denying Second 34 Motion for Reconsideration re 21 Order; by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **3 PAGES, PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
|
February 16, 2016 |
Filing
26
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; and Denying as Moot, Plaintiff's 15 Motion to Waive Security Deposit; by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. **3 PAGES, PRINT ALL**(Peter McDaniels, Prisoner ID: 995036)(GMR)
|