Davis v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Keith Adair Davis
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections, G Hammond, ADA Coordinator, Washington Correction Center, Superintendent, WCC, Associate/Designee Superintendent, WCC, Medical Directors, WCC, Medical Coordinators, WCC, Dale Robertson, Kenny, Kelli Delp, Kinnamon, Barcelona, G Robbins, Lori Dale, Clouatre, Pugh, Toby Vaughn, Allison Comstock, Dean Mason, Hayward, D MacWilliam, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-15 and DOC et al
Case Number: 3:2016cv05129
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: David W. Christel
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle DENYING 133 MOTION to Amend filed by Keith Adair Davis. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379)(TG)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 130 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by Keith Adair Davis. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379)(TG)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Extending Deadline for Objections by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 119 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. 121 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Keith Adair Davis to 119 Report and Recommendations: RENOTED to 9/15/2017. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Keith Davis, Prisoner ID: 936379)(TG)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER directing the Clerk to RE-NOTE the MOTIONS for Summary Judgment ( 59 , 92 ) to 6/9/2017. The Court notes the deadlines for filing opposition and reply papers are not extended and no additional filings will be considered. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 79 Motion to Consolidate Cases, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.(CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 74 Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiff's response to Defendants' 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment must be filed on or before 2/27/17. The Court directs the Clerk to re-note Defendants' 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment for 3/3/2017. Discovery must be completed by 3/1/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.(CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail to Defendants MacWilliam and Robertson; mailed on 12/9/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that Plaintiff's 55 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.(CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER withdrawing the 50 Report and Recommendation and granting the 54 Motion and Declaration for Summons for Defendants who Disappeared from WCC. The Court directs Assistant Attorney General Jerry Patrick Scharosch to file the last known addresses for Defendants Donald MacWilliam and Dale Robertson under seal on or before 12/23/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.(CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER to Provide Addresses: Plaintiff is directed to provide the complete names and addresses for Defendants ADA Coordinator, Dale Robertson, D. MacWilliam, John Doe, Secretary, Jane Does 1-10, and John Does 1-15. If Plaintiff is unable to provide the Court with the names and addresses of these Defendants by October 3, 2016, the Court will recommend dismissal of these Defendants from this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (CMG)cc to Plaintiff
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER vacating 10 Report and Recommendations and will consider the case in light of the Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel.(CMG)cc: to Plaintiff
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance), signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (CMG)cc: Plaintiff, King County Jail Inmate Accounts
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Adair Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADA Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Correction Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent, WCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate/Designee Superintendent, WCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Directors, WCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Coordinators, WCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Delp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinnamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barcelona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clouatre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D MacWilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?