Irby v. Gilbert et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Jon Irby
Defendant: Margret Gilbert, Furst, Mathews, Casey, John and Jane Doe, Shooter, Romez, John or Jane Doe and Thompson
Case Number: 3:2016cv05052
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER that case nos C15-5208, C16-5052, 17-5070 and C17-5377 are consolidated. Case no. C15-5208RBL/JRC shall remain the lead case and all future filings shall bear case no. C15-5208RBL/JRC. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS**. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(CMG)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 114 denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. #70] as moot; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Terrance Irby, Prisoner ID: 631794)(DN)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER that the parties SHOW CAUSE on or before 5/19/17, why this case should not be consolidated. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** The parties are advised that until the stay is lifted, the Court will not consider any future filings. The Court may strike any pleading that does not comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Terrance Irby, Prisoner ID: 631794)(CMG)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER on plaintiff's 100 Motion for reconsideration by Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Terrance Irby, Prisoner ID: 631794)(RS)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER ON REVIEW OF REFUSAL TO RECUSE re plaintiff's 84 Motion for Recusal. by Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Terrance Irby, Prisoner ID: 631794)(RS)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Terrance Jon Irby; Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED; Plaintiff has 30 days to pay the filing fee in order to continue with the complaint; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 4/18/2016 (DN). (cc to pltf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irby v. Gilbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Jon Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margret Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shooter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?