Bettys v. Quigley et al
Plaintiff: John E Bettys and Richard G Turay
Defendant: Kevin Quigley, Mark Strong, Cathi Harris, Holli Coryell, Elena Lopez, Justin Grimm, Gordon Monk, Brenda Powers, Kenneth Riconoscuito, Paul Reed, Debora Laroe-Prado, Al Nerio, Byron Eagle, Becky Denny, Craig Mingay, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 1 and Jane Doe 2
Case Number: 3:2016cv05076
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Second Order Adopting 136 Report and Recommendation re 117 MOTION for Summary Judgment signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy to Plaintiff at Steilacoom address. (TC)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 136 Report and Recommendations by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to Plaintiff at Steilacoom address. (TC)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 125 Motion for Extension of Time. His motion to file excess pages 125 is DENIED. Plaintiff's response brief, with a maximum of 16 additional pages, is due on 12/20/17. Defendants' reply brief is due on 1/5/18. The Clerk's office is directed to re-note this matter for 1/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 92 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by John E Bettys. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 81 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ SCC address . Modified on 12/19/2016 (JL).
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to consolidate, Dkt. 62, is GRANTED. Bettys v Lashway, Case No. 16-5626-RJB-DWC is consolidated with this action. This action, Case No. 16-5076-RJB-JRC, shall remain the lead case. All future filings shall bear Case No. 16-5076-RJB-JRC.**SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Plaintiff shall file one amended complaint setting forth all claims in this consolidated matter on or before December 10, 2016. Accordingly, Plaintiff's pending 78 MOTION to Amen d 13 Complaint is denied as moot. The Court will address defendants' pending motion to dismiss (Dkt. 47) in a separately filed report and recommendation. The existing pretrial scheduling order entered in this action (Dkt. 63) will govern the case schedule in the consolidated matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)(cc to Plaintiff)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that Plaintiff's 61 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff may revisit this issue, if appropriate, at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER VACATING the 66 Order granting the Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court will accept for entry defendants' Proposed Response to Plaintiff's Motion for an Appointed Attorney. The Court requests that plaintiff file a reply to defendants' response no later than 10/14/16. Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel shall be re-noted for 10/14/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Once counsel has had an opportunity to review the case, the Court will entertain a motion to supplement the briefing and give defendants an opportunity to respond. Any such motion should be filed by October 10, 2016, with any response filed by October 21, 2016. The Clerk's office is directed to note this matter for October 21, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)cc to Plaintiff
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 60 Motion to Withdraw Documents by Judge J Richard Creatura.*** Motions terminated: 52 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John E Bettys, 51 MOTION for Judgment filed by John E Bettys - these motions will not be considered by the Court. (MET) cc: plaintiff
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re Supplemental Briefing re defendants' 47 MOTION to Dismiss. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS**. Defendants' supplemental brief in support is due by 9/2/16. Plaintiff shall have until 9/23/16. The clerk is directed to re-note the 47 MOTION to Dismiss for consideration on 9/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)(cc: to Plaintiff)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail; mailed on 3/22/16 to Defendants and a courtesy copy to the AG's office. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)cc: Plaintiff w/instruction sheet
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)cc:Plaintiff
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bettys v. Quigley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Bettys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard G Turay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathi Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holli Coryell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Grimm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Monk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Riconoscuito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debora Laroe-Prado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Nerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Mingay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?